Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
12-26191: This document is currently unavailable. If you need a copy of this document, please contact Clerk's Office at (775)684-1600.
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 61359
Short Caption:MATHAHS (KEITH) VS. DIST. CT. (STATE)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):60038, 61230, 62641, 62877, 63046, 64591, 64609
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C265107Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Mandamus
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/27/2012Filing FeeFiling Fee Waived. Criminal.
07/27/2012Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus.12-23682
07/27/2012Filing FeeReturned Filing Fee. Check No. 29713 returned to Gordon Silver.
07/27/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ of Mandamus - Volume 1.12-23686
07/27/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ of Mandamus - Volume 2.12-23687
08/03/2012OtherCD-ROMs for Petition and Appendix filed on 7/27/2012.
08/06/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer. Real party in interest's answer due: 20 days.12-24669
08/21/2012MotionFiled Emergency Motion for Stay Under NRAP 8(a).12-26191
08/21/2012MotionFiled Motion for Enlargement of Time. (Answer to Writ Petition)12-26324
08/28/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time. The State shall have until September 17, 2012, to file and serve the answer.12-27291
09/10/2012MotionFiled Emergency Motion for Stay Under NRAP 8(a) Immediate Action Necessary - Prior to Court's Decision on Writ of Mandamus in District Court Case No. C-12-283381-3.12-28405
09/10/2012MotionFiled State's Response to Petitioner's Motion for Emergency Stay.12-28569
09/12/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motions. The motions filed on August 21, 2012 and September 10, 2012, are denied without prejudice.12-28780
09/17/2012MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time to File Answer to Petition for Writ (Second Request).12-29253
09/18/2012MotionFiled Petitioner/Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Enlargement of Time (Second Request).12-29414
09/20/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Answer to Petition for Writ Vol 1.12-29774
09/20/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Answer to Petition for Writ Vol 2.12-29775
09/20/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Answer to Petition for Writ Vol 3.12-29776
09/21/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time. The clerk of this court shall file the answer received via E-Flex on September 20, 2012. Fn1[The alternative request for stay contained in petitioner's response to the motion is denied.]12-29925
09/21/2012Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ.12-29926
09/25/2012MotionFiled Request for Petitioner's Writ of Mandamus to be Heard on Oral Argument.12-30202
12/20/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Show Cause. Petitioner shall have 15 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why the entry of the guilty plea has not rendered the issues raised in the instant petition moot. The real party in interest shall have 11 days from the date that petitioner's response is served to file and serve any reply.12-40310
01/04/2013MotionFiled Defendant Mathahs' Response to Supreme Court Order to Show Cause.13-00299
01/31/2013Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Petition. "We dismiss the petition as moot." Fn1[We deny petitioner's request for oral argument.] SNP12-MD/MG/RP13-03328
02/27/2013RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.13-06077
02/27/2013Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.