Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
20-44921: This document is currently unavailable. If you need a copy of this document, please contact Clerk's Office at (775)684-1600.
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81257
Short Caption:HARRIS, JR. (FREDERICK) VS. STATE C/W 81255Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:81255*, 81257Related Case(s):69093, 69093-COA, 81255, 81255-COA, 81257-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A784704, C291374Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/10/2020How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/01/2020Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
06/01/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)20-20516
06/08/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. (SC)20-21425
07/02/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Request Transcripts. Due date: 10 days. (SC)20-24629
07/13/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Consolidate Supreme Court Case 81257 with 81255. (SC).20-25675
07/20/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 6/6/19, 6/20/19, 8/6/19, and 4/23/19. To Court Reporter: Kristine Santi. (SC)20-26395
07/22/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Sara Richardson stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 06/06/19, 06/20/19, 08/06/19 and 04/23/20. (SC)20-26732
07/28/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Consolidating Appeals. Appellant shall have until September 29, 2020, to file and serve a combined opening brief and appendix. Nos. 81255/81257. (SC)20-27418
09/10/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. Nos. 81255/81257. (SC)20-33372
09/10/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice - Motion Approved. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: October 28, 2020. Nos. 81255/81257. (SC)20-33375
10/28/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Opening Brief. Nos. 81255/81257. (SC)20-39547
10/29/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. Nos. 81255/81257. (SC)20-39620
10/29/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 1. Nos. 81255/81257. (SC)20-39622
10/29/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 2. Nos. 81255/81257. (SC)20-39623
10/29/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 3. Nos. 81255/81257. (SC)20-39624
10/29/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 4. Nos. 81255/81257. (SC)20-39627
10/29/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 5. Nos. 81255/81257. (SC)20-39631
10/29/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 6. Nos. 81255/81257. (SC)20-39633
10/29/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 7. Nos. 81255/81257. (SC)20-39635
10/29/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 8. Nos. 81255/81257. (SC)20-39637
10/29/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 9. Nos. 81255/81257. (SC)20-39640
10/29/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 10. Nos. 81255/81257. (SC)20-39641
10/29/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 11. Nos. 81255/81257. (SC)20-39643
10/29/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's motion requesting a second extension of time to file the opening brief is granted. The opening brief and appendix were filed on October 29, 2020. Respondent shall have until November 30, 2020, to file and serve the answering brief. Nos. 81255/81257. (SC)20-39667
11/30/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. Nos. 81255/81257. (SC)20-43276
12/10/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Reply to Respondent's Answering Brief. Nos. 81255/81257. (SC)20-44921
12/10/2020Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision. Nos. 81255/81257. (SC)
01/15/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. Nos. 81255/81257. (SC).21-01492
01/15/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Court of Appeals. Nos. 81255/81257. (SC).
06/07/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Nos. 81255/81257. Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (SC)
07/02/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals. (SC)
07/02/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-19061
07/02/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
07/23/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 6, 2021. Nos. 81255/81257. (SC)21-19061