Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 44093
Short Caption:WHEATON (SHAUNTAY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):37531, 37553, 40150, 42638, 46213, 46887, 51332, 53085, 62069, 62372, 66079, 66080, 66428, 66428-COA, 66773, 66773-COA, 69542, 70017, 70017-COA, 76899, 82127, 82127-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C156542Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/26/2005How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/18/2004Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/18/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)04-19283
11/29/2004Docketing StatementReceived Docketing Statement.04-21663
11/29/2004Transcript RequestReceived Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 09/20/04. Court Reporter: Sonia Riley.04-21665
02/15/2005MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: March 18, 2005.05-03044
03/21/2005MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time.05-05446
03/31/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On November 29, 2004, we received a copy of a transcript request form and the docketing statement. Appellant has failed to file a motion for an extension of time for their late filing. We direct the clerk to file the late docketing statement and transcript request form. We admonish appellant's counsel for failing to file a motion for leave to file the late documents.05-06372
03/31/2005Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.04-21663
03/31/2005Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: September 20, 2004. To Court Reporter: Sonia Riley.04-21665
05/19/2005MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time.05-09815
05/31/2005BriefReceived Opening Brief. Received original plus three copies of brief.05-10582
07/13/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Regarding Transcript and Granting Extensions of Time. fn1[A copy of the transcript request form is attached to this order.] Court reporter Sonia Riley-Bennett shall have 20 days from the date of this order to prepare and file the transcript of proceedings held on September 20, 2004. If more time is needed, Ms. Riley-Bennett shall file a motion requesting an extension of time. If the requested transcript cannot be produced, Ms. Riley-Bennett shall notify this court, in writing, of this fact. The clerk shall file the opening brief and appendix received on May 31, 2005. The clerk shall also file the answering brief received on July 11, 2005. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve a reply brief, if deemed necessary.05-13945
07/13/2005BriefFiled Opening Brief.05-10582
07/13/2005AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volumes 1 through 3.05-10583
07/13/2005BriefFiled Answering Brief.05-13732
07/20/2005TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 9/20/04. Court Reporter: Sonia Riley.05-14412
08/15/2005MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: September 12, 2005.05-16054
09/13/2005MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (second request-11 days requested)05-18053
09/14/2005Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed September 13, 2005. Appellant shall have until September 23, 2005, to file and serve the reply brief.05-18158
09/26/2005BriefFiled Reply Brief.05-19024
09/26/2005Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
03/24/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED and REMAND this matter to the district court for the limited purpose of correcting the judgment of conviction." SNP06-WM/MG/JH06-06292
04/18/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur.06-07120
04/18/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/05/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 21, 2006.06-07120