Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 51332
Short Caption:MITCHELL (DEANGELO) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):37531, 37553, 40150, 42638, 44093, 46213, 46887, 53085, 62069, 62372, 66079, 66080, 66428, 66428-COA, 66773, 66773-COA, 69542, 70017, 70017-COA, 76899, 82127, 82127-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C156542Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/27/2008Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
03/27/2008Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.08-07583
04/09/2008MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Voluntary Dismissal of Pending Appeal.08-08842
05/05/2008Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. We direct the clerk of this court tio file appellant's April 9, 2008 motion. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP08-WM/MC/NS.08-11059
05/05/2008MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Voluntary Dismissal of Pending Appeal.08-08842
05/30/2008RemittiturIssued Remittitur.08-11787
05/30/2008Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/11/2008RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 3, 2008.08-11787