Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 44644
Short Caption:O'KEEFE (BRIAN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):44372, 48673, 49329, 65040, 66785
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C202793Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/07/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
02/07/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.)05-02412
03/09/2005MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time.05-04761
03/21/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed March 9, 2005. Counsel for appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix.05-05424
04/20/2005MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time for Filing Fast Track Statement.05-07637
04/20/2005TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: October 26, 2004, October 27, 2004 and October 28, 2004. Court Reporter: Lisa Makowski.
04/25/2005Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 10/25/04, 10/26/04, 10/27/04, 10/28/04, and 12/27/04. Court Reporter: M. Cook and L. Makowski. Filed in district court on: 03/03/05.05-08153
05/09/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed April 20, 2005. Court reporter or recorder Lisa Makowski shall file the requested transcripts within 10 days of this order. Appellant shall have 20 days from the filing of the transcripts to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix05-09005
05/13/2005TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 10/25/04 and 10/26/04. Court Reporter: Julie Lever.
05/17/2005Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from Court Reporter Lisa Makowski regarding the transcript for October 25, 2004.05-09622
05/19/2005Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from Court Reporter Lisa Makowski regarding the transcript for October 26, 2004.05-09874
06/06/2005MotionFiled Motion. James L. Buchanan.05-11025
06/06/2005Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. THE FAST TRACK STATEMENT STRICKEN BY ORDER 06/17/05
06/06/2005AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. THE FAST TRACK APPENDIX STRICKEN BY ORDER 06/17/05
06/09/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order. a review of the rough draft transcripts request form reveals that it was not served on the correct court reporter or recorder. Counsel for appellant is ordered to file a rough draft transcript request form within 5 days of this order, and file 2 copies of the transcript request form and proof of service on court reporter or recorder Cheryl Gardner in this court within 10 days of this order.05-11405
06/15/2005TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 12/27/04. Court Reporter: Cheryl Gardner.
06/17/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Striking Fast Track Statement and Appendix. On June 6, 2005, counsel for appellant filed a fast track statement and appendix. Because of the deficiencies in the fast track statement and appendix, the clerk of this court shall strike the fast track statement and appendix filed on June 6, 2005. On June 6, 2005, counsel for appellant also filed a motion to withdraw as counsel in this appeal. Counsel may not withdraw until he has fulfilled the obligations placed on trial counsel by NRAP 3C(b). Counsel must first file a fast track statement and appendix that comport with the provisions of NRAP 3C in this court. The motion to withdraw is therefore denied. Counsel for appellant shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file a fast track statement and appendix. Thereafter, this appeal shall proceed in accordance with the provisions of NRAP 3C.05-11964
06/20/2005Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). (Notice of Filing Proof of Request for Rough Draft Transcript). Transcripts requested: 12/27/04. Court Reporter: Renee Silvaggio/Joann Orduna. Filed in district court on: 06/15/05.05-12057
07/11/2005Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement.05-13666
07/11/2005AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement.
07/28/2005Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response.05-15039
10/07/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order. This court has reviewed all documents submitted in proper person, and concludes no relief is warranted. Appellant is represented by counsel and we decline to grant appellant permission to file documents in proper person. Any further proper person documents submitted by appellant shall be returned to appellant, unfiled.05-19882
01/23/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP06-MD/NB/RP06-01588
02/17/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur.06-01928
02/17/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/02/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 21, 2006.06-01928