Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
18-01225: This document is currently unavailable. If you need a copy of this document, please contact Clerk's Office at (775)684-1600.
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 73815
Short Caption:MONA, JR. VS. FAR WEST INDUS.Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):68434, 70857
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A670352Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/25/2017 / Shirinian, AraSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/24/2017Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court.
08/24/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)17-28414
08/24/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.17-28417
08/25/2017Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Marquis Aurbach Coffing. Check no. 122006.
08/25/2017Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Ara H. Shirinain.17-28615
09/11/2017Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for September 21, 2017, at 10:00 am.17-30400
09/13/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Docketing Statement due: September 27, 2017.17-30775
09/22/2017Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.17-32229
09/25/2017Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.17-32449
09/27/2017Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix.17-32836
10/10/2017Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 03/30/16, 06/14/17. To Court Reporter: Matt Yarbrough.17-34438
10/24/2017Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 06/10/15. To Court Reporter: None listed (Response to Request for Supplemental Transcripts)17-36396
11/01/2017TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Matthew Yarbrough stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 03/30/17, 06/14/17.17-37474
12/12/2017MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Appellant's Appeal for Lack of Jurisdiction with Exhibits 1-8.17-42729
12/13/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Opening Brief and Appendix due: January 9, 2018.17-43001
12/13/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Appeal due: January 4, 2018.17-43005
01/04/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss.18-00551
01/09/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.18-01224
01/09/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 1.18-01225
01/09/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 2.18-01226
01/09/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 3.18-01228
01/09/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 4.18-01229
01/09/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 5.18-01230
01/09/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 6.18-01235
01/09/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 7.18-01236
01/09/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 8.18-01237
01/09/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 9.18-01238
01/09/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 10.18-01239
01/09/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 11.18-01240
01/09/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 12.18-01241
01/09/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 13.18-01242
01/09/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 14.18-01243
01/09/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 15.18-01244
01/09/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 16.18-01245
01/09/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 17.18-01246
01/10/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 18.18-01248
01/10/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 19.18-01249
01/10/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 20.18-01250
01/10/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 21.18-01251
01/10/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 22.18-01253
01/10/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 23.18-01254
01/10/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service of Appellant's Appendix Volumes 1-23.18-01323
01/11/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent's Reply to Appellant's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss due: January 25, 2018.18-01504
01/23/2018MotionFiled Respondent's Reply in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss.18-03229
02/06/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Answering Brief due: February 22, 2018.18-05049
02/22/2018MotionFiled Stipulated Joint Motion to Extend Briefing Deadlines.18-06908
03/06/2018Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." fn1 [We deny as moot the parties' joint motion to extend the briefing deadlines. The clerk shall return, unfiled, the answering brief and appendix received on March 2, 2018.] SNP18-MC/RP/LS.18-08853
04/02/2018RemittiturIssued Remittitur.18-12432
04/02/2018Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/20/2018RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on April 11, 2018.18-12432