Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 48673
Short Caption:O'KEEFE (BRIAN) VS. STATE C/W 49329Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:48673*, 49329Related Case(s):44372, 44644, 49329, 65040, 66785, 81867, 81867-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C202793Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/09/2007How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/30/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
12/30/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.06-26754
01/12/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Judgment/Order Appealed from filed 1/5/07. Due Date: 10 days
01/22/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified Order/Judgment filed in district court on January 5, 2007 (submitted in response to notice of January 12, 2007).07-01567
02/02/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days.07-02767
04/09/2007Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 3.07-07857
04/09/2007Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
03/24/2008Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgments of the district court AFFIRMED." We elect to consolidate theses appeals for disposition. fn1[We have considered the record on appeal filed in Docket No. 48673 when resolving the appeal in Docket No. 49329.] fn20[We have reviewed all documents that O'Keefe has submitted in proper person to the clerk of this court in these matters, and we conclude that no relief based upon those submissions is warranted. To the extent that O'Keefe has attempted to present claims or facts in those submissions which were not previously presented in the proceedings below, we have declined to consider them in the first intsatnce.] SNP08-JH/RP/MD. Nos. 48673/49329.08-07104
04/18/2008RemittiturIssued Remittitur.08-08059
04/18/2008Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/28/2008RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 21, 2008.08-08059