Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 42403
Short Caption:GARCIA (RAMON) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):44006, 47059, 48123, 56137, 62119, 65158, 65777, 69458, 70604, 70604-COA, 71005, 71005-COA, 71006, 71006-COA, 80987, 80988
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C178581Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:DouglasCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:03/14/2005 at 11:30 AMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas Office
Submission Date:03/14/2005How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/25/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
11/25/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)03-19699
12/11/2003Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.03-20625
12/19/2003Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 10/04/01, 10/18/01, 01/17/02, 01/23/02, 03/21/02, 016/13/02, 08/01/02, 08/08/02, 01/28/03, 02/11/03, 02/25/03, 06/05/03, 06/12/03, 08/07/03, 08/12/03, 08/21/03, 08/26/03, 08/27/03, 08/28/03, 08/29/03, 09/02/03, 09/03/03, 09/04/03, 09/05/03, 10/23/03. To Court Reporter: Kit McDonald.03-21138
01/12/2004TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 10/04/01; 10/18/01; 01/17/02; 03/21/02; 06/13/02; 08/01/02; and 08/08/02. Court Reporters: Carrie Hansen and Cathy Nelson.04-00662
02/11/2004MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (Kit MacDonald).04-02733
02/24/2004Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed February 11, 2004. Ms. MacDonald shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file and serve the transcripts for proceedings conducted on January 23, 2003, January 28, 2003, February 11, 2003, February 25, 2003, June 5, 2003, June 12, 2003, August 7, 2003, August 12, 2003, August 21, 2003, August 26, 2003, August 27, 2003, August 28, 2003, August 29, 2003, September 2, 2003, September 3, 2003, September 4, 2003, September 5, 2003, and October 23, 2003.04-03501
03/16/2004TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 01/23/03; 01/28/03; 02/25/03; 06/05/03; 06/12/03; 08/07/03; 08/21/03; 08/26/03; 08/27/03 (10:30 a.m.) 08/27/03 (3:00 p.m.); 08/28/03; 08/29/03; 09/05/03; and 10/23/03. Court Reporter: Kit MacDonald.04-04948
03/24/2004TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: February 11, 2003. Court Reporter: Kit Macdonald.04-05517
03/25/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Certificate of Acknowledgement. Transcript of 8/12/03 vacated. Transcripts of 8/7/03 and 9/2/03/9/3/03 were reported by Cindy Caldwell. 9/4/03 Jury Deliberation - no court proceedings.04-05638
03/29/2004TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 09/02/03 and 09/03/03. Court Reporter: Cindy Caldwell.04-05821
04/16/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. court reporter Kit McDonald has filed a certificate which indicates that no proceedings were conducted on August 12, 2003, and that a court reporter/recorder was not present on September 4, 2003. Our review of the district court minute entries indicates that Ms. McDonald is correct. Accordingly, we conclude that Ms. McDonald is not obligated to file transcripts for those dates.04-07044
04/19/2004OtherDisqualification of Justice Douglas. Sat in district court proceedings.
04/30/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. to file Opening Brief. To date, appellant has failed to file the opening brief and appendix. Appellant shall, within 15 days from the date of this order, file and serve the opening brief and appendix.04-07932
05/17/2004MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time to file Opening Brief.04-09115
05/27/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed May 17, 2004. Appellant shall have until June 16, 2004, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. No further extensions of time shall be permitted absent demonstration of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. Counsel's caseload will not be deemed such a circumstance.04-09771
06/10/2004BriefFiled Opening Brief.04-10791
06/10/2004AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief.04-10792
07/13/2004MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: August 11, 2004.04-12702
08/16/2004BriefFiled Answering Brief.04-14777
09/28/2004Case Status Update Briefing Completed. No reply brief filed.
01/25/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on March 14, 2005, at 11:30 a.m. (SNP05-RR/MG/JH)
03/04/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
03/14/2005Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. SNP05-RR/MG/JH
06/23/2005Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed in part and reversed in part." Before Rose, Gibbons and Hardesty, JJ. Author: Rose, J. We concur: Gibbons and Hardesty, JJ. 121 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 33. SNP0505-12337
07/19/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur.05-12879
07/19/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/28/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 21, 2005.05-12879
03/05/2018OtherReturned Unfiled Proper Person Document - "Motion for Reconsideration Based on Supreme Court Ruling in Case No. 42403."18-08645