Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 47130
Short Caption:NASBY (BRENDAN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):35319, 58579, 67476, 67580, 67704, 68039, 70626, 70626-COA, 73412, 73412-COA, 80443, 80443-COA, 81484, 81484-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C154293Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Gibbons, SaittaCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Justice Maupin for Justice SaittaPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/06/2007How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/18/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
04/18/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.06-08093
05/11/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order re: Transmit Judgment or Order and Record on Appeal. Order due: 30 days. Record on appeal due: 60 days.06-09958
05/19/2006Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of Findings of Fact, Conclusion of Law and Order filed in district court on April 26, 2006.06-10629
05/31/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)06-11449
05/31/2006OtherDisqualification of Justice Gibbons.
06/19/2006Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.06-12742
06/23/2006TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: November 9, 2005 and March 27, 2006. Court Reporter: JoAnn Pierpont.06-13080
06/23/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On May 24, 2006, attorney Anthony P. Sgro filed a notice of appeal on appellant's behalf. As Mr. Sgro is now representing appellant this is no longer a proper person appeal. We vacate the portion of our May 11, 2006, order that directed the district court to transmit the record on appeal. Appellant: transcript request due 15 days; opening brief and appendix due 120 days.06-13097
07/18/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Request Transcripts.
08/01/2006Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. Certificate Re: No Further Transcript to Be Requested.06-15966
10/18/2006MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: November 22, 2006.06-21465
11/28/2006BriefFiled Opening Brief.06-24280
11/28/2006AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 through 4.06-24282
11/28/2006OtherDisqualification of Justice Saitta. Sat in district court proceedings.
01/03/2007BriefFiled Answering Brief.07-00123
02/07/2007MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: February 27, 2007.07-03078
03/06/2007Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. No reply brief filed.
03/19/2007BriefReceived Reply Brief.07-06222
03/23/2007MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (Second Request)07-06623
03/28/2007Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the reply brief received on March 19, 2007.07-06949
03/28/2007BriefFiled Reply Brief.07-06222
06/18/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP07-WM/RP/JH07-13205
07/13/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur.07-13657
07/13/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/19/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 16, 2007.07-13657