Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
19-36711: This document is currently unavailable. If you need a copy of this document, please contact Clerk's Office at (775)684-1600.
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 79396
Short Caption:ESTATE OF MARY CURTIS VS. S. LAS VEGAS MED. INV'RS, LLCCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):77810
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A790152Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/14/2019Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
08/14/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)19-34176
08/14/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)19-34181
08/19/2019Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Kolesar & Leatham. Check no. 5939. (SC)
08/19/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC).19-34744
08/20/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Modification of Caption. Parties are advised to notify this office in writing within 10 days if the caption as modified does not accurately reflect the status of the parties. (SC)19-34773
08/20/2019Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant: 14 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief. (SC).19-34841
09/03/2019Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 09/03/19). (SC)
09/03/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Transcript Request. (SC)19-36711
09/03/2019Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 06/04/19. To Court Reporter: De'Awna Takas. (SC)19-36749
09/06/2019Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)19-37452
10/03/2019TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. De'Awna Takas stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 06/04/19. (SC)19-41129
12/11/2019MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time for Appellant to File its Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC)19-50151
12/11/2019MotionFiled DUPLICATE Stipulation for Extension of Time For Appellant to File Its Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC)19-50191
12/17/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellants' Opening Brief and Appendix due: January 21, 2020. (SC).19-50986
01/17/2020BriefFiled Appellants' Opening Brief. (SC).20-02587
01/17/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 1. (SC).20-02590
02/18/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Daniel F. Polsenberg, Joel D. Henriod, and Abraham G. Smith of Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP appearing counsel for respondents. (SC)20-06696
02/18/2020MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension to File Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)20-06697
02/19/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice - Stipulation Approved. Respondents' Answering Brief due: March 19, 2020. (SC)20-06739
03/19/2020MotionFiled Motion for Extension to File Respondents' Answering Brief (Second Request). (SC)20-10870
03/25/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Firm Affiliation and Mailing Address (Michael Davidson). (SC).20-11456
03/26/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondents' Answering Brief due: April 20, 2020. (SC).20-11648
04/20/2020AppendixFiled Respondents' Appendix to Answering Brief - Volume 1. (SC)20-15014
04/20/2020AppendixFiled Respondents' Appendix to Answering Brief - Volume 2. (SC)20-15015
04/20/2020BriefFiled Respondents' Answering Brief. (SC)20-15016
04/20/2020MotionFiled Respondents' Motion for Judicial Notice of Related Proceedings. (SC)20-15017
04/27/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Appellants' Notice of Non-Objection to Respondents' Motion for Judicial Notice of Related Proceedings. (SC)20-15936
04/30/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's unopposed motion for judicial notice is granted. This court will take judicial notice of the documents identified in appellant's April 20, 2020, motion. (SC).20-16358
05/20/2020BriefFiled Appellants' Reply Brief. (SC)20-19211
05/21/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
10/23/2020Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP20-MG/LS/AS (SC)20-38920
11/17/2020RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)20-41934
11/17/2020Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
12/11/2020RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on November 24, 2020. (SC)20-41934