Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
11-12217: This document is currently unavailable. If you need a copy of this document, please contact Clerk's Office at (775)684-1600.
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 55818
Short Caption:FITZGERALDS CASINO/HOTEL VS. MOGGCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):65580
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A594516 Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:04/14/2010 / Worrell, CarolynSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/06/2011How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/14/2010Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).)10-09737
04/14/2010Filing Fee Filing Fee due. Filing fee will be fowarded by the District Court.
04/14/2010Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell10-09783
04/16/2010Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard - check no. 1317.
04/16/2010Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Receipt of Copy- Notice of Assignment into Settlement.10-10065
05/06/2010Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.10-11764
05/17/2010Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 5/24/1010-12745
09/02/2010Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: September 17, 2010.10-22524
09/22/2010Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.10-24453
09/24/2010Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix.10-24604
09/28/2010Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 2/01/10. To Court Reporter: Janie Olsen.10-25008
01/19/2011MotionFiled Stipulation Extending Briefing Schedule.11-01875
01/21/2011AppendixFiled Joint Appendix.11-02181
02/01/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order Approving Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. The clerk of this court shall file the opening brief received on January 21, 2011.11-03125
02/01/2011BriefFiled Opening Brief.11-03126
02/02/2011Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Receipt of Copy Mogg for the Opening Brief.11-03378
02/24/2011MotionFiled Stipulation and Order granting Extension of Time to file the Answering Brief. Answering Brief due date: March 22, 2011.11-05768
03/24/2011BriefFiled Answering Brief.11-09041
04/25/2011BriefFiled Appellants' Reply Brief.11-12217
04/25/2011Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
07/06/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting Appeal for Decision without Oral Argument.11-20020
07/06/2011Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
11/18/2011Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Reversal and Remand. "We reverse the district court's order denying judicial review, and we remand this matter with instructions that the district court, in turn, remand the matter to the apeals officer."11-35771
12/19/2011RemittiturIssued Remittitur.11-38973
12/19/2011Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed
12/28/2011RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on December 23, 2011.11-38973