Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 49329
Short Caption:O'KEEFE (BRIAN) VS. STATE C/W 48673Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:48673*, 49329Related Case(s):44372, 44644, 48673, 65040, 66785, 81867, 81867-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C202793Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/06/2008How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/23/2007Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
04/23/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.07-09049
05/08/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order re: Entry Written Judgment or Order. The district court shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to: (1) enter a written judgment or order or (2) inform this court that it is reconsidering its decision. In the event the district court enters a written judgment or order (or has already entered a written judgment or order of which this court is unaware), the clerk of the district court shall immediately transmit a certified copy of the judgment or order to the clerk of this court.07-10173
05/23/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of Findings of Fact Conclusions of Law and Order filed in district court on May 17, 2007.07-11355
10/19/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. If the transcripts have not been prepared and filed below court reporters Kangas and Makowski: 30 days to file the transcripts in the district court. District court clerk: 45 days to transmit to the clerk of this court a record on appeal containing certified copies of any documents filed in this matter since April 5, 2007, and certified copies of the transcripts for the proceedings conducted on July 13, 2004, October 8, 2004, and October 25, 2004.07-23068
11/06/2007TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Rachelle Hamilton stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 07/13/04 and 10/08/04.07-24249
12/05/2007Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from Clark County District Court concerning the transmission of the ROA.07-26298
12/20/2007Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from court reporter Julie Lever concerning the order of 10/19/07.07-27617
01/03/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Re: Supplemental Record. We vacate this court's order directing court reporter Makowski to prepare and file the October 25, 2004, transcript. Court reporter Lever: 20 days to file in the district court a complete transcript of the hearing conducted on October 25, 2004. District court: 30 days to transmit to this court a supplemental record on appeal that contains certified copies of the transcripts for the proceedings conducted on July 13, 2004, October 8, 2004, and October 25, 2004, along with any other documents filed in this matter since April 5, 2007.08-00215
02/06/2008Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vol. 4.08-02924
02/06/2008Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
02/08/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Court reporter Julie Lever.08-03205
02/27/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion. Court reporter Julie Lever shall have 10 days to file the transcript for October 25, 2004, in the district court. The district court clerk shall have 10 days from the date the transcript is filed to transmit a certified copy of it to this court as a supplemental record.08-04775
02/27/2008Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vol. 5.08-04803
03/24/2008Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgments of the district court AFFIRMED." We elect to consolidate theses appeals for disposition. fn1[We have considered the record on appeal filed in Docket No. 48673 when resolving the appeal in Docket No. 49329.] fn20[We have reviewed all documents that O'Keefe has submitted in proper person to the clerk of this court in these matters, and we conclude that no relief based upon those submissions is warranted. To the extent that O'Keefe has attempted to present claims or facts in those submissions which were not previously presented in the proceedings below, we have declined to consider them in the first intsatnce.] SNP08-JH/RP/MD. Nos. 48673/49329.08-07107
04/18/2008RemittiturIssued Remittitur.08-08060
04/18/2008Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/28/2008RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 21, 2008.08-08060