Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
21-22960: This document is currently unavailable. If you need a copy of this document, please contact Clerk's Office at (775)684-1600.
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82231
Short Caption:HUDSON (CLEMON) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):76465, 76465-COA, 82231-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A783635, C309578Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Transferred to Court of Appeals
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/17/2020Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
12/17/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement and Notice of Briefing Schedule mailed to counsel for appellant.) (A783635) (SC)20-45683
12/17/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. (A783685) (SC)20-45692
12/17/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. (Second NOA) (A783635) (SC)20-45707
12/18/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 01/28/20 and 10/15/20. To Court Reporter: DC Dept. 29. (SC)20-45787
12/18/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. (SC)20-45845
01/21/2021TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Recorder Melissa Murphy-Delgado stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 1/28/20 and 10/15/20. (SC)21-01830
04/16/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. (SC)21-10985
04/23/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: July 15, 2021. (SC)21-11716
07/14/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix (2nd Request). (SC)21-20213
07/16/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a motion seeking a second extension of time (60 days) to file the opening brief and appendix. The motion is denied. Opening brief and appendix due: 21 days. (SC)21-20643
08/06/2021AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief - Volume 2. (SC)21-22953
08/06/2021AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief - Volume 1. (SC)21-22954
08/06/2021AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief - Volume 3. (SC)21-22955
08/06/2021AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief - Volume 4. (SC)21-22956
08/06/2021AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix tot he Opening Brief - Volume 5. (SC)21-22957
08/06/2021AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief - Volume 6. (SC)21-22958
08/06/2021AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief - Volume 7. (SC)21-22959
08/06/2021AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief - Volume 8. (SC)21-22960
08/06/2021AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief - Volume 9. (SC)21-22961
08/06/2021AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief - Volume 10. (SC)21-22962
08/06/2021BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)21-22970
09/03/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Karen Mishler, Chief Deputy District Attorney as counsel for Respondent). (SC)21-25747
09/03/2021BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)21-25749
10/07/2021BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)21-28870
10/08/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
11/05/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC).21-31932
11/05/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Court of Appeals. (SC).