The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 71503
Short Caption:ARCELLA VS. ARCELLA (CHILD CUSTODY)Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Fast Track Child Custody
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D418160Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: En Banc
Replacement:Expedited
To SP/Judge:10/21/2016 / Gaston, RobertSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:09/07/2017 at 11:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:09/07/2017How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/17/2016Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Bruce I. Shapiro, Ltd. Check no. 10023.
10/17/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SEALED).
10/17/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.16-32307
10/21/2016Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Robert E. Gaston.16-33097
11/07/2016Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement16-34706
11/07/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge - Docketing Statement.16-34708
11/08/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Mailing (Docketing Statement served on Settlement Judge).16-34826
11/10/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. (SEALED)
11/22/2016Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Cross-Appeal.
11/22/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for cross-appellant.) (SEALED).
11/22/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (CROSS-APPEAL)16-36450
11/22/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days. (CROSS-APPEAL)16-36452
11/28/2016Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Law Offices of F. Peter James. Check no. 1549.
11/30/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Case Appeal Statement.16-37063
11/30/2016TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Kim Gurule stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 08/04/16, 09/13/16.16-37088
12/05/2016Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.16-37585
12/12/2016Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.16-38403
12/20/2016MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Leave to File Untimely Docketing Statement. (DETACHED DOCKETING STATEMENT AND FILED SEPARATELY PER ORDER).16-39562
12/23/2016Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated Pursuant to NRAP3E. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant/Cross-Respondent and Respondent/Cross-Appellant each: 10 days transcript request; Appellant/Cross-Respondent: 40 days fast track statement and appendix. Respondent shall have 20 days from the service of appellant's fast track statement to file and serve a combined fast track response on appeal and fast track statement on cross-appeal. See NRAP 3E(d)(2). Thereafter, appellant shall have 20 days from service of respondent's combined fast track response on appeal and fast track statement on cross-appeal to file a fast track response on cross-appeal. The clerk shall detach and file the docketing statement submitted with respondent's motion.16-40013
12/23/2016Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement Child Custody.16-40080
12/23/2016Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.16-40096
12/23/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement, Volume I, Part 1.16-40106
12/23/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement, Volume I, Part 2.16-40107
12/23/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement, Volume 2.16-40108
01/04/2017Transcript RequestFiled Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Certificate of No Transcript Request.17-00169
01/04/2017Transcript RequestFiled Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Certificate of No Transcript Request.17-00227
01/12/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Fast Track Response on appeal and the Fast Track Statement on cross appeal due: January 19, 2017.17-01287
01/20/2017Fast Track BriefFiled Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Child Custody Fast Track Response / Fast Track Statement on Cross Appeal.17-02244
01/20/2017AppendixFiled Respondent's / Cross-Appellant's Appendix.17-02245
01/20/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service (Respondent's / Cross-Appellant's Appendix).17-02246
02/10/2017Fast Track BriefFiled Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Response to Fast Track Statement on Cross Appeal.17-04793
02/10/2017Case Status UpdateFast Track Briefing Completed.
04/25/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.17-13608
07/19/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Thursday, September 7, 2017, at 11:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City.17-23912
08/22/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.17-28122
09/07/2017Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. "Before the En Banc Court."
09/18/2017Filing FeeReturned Fee. Check No. 1733 returned to Law Offices of F Peter James in the amount of $40.00. (Attorney sent in fee for audio of oral argument, he wanted video not audio. He asked to have check returned.)
12/26/2017Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and Remanded with Instructions." Before the Court EN BANC. Author: Stiglich J. Majority: Stiglich/Cherry/Douglas/Gibbons/Pickering/Hardesty/Parraguirre. 133 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 104.17-44426
01/22/2018RemittiturIssued Remittitur.18-02938
01/22/2018Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/02/2018RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on January 26, 2018.18-02938