Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Combined Case Information: 52166
Short Caption:STEWART (CLARENCE) VS. DIST. CT. (STATE)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):52343, 52348, 52399, 53080, 53100, 61136, 64529
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C237890Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Certiorari/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/04/2008Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/04/2008Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. Petition for Writ of Mandamus or, in the Alternative, for Writ of Prohibition.08-20098
08/27/2008MotionFiled Motion for Stay. Petitioner's Emergency Motion for Stay of District Court Proceedings (Superseding Motion for Stay of District Court Proceedings Filed August 20, 2008).08-22015
08/28/2008Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. "We deny the petition and the motion for stay of the district court proceedings." Cherry, J. dissenting. NNP08-WM/RP/MC.08-22183
09/23/2008RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.08-22679
09/23/2008Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.