Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 49947
Short Caption:JOSHLIN (PIERRE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):50052, 58881, 62241, 66844, 77751
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C228460Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/26/2010How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/02/2007Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/02/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)07-17046
08/02/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days07-17047
10/04/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Directing Appellant to File Documents. Case Appeal Statement, Request for Transcripts, and Docketing Statement due: 10 days. Counsel cautioned.07-21957
11/15/2007MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Withdraw as attorney of Record and Motion for Appointment of Appellate Counsel.07-24931
01/15/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We grant the motion to withdraw. We remand this appeal for the limited purpose of securing counsel for appellant. District court order due: 35 days.08-01082
02/28/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. addressed to Hon. David B. Barker concerning the appointment of counsel. District court order appointing counsel due 04/02/08.08-04979
03/31/2008Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Copy of minute order entered in district court on 03/26/08.08-08014
04/02/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Appointed Counsel. Docketing statement due: 15 days. Request for transcripts: 15 days. Opening brief: 120 days. (Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)08-08214
06/03/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Conditionally Imposing Sanctions. Conditional Sanction of $500.00 due: 15 days or docketing statement and transcript request form or motion due: 10 days.08-13989
07/03/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. to date, Mr. Parris has not filed the transcript request form, the docketing statement, or a motion for an extension of time, nor has he provided this court with proof of payment of the sanction. Accordingly, the conditional sanction imposed in our June 3, 2008, order remains in effect. Mr. Parris shall have seven days from the date of this order to file and serve the transcript request form , the docketing statement, and provide the court with proof of payment of the $500.00 sanction. Failure to comply with this order may result in referral of Mr. Parris to the State Bar of Nevada for investigation.08-16957
09/05/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Order Imposing Additional Sanctions, Removing Counsel and Remanding for Appointment of New Counsel. We conclude that attorney John Parris' continued disregard of this court's procedural rules and the notice and orders entered in this matter warrants the imposition of additional sanctions. We refer this matter to the State Bar of Nevada for investigation pursuant to SCR 105. Bar counsel shall, within 90 days of the date of this order, inform this court of the status or results of the investigation and any disciplinary proceedings. Further, we remove Mr. Parris as counsel of record for appellant in this appeal. We remand this appeal for the limited purpose of securing counsel for appellant. District court order due: 35 days. Briefing and compliance with NRAP 9 and 14 are hereby suspended pending further order of this court. Attorney John P. Parris' sanction of $500.00 due: 7 days. Fn4[The clerk shall provide bar counsel with copies of this court's notice issued on April 2, 2008, and orders entered on June 3, 2008, and July 3, 2008.]08-22871
09/16/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Payment of Sanction. -Copy of Letter with copy of check for $500.00 from attorney John Parris addressed to the Supreme Court Law Library.08-23892
10/09/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. of Appearance. Karen A. Connolly as counsel for appellant.08-26055
10/15/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Reinstating Briefing. Appellant: 15 days to file a transcript request form and a docketing statement. 90 days to file the opening brief.08-26574
11/03/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. and Transcript Request.08-28025
11/17/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion. Docketing Statement and Transcript Request Form due: December 1, 2008. Opening Brief and Appendix due: February 17, 2009.08-29193
12/01/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. and Transcript Request.08-30403
12/04/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Status Report. Investigative Report from State Bar of Nevada re attorney John P. Parris. NOTE: This original document was placed in attorney Parris' bar file. No copy was placed in the correspondence file for this case.
12/31/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Mr. Singer shall have ten days from the date of this order to transfer appellant's case file to Ms. Roys and file proof of delivery of the file in this court. Failure to comply with this order may result in referral of Mr. Singer to the State Bar of Nevada for investigation. Appellant shall have 60 days from the date of this order to file and serve the docketing statement and transcript request form. Appellant shall have 150 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). fn3-[If no transcript is to be requested, appellant shall file a certificate to that effect within the same time period.]08-33105
01/15/2009Notice/IncomingFiled Status Report. Investigative Report from State Bar of Nevada re attorney John P. Parris. NOTE: This original document was placed in attorney Parris' bar file. No copy was placed in the correspondence file for this case.
03/06/2009Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.09-05798
06/01/2009MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 09-13591
06/02/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. for extension of time. Opening brief due August 31, 2009.09-13709
09/01/2009MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Extend Length of Opening Brief and for Additional Time to Serve Appendix.09-21232
09/01/2009BriefReceived Opening Brief. Via E-Flex (FILER PER ORDER 09/08/09).
09/01/2009Notice/IncomingFiled Errata. Errata to Motion to Extend Length of Opening Brief and for Additional Time to Serve Appendix.09-21241
09/08/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the opening brief received on September 1, 2009, via E-Flex. Answering brief due: 30 days. Appellant shall have until September 8, 2009, to file and serve the appendix.09-21669
09/08/2009BriefFiled Opening Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief09-21670
09/08/2009AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volumes 1 through 8.09-21514
09/08/2009Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Receipt of Copy to Clark County District Attorney.09-21686
09/08/2009Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Receipt of Copy to Attorney General.09-21687
09/08/2009Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. -from Karen Connolly informing the court that Holly E. Roys is no longer associated with their firm.09-21752
10/09/2009MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Answering Brief (35) pages.09-24712
10/09/2009Notice/OutgoingFiled Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. The motion for excess pages for the Answering Brief is approved. 35 pages granted.09-24713
10/09/2009BriefFiled Answering Brief. 09-24714
11/30/2009Case Status Update Briefing Completed. No reply brief filed.
01/26/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein.10-02092
01/26/2010Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
03/11/2010Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP10-JH/MD/KP.10-06479
04/07/2010RemittiturIssued Remittitur.10-07041
04/07/2010Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/15/2010RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 9, 2010.10-07041