Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
20-04583: This document is currently unavailable. If you need a copy of this document, please contact Clerk's Office at (775)684-1600.
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80323
Short Caption:CRUZ-REYES VS. LIUCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):77742, 80323-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D414855Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/11/2020How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/03/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
01/03/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-00409
01/03/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)20-00417
01/03/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days. (SC)20-00420
01/06/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Guinness Law Firm. Check no. 8926. (SC)
01/07/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC).20-00751
01/08/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Confidential Civil Cover Sheet. (SC)
01/08/2020MotionFiled Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Respondent. (SC)20-01012
01/28/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)20-03943
01/29/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals Exhibit 3. (SC)20-03977
01/30/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Appellant to File a Case Appeal Statement. Case Appeal Statement due: 14 days. (SC).20-04254
01/31/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. (SC)20-04323
02/03/2020Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall remove attorney Kevin M. Johnson, Esq., of the law firm Cohen Johnson Parker Edwards, from the docket of this appeal. Respondent's Notice of Appearance due: 30 days. (SC).20-04583
03/16/2020Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing from Settlement Program and Reinstating Deadlines for Filing Required Documents. Because respondent is proceeding on appeal pro se, we remove this appeal from the settlement program. Appellant: 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC).20-10237
03/27/2020Transcript RequestFiled Appellant's Request for Transcript Estimate. (SC)20-11783
03/27/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Katherine Rice stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 09/06/18 and 01/16/19. (SC)20-11784
03/27/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service (Transcripts). (SC)20-11785
03/30/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 09/06/18 and 01/16/19. To Court Reporter: Video/Transcript Department. (SC)
06/12/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief (REJECTED PER 06/15/20 NOTICE). (SC)
06/15/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days. (SC).20-22241
06/15/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Apendix to Opening Brief - Vol I - Part 1. (SC).20-22255
06/15/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Apendix to Opening Brief - Vol I - Part 2. (SC).20-22257
06/15/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Apendix to Opening Brief - Vol II. (SC).20-22272
06/18/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-22721
08/07/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order to File Document. Respondent shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file and serve the answering brief. (SC)20-29143
09/11/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, respondent has failed to file the answering brief or to otherwise communicate with this court. Accordingly, this appeal will be resolved without an answering brief from respondent. (SC)20-33581
09/11/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. (SC)
11/12/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC).20-41244
11/12/2020Case Status UpdateTransferred to Court of Appeals. (SC).
04/16/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Reversal and Remand. "We therefore reverse the district court's order awarding Liu attorney fees and remand this matter for further proceedings in the district court to determine whether the parties entered into a settlement agreement whereby Liu agreed to forgo the fees award at issue here as Cruz-Reyes contends.' Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (SC)
05/11/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals. (SC)
05/11/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-13421
05/11/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
06/07/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 12, 2021. (SC)21-13421