Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 44006
Short Caption:GARCIA (JUAN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):42403, 47059, 48123, 56137, 62119, 65158, 65777, 69458, 70604, 70604-COA, 71005, 71005-COA, 71006, 71006-COA, 80987, 80988
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C178581Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/03/2004How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/27/2004Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/27/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.04-17849
10/22/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 30 days. See NRAP 11(a)(2) (the complete record shall contain each and every paper, pleading and other document filed, or submitted for filing, in the district court, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings.) fn1[The record shall not include any physical, non-documentary exhibits or the original documentary exhibits filed in the district court, but copies of documentary exhibits submitted in the district court proceedings shall be transmitted as part of the record on appeal. The record shall also include any presentence investigation reports submitted in this matter. The clerk of the district court shall transmit the reports to this court in a sealed envelope identifying the contents and marked confidential.] Nos. 43939/ 43976/ 44001/ 44004/ 44006 - cases are not consolidated.04-19598
11/03/2004Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 6.04-20245
11/03/2004Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
12/14/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. The State shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be remanded to the district court for an evidentiary hearing.04-22789
01/18/2005MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause.05-01016
02/11/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order of Reversal and Remand. We conclude that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted in this matter. 'ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." fn8[This order constitutes our final disposition of this appeal. Any subsequent appeal from an order of the district court denying Garcia's appeal deprivation claim and the claims not reached in this order shall be docketed as a new matter. We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter. We conclude that Garcia is entitled only to the relief described herein.] NNP05-NB/WM/RP05-02762
03/08/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur.05-03269
03/08/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/21/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 10, 2005.05-03269