Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 45195
Short Caption:G7P&T VS. JOHNSONCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A487950Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:ParraguirreCase Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:05/11/2005 / Buchanan, WilliamSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/06/2005Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Harrison Kemp & Jones, LLP--check no. 45626.
05/06/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)05-08970
05/11/2005Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William F. Buchanan. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
05/25/2005Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge.05-10266
06/02/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. of Docketing Statement on Settlement Judge.05-10857
06/20/2005Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.05-12096
06/23/2005Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1).05-12384
07/14/2005Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 09/08/04, 10/13/04 and 03/28/05. To Court Reporter: Nelson & Nelson.05-14072
07/25/2005Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Amended Request for Transcripts. Transcripts requested: 09/08/04, 10/13/04 and 03/28/05. To Court Reporter: Nelson & Nelson.05-14713
08/19/2005TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: October 13, 2004. Court Reporter: Bill Nelson.05-16523
09/19/2005MotionFiled Motion. Respondent's Motion to Require Appellant to Post a Supersedeas Bond (Emergency Relief Requested.)05-18586
09/26/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Denying Motion to Require Supersedeas Bond. Respondents have filed a motion to require appellant to post a supersedeas bond. We deny the motion.05-19041
09/28/2005MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Respondents' Motion to Require Appellant to Post a Supersedeas Bond.05-19199
10/04/2005MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: October 24, 2005. Parties have also stipulated that Respondent's Answering Brief shall be due on December 23, 2005.05-19641
10/26/2005BriefFiled Opening Brief.05-21256
10/26/2005AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Vols. 1 and 2.05-21257
11/15/2005OtherDisqualification of Justice Parraguirre. Law firm of Harrison Kemp & Jones, LLP.
11/18/2005Order/Procedural Order. fn1[A copy of the transcript request form is attached to this order.] Transcripts due: 20 days. If more time is needed, Mr. Nelson shall, within the same time period, file a motion requesting an extension of time or if the transcripts cannot be produced, notify this court, in writing, of this fact.05-22832
12/22/2005MotionFiled Stipulation.05-24961
01/11/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. and Regarding Transcripts. We relieve Mr. Nelson of the obligation of filing transcripts of September 8, 2004, and March 28, 2005. We have received all available transcripts that were requested. We elect to treat the stipulation filed December 22, 2005 as a joint motion, and grant the motion. Answering brief due: January 30, 2006. No further extensions of time shall be permitted absent demonstration of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances.06-00750
01/17/2006Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from court reporter Jackie Nelson regarding transcripts.06-01160
01/23/2006MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time.06-01652
02/15/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Answering brief of Douglas R. Johnson, Debra A. Johnson, Phillip J. Andrews and Johnson Investment, LLC due: March 1, 2006. Answering brief of JAMD, Inc. and Tarkanian Family Ltd. Partnership due: 7 days. No further extensions of time shall be permitted absent demonstration of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances.06-03347
03/02/2006BriefFiled Answering Brief. Respondents Johnsons and Andrews.06-04703
03/24/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order. to file answering brief, joinder, or notice that no brief will be filed. Due: 10 days (JAMD). Reply brief if necessary due: 30 days from service of answering brief. We caution counsel for JAMD that failure to comply timely with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions agaisnt counsel.06-06278
05/17/2006MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Stipulation to Dismiss Appeal without Prejudice.06-10383
08/16/2006Order/CounselFiled Order/Sanctions. Imposing Sanctions and Disapproving Stipulation to Dismiss Appeal. Mr. Tarkanian was listed on this court's docket as counsel for JAMD, Inc. and Tarkanian Family Ltd. Partnership. To date Mr. Tarkanian has failed to comply with our March 2006, order. Mr. Tarkanian's continuing failure to comply with orders of this court warrants the imposition of monetary sanctions. Mr. Tarkanian shall have 15 days from the date of this order to personally pay the sum of $300.00 to the Supreme Court Law Library and file proof of such payment with the clerk of this court. Failure to comply timely with these directives may result in the imposition of additional sanctions, including further monetary sanctions and referral to the State Bar of Nevada. On May 17, 2006, the parties filed a stipulation to dismiss this appeal "without prejudice." Because the stipulation appears not to have been signed by an active member of the State Bar of Nevada on behalf of JAMD and because it purports to dismiss this appeal with prejudice, we disapprove the stipulation. Appellant shall have 10 days to file an appropriate motion or stipulation to dismiss this appeal or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. Failure to timely comply with this order may result in the dismissal of this appeal as abandoned. Maupin and Gibbons, JJ. Hardesty, J., dissenting.06-17111
08/25/2006MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. With Prejudice.06-17745
08/31/2006MotionFiled Motion. Daniel J. Tarkanian's Motion to Reconsider and for Rehearing Regarding Order Imposing Sanctions and Disapproving Stipulation to Dismiss Appeal.06-18116
09/11/2006Other Returned Mail. Order filed 08/16/06 sent by certified mail addressed to Daniel Tarkanian returned. No forwarding address.
09/13/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). SNP/CLK06-18852
09/13/2006Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.
10/11/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. to Reconsider Sanctions. On August 16, 2006, this court entered an order sanctioning attorney Daniel J. Tarkanian $300 for failing to respond to two prior orders issued by this court. fn3[The August 16, 2006, sanction order was also sent to the Campbell circle address, this time by regular and certified mail. The order sent by certified mail was returned by the U.S. Postal Service with a notation that it was unclaimed and could not be forwarded. A copy of the returned envelope is attached to this order.] The monetary sanction in this case is appropriate given the circumstances. We deny the motion for reconsideration. fn4[The Honorable A. William Maupin, Justice, did not participate in the resolution of this motion due to illness.]06-20860