Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
05-04415: This document is currently unavailable. If you need a copy of this document, please contact Clerk's Office at (775)684-1600.
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 43895
Short Caption:CENTOFANTI VS. DIST. CT. (STATE)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):38987, 44984, 52994, 58562, 78193, 78193-COA, 82684
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C172534Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Certiorari/Prohibition
Disqualifications:GibbonsCase Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/19/2005How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/08/2004Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/08/2004Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. And Motion for Emergency Stay of Proceedings.04-16412
09/08/2004AppendixFiled Appendix. Petitioner's Appendix.04-16414
09/08/2004OtherDisqualification of Justice Gibbons. Sat in district court proceedings.
09/08/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Receipt of Copy. Petition for Writ served on Clark County District Attorney.04-16470
09/08/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Order Directing Answer and Granting Temporary Stay. We direct the real party in interest, on behalf of respondents, to file an answer against issuance of the requested writ within 20 days from the date of this order. We temporarily stay all proceedings in Eighth Judicial District Court Case No. C172534 pending receipt and consideration of the answer and pending further order of this court.04-16486
09/08/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Affidavit of Service. Petition for Writ served on Judge Mosley.04-16489
09/09/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Affidavit of Service served upon Honorable Donald Mosley.04-16527
09/09/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Receipt of Copy.04-16528
09/30/2004Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ.04-18159
10/06/2004MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Motion to Allow Petitioner Leave to file Reply to Respondents' Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus/for Writ of Prohibition.04-18458
10/21/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed October 6, 2004. To date, petitioner's motion is unopposed. Petitioner shall have 10 days from the date of this order within which to file and serve a reply to the answer submitted by the State.04-19512
11/01/2004MotionFiled Reply to Response. Reply to Respondent's Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus/for Writ of Prohibition.04-20108
01/13/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to Clark County Clerk requesting a certified copy of the Stipulation and Order to Waive Jury Penalty Hearing filed on April 23. 2004.
01/18/2005Other Other. Filed Stipulation and Order to Waive Jury Penalty Hearing filed in the district court on April 23, 2004.05-01112
01/19/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this matter shall stand submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the papers filed herein. See NRAP 34(f)(1).05-01230
01/19/2005Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP05-WM/MD/RP
01/31/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." NNP05-WM/MD/RP05-01918
02/16/2005Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. Motion for Rehearing and for Stay Pending Decision.05-03143
03/07/2005Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). fn1[We deny, as moot, petitioner's motion to stay the district court proceedings ending resolution of the petition for rehearing.] NNP05-WM/MD/RP05-04415
04/01/2005RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.05-04720
04/01/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.