Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
17-02546: This document is currently unavailable. If you need a copy of this document, please contact Clerk's Office at (775)684-1600.
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 69925
Short Caption:FUGATE (MATTHEW) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):82493
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR150134Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:02/07/2017 at 10:00 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:02/07/2017How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/09/2016Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
03/09/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Filed certified copy of notice of appeal. (Fast Track Notice issued to counsel for appellant.)16-07501
03/09/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Request Rough Draft Transcripts. Due date: 10 days.16-07503
03/09/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Criminal. Due date: 10 days16-07505
03/14/2016MotionFiled Ex Parte Motion to Relieve Counsel and Appoint Counsel on Appeal.16-08082
03/15/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement.16-08188
03/22/2016Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 4/27/15 and 4/28/15 Court Reporter: Peggy Hoogs & Associates. Filed in district court on: 3/21/49.16-09047
03/30/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motions. Appellant's counsel, John Ohlson, has filed motions to withdraw from representing appellant in these appeals. As the fast track statements have not been filed, we deny the motions. Nos. 69925/69926.16-09990
04/15/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Karla Butko as Counsel for the Appellant Matthew Fugate).16-11841
04/15/2016MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Fast Track Statement.16-11842
04/15/2016TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Misty Hubert stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 04/27/15, 04/28/15.16-11947
04/25/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: May 18, 2016.16-12906
05/19/2016MotionFiled Motion for District Court Clerk to Transmit Presentence Investigation Report.16-15791
05/20/2016Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement.16-15951
05/20/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement Volumes 1-3.16-15952
05/24/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Presentence Investigation Report. P.S.I. due: 20 days.16-16198
06/10/2016Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response.16-18198
07/06/2016Case Status UpdateFast Track Briefing Completed. No Reply to FTR Filed.
07/07/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled SEALED PSI Report.
11/14/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.16-35279
12/21/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Tuesday, February 7, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City.16-39740
01/24/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.17-02546
02/07/2017Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
02/16/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Supplemental Briefing. Appellant's Supplemental Brief due: 20 days. Respondent's Supplemental Brief due: 20 days thereafter.17-05515
03/01/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Supplemental Brief.17-07092
03/16/2017BriefFiled Respondent's Supplemental Brief.17-08858
09/11/2017Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." EN BANC17-30326
10/06/2017RemittiturIssued Remittitur.17-33959
10/06/2017Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/18/2017RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 11, 2017.17-33959