Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 50438
Short Caption:LEAVITT (TODD) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):69218, 71495
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C079346Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:DouglasCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/16/2008How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/30/2007Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/30/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.07-23820
10/30/2007OtherDisqualification of Justice Douglas. Sat in district court proceedings.
11/20/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order re: Transmit Judgment or Order and Record on Appeal. Order due: 30 days. Record on appeal due: 60 days.07-25264
01/14/2008Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order filed in district court on January 3, 2008.08-00916
01/16/2008Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 21.08-01277
01/16/2008Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
01/24/2008Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person.08-01904
04/18/2008Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP08-WM/MC/NS.08-09712
05/13/2008RemittiturIssued Remittitur.08-09801
05/13/2008Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/23/2008RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 15, 2008.08-09801