Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
12-21471: This document is currently unavailable. If you need a copy of this document, please contact Clerk's Office at (775)684-1600.
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 61230
Short Caption:DESAI (DIPAK) VS. DIST. CT. (STATE)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):60038, 61359, 62641, 62877, 63046, 64591, 64609
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C265107Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/09/2012Filing FeeFiling fee waived. Criminal.
07/09/2012Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or, In The Altervative, Writ of Prohibition.12-21470
07/09/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ.12-21471
07/26/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Answer due: 20 days.12-23570
08/15/2012MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time to File Answer to Writ Petition (First Request).12-25641
08/15/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Answer to writ petition due: September 14, 2012.12-25711
09/14/2012MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time to File Answer to Petition for Writ (Second Request).12-29079
09/18/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The State shall have until September 21, 2012, to file and serve the answer.12-29458
09/20/2012Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus.12-29784
09/20/2012AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix Vol. 1.12-29790
09/20/2012AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix Vol. 2.12-29791
09/20/2012AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix Vol. 3.12-29792
12/21/2012Order/DispositionalFiled Order Granting Petition in Part. "ORDER the petition GRANTED IN PART AND DIRECT THE CLERK OF THIS COURT TO ISSUE A WRIT OF MANDAMUS instructing the district court to grant pretrial petition for a writ of habeas corpus with respect to the racketeering count." SNP12-MD/MG/RP12-40407
12/24/2012WritIssued Writ with letter. Original and one copy of writ and copy of order mailed to Richard A. Wright for service upon Judge Valerie Adair.12-40629
12/27/2012Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing of Order Granting Habeas Corpus Petition in Part.12-40857
01/02/2013WritFiled Returned Writ. Original Writ returned. Served on Judge Valerie Adair on December 27, 2012.13-00116
01/31/2013Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c).13-03314
02/25/2013RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.13-05862
02/25/2013Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.