Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 50052
Short Caption:MATTHEWS (JEMAR) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):49947, 58881, 62241, 66844, 77751
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C228460Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/14/2009How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/22/2007Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/22/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)07-18648
08/28/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Counsel for appellant shall have 20 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Briefing suspended.07-18993
09/19/2007MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause.07-20678
11/20/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Reinstating Briefing. Counsel for appellant shall have 90 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix.07-25325
02/21/2008MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: March 20, 2008.08-04241
03/27/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Opening Brief and Appendix.08-07595
05/05/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Conditionally Imposing Sanctions. This matter warrants the conditional imposition of sanctions. Counsel for appellant: 15 days to pay $500.00 to the Supreme Court Law Library and provide this court with proof of such payment. This sanction shall be automatically vacated if counsel for appellant files and serves the opening brief and appendix or, alternatively, a motion to extend time, within 10 days from the date of this order.08-11072
05/19/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time.08-12575
05/19/2008Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 5/4/07, 5/7/07, 5/11/07, 6/8/07, 7/9/07. To Court Reporter: Richard Kangas.08-12577
05/19/2008Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 4/20/07. To Court Reporter: Patricia Slattery.08-12580
05/23/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief due; 90 days. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.]08-13057
06/17/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcripts-Court Reporter Richard Kangas.08-15365
06/19/2008TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Patricia Slattery stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: No dates listed.08-15699
06/19/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion. Court Recorder Richard Kangas' certificate of delivery due: July 21, 2008.08-15786
07/16/2008TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Richard Kangas stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 5/4/07, 5/7/07 through 5/11/07, 6/8/07, 7/9/07.08-18292
09/12/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Conditionally Imposing Sanctions. Conditional Sanction of $500.00 due: 15 days or opening brief and appendix or motion due: 10 days.08-23611
09/24/2008BriefFiled Opening Brief.08-24673
09/24/2008AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 through 6.
10/29/2008BriefFiled Answering Brief.08-27749
12/16/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time.08-31871
12/19/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion. Reply Brief due: December 31, 2008.08-32309
01/12/2009Case Status Update Briefing Completed. No reply brief filed.
03/31/2009MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time.09-08038
04/01/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Reply brief due 30 days.09-08235
05/14/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein.09-11947
05/14/2009Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
05/20/2009MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (14 days).09-12522
05/22/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a motion for a third extension of time to file the reply brief. The motion is denied.09-12849
06/30/2009Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP09-RP/MD/KP.09-16169
07/22/2009Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing.09-17891
09/28/2009Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c).09-23567
10/12/2009Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for En Banc Reconsideration.09-24830
11/17/2009Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC09-28021
12/15/2009RemittiturIssued Remittitur.09-30001
12/15/2009Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/31/2009RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 21, 2009.09-30001