Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 44372
Short Caption:O'KEEFE (BRIAN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):44644, 48673, 49329, 65040, 66785, 81867, 81867-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C202793Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/10/2004Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
12/10/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.)04-22576
01/07/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." fn1[This dismissal is without prejudice to appellant's right to file and perfect a timely appeal following the district court's pronouncement of the sentence.] NNP05-WM/MD/RP05-00363
01/13/2005Other Returned Mail. Order Dismissing Appeal addressed to Brian O'Keefe returned. No forwarding address.
01/31/2005Other Other. Re-mailed a copy of the Order Dismissing Appeal addressed to Brian O'Keefe. He called and gave us an updated address.
02/01/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur.05-01057
02/01/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/07/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 4, 2005.05-01057