Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
20-31906: This document is currently unavailable. If you need a copy of this document, please contact Clerk's Office at (775)684-1600.
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81563
Short Caption:GREEN (TRANDON) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):81563-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C325044
Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A789657
Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Direct
Disqualifications:CadishCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/31/2020Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
07/31/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement and Notice of Briefing Schedule mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)20-28026
07/31/2020OtherJustice Elissa Cadish disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Sat in District Court Proceedings. (SC)
08/13/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. (SC)20-29902
08/13/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 08/22/18. To Court Reporter: Takas De'Awna. (SC)20-29907
08/28/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Docketing Statement. (SC)20-31906
08/31/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 06/25/18, 06/26/18, 06/27/18, 06/28/18, 06/29/18, 07/02/18, 07/03/18 and 08/22/18. (SC) To Court Reporter: DeAwna Takas. (SC)20-32092
09/08/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Recorder De'Awna Takas stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 8/22/18. (SC)20-32971
09/09/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until September 21, 2020, to file and serve the docketing statement. (SC)20-33187
09/21/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Docketing Statement. (SC)20-34569
09/23/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's docketing statement due: October 21, 2020. (SC)20-34994
10/16/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. De'Awna Takas stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 06/25/18, 06/26/18, 06/27/18, 06/28/18, 06/29/18, 07/02/18, 07/03/18 and 08/22/18. (SC)20-38139
10/20/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Docketing Statement. (SC)20-38411
10/21/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until November 4, 2020, to file and serve the docketing statement. (SC)20-38577
11/04/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. (SC)20-40204
12/15/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Opening Brief and Appendix. Due Date: 15 days. (SC)20-45417
12/30/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-46965
12/30/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix - Volume 1. (SC)20-46967
01/29/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (John T. Niman, Deputy District Attorney as counsel for respondent). (SC)21-02751
01/29/2021MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Enlargement of Time (First Request) (Answering Brief). (SC)21-02752
02/03/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent shall have until March 1, 2021, to file and serve the answering brief. (SC)21-03332
02/26/2021BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)21-05800
04/13/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
05/05/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC).21-12872
05/05/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Court of Appeals. (SC).
07/21/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (SC)
08/16/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals. (SC)
08/16/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-23800
08/16/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
09/07/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 17, 2021. (SC)21-23800