Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
19-50355: This document is currently unavailable. If you need a copy of this document, please contact Clerk's Office at (775)684-1600.
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 79167
Short Caption:IN RE: CHRISTIAN FAMILY TRUSTCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):75750, 76053
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - P092512Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:07/17/2019 / Kunin, IsraelSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/16/2019Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Cary Colt Payne. Check no. 1650. (SC)
07/16/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)19-30050
07/16/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC)19-30052
07/17/2019Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Israel Kunin. (SC).19-30361
08/02/2019Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)19-32557
08/06/2019Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for November 13, 2019, at 9:30 am. (SC)19-33061
08/13/2019MotionFiled Respondent Jacqueline Utkin's Motion to Dismiss. (SC)19-34061
08/14/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Respondent Jacqueline Utkin's Motion to Dismiss Due date: 10 days. (SC)19-34089
08/14/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent Jacqueline Utkin's Certificate of Service. (SC)19-34192
08/15/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent Monte Reason's Joinder to Motion to Dismiss. (SC)19-34388
08/19/2019MotionFiled Appellants' Opposition to Motion to Dismiss and Joinder Thereto. (SC)19-34758
08/22/2019MotionFiled Respondent Jacqueline Utkin's Reply to Appellants' Opposition to Motion to Dismiss. (SC)19-35252
08/22/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent Monte Reason's Joinder to Reply to Appellants' Opposition to Motion to Dismiss. (SC)19-35311
09/05/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion to Dismiss. Respondent Jacqueline Utkin has filed a motion requesting this court to dismiss this appeal for lack of jurisdiction, to which respondent Monte Reason has filed a joinder. We deny the motion, without prejudice to respondents' rights to renew the motion, if necessary, upon completion of settlement proceedings. (SC)19-37060
11/19/2019Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal Regarding Jacqueline Utkin. Costs and attorney fees on appeal are to be paid as follows: as agreed by parties. (SC).19-47392
11/27/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Partially Dismissing Appeal. Pursuant to the stipulation filed on November 19, 2019, this appeal is dismissed as to respondent Jacqueline Utkin only. The caption shall be modified accordingly. The costs and attorney fees on appeal are to be paid as agreed by parties. (SC)19-48482
12/12/2019Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. A mediation was held in this matter on November 13, 2019. Counsel are continuing discussions with this Settlement Judge. (SC).19-50355
01/13/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement and are waiting for signatures to agreement before formally dismissing appeal. Settlement judge requests one week extension for final report. (SC)20-01638
01/16/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/Settlement. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. (SC)20-02144
01/22/2020Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order re: Stipulation/Motion to Dismiss. Stipulation or Motion to Dismiss Due: 30 days. (SC).20-03083
02/07/2020MotionFiled Stipulation to Dismiss Appeal. (SC)20-05343
02/11/2020Settlement Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal/Stipulation/Settlement. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, "this appeal is dismissed." Costs and attorney fees on appeal are to be paid as agreed by the parties. NRAP 42(b). Case Closed/No Remittitur Issued. (SC)20-05668