Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
15-10660: This document is currently unavailable. If you need a copy of this document, please contact Clerk's Office at (775)684-1600.
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 67598
Short Caption:GRIMES (BENNETT) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):62835, 67741, 74419, 74419-COA, 81042, 81042-COA, 81335, 81531, 81697, 81697-COA, 83088, 83088-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C276163Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/28/2016How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/18/2015Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
03/18/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Filed certified copy of notice of appeal. (Fast Track Notice issued to counsel for appellant.)15-08361
03/19/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of District Court Docket Entries.15-08426
03/20/2015MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Withdraw Due to Conflict of Interest and Request to Have the Case Remanded to District Court For Appointment of New Counsel.15-08545
03/24/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Re: Entry of Written Order and Suspending Briefing. District Court Order due: 30 days.15-08919
03/24/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Second NOA).15-08995
03/30/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion to Withdraw. We deny the motion without prejudice.15-09583
04/08/2015MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Strike Order Denying Motion to Withdraw.15-10660
04/30/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Due date: 10 days.15-13136
05/04/2015Order/IncomingFiled District court order. Certified copy of order denying defendant's motion to correct illegal sentence filed in district court on 05/01/15.15-13420
05/06/2015Order/IncomingFiled District court order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 04/21/15. Minute order appointing Mr. Gamage as counsel for appellant.15-13799
06/08/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion and Reinstating Briefing. We deny the motion to strike our prior order. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: 50 days.15-17363
06/10/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys (William Gamage to replace Clark County Public Defenders Office as counsel for Appellant).15-17662
06/22/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Obligations of Counsel. The Clark County Public Defender's Office remains obligated to file the fast track statement and appendix in this appeal. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: July 28, 2015. Attorney William H. Gamage's Supplemental Fast Track Statement or Notice of no supplement due: 20 days from the filing of the FTS. Fast Track Response due: 20 days from the filing of the SFTS. Fast Track Reply due: 14 days from the filing of the FTR.15-18922
07/02/2015Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement.15-20231
07/02/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement Vol I.15-20232
07/02/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement Vol II.15-20233
07/02/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement Vol III.15-20234
07/02/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement Vol IV.15-20235
07/02/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement Vol V.15-20236
07/02/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement Vol VI.15-20237
07/10/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Intent to Not File Supplemental Fast Track Statement.15-21048
07/22/2015MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time - First Request. (Fast Track Response)15-22254
08/04/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Fast Track Response due: August 21, 2015.15-23505
08/21/2015MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time - Second Request (Fast Track Response).15-25370
08/28/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Fast Track Response due: September 21, 2015.15-26149
09/04/2015Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response.15-26863
09/21/2015MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time to File Reply to Fast Track Statement Response (First Request).15-28441
09/24/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Fast Track Reply due: September 28, 2015.15-28886
09/29/2015Fast Track BriefFiled Reply to Fast Track Response.15-29416
09/29/2015Case Status UpdateFast Track Briefing Completed.
01/28/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument.16-03037
02/26/2016Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment AFFIRMED." SNP16-JH/NS/KP16-06120
03/22/2016RemittiturIssued Remittitur.16-08953
03/22/2016Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/08/2016RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on March 25, 2016.16-08953