Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 52399
Short Caption:STEPHENS MEDIA, LLC VS. DIST. CT. (STATE)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):52166, 52343, 52348, 53080, 53100, 61136, 64529
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C237890Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:PickeringCase Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:03/03/2009 at 11:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:03/03/2009How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/11/2008Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
09/11/2008Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ. Emergency Petition for Writ of Prohibition, in the Alternative, Writ of Mandamus. (Filed via-fax)08-23602
09/12/2008Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Donald J. Campbell & Associates check no. 16018.
09/12/2008Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ. Emergency Petition for Writ of Prohibition, in the Alternative, Writ of Mandamus. (ORIGINAL)08-23608
09/12/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Directing Answer. Due 15 days.08-23673
09/30/2008Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. Respondent Judge Glass' Answer to Petitioner's Writ of Mandamus/Prohibition.08-25230
10/14/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Petitioner: 5 days to inform this court whether an issue exists with regard to the district court's decision.08-26481
10/21/2008MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Response to Order to Show Cause and Supplement in Support of Writ of Prohibition, in the Alternative, Writ of Mandamus.08-27018
11/05/2008Petition/WritFiled Supplement to Petition for Writ. Respondent Judge Glass' Supplemental Brief.08-28267
02/02/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes in Carson City on March 3, 2009 at 11:30 a.m. (En Banc)09-02844
02/11/2009Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from attorney Robert Lucherini explaining that he is no longer counsel of record.09-03679
02/13/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Regarding Counsel for Real Party in Interest Charles "CJ" Stewart. If Stewart wishes to be represented by counsel at the March 3, 2009, oral argument, counsel for Stewart shall enter an appearance in this proceeding by February 23, 2009.09-03969
02/17/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.09-04099
02/26/2009Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Request from Reporter Brendon Riley for cameras in the courtroom during oral argument.09-05002
02/26/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. A request having been made seeking access to the Supreme Court of Nevada for the purpose of photographic or electronic coverage of the hearing to be held on March 3, 2009, at 11:30 a.m., counsel for the parties having been advised of the request, permission is granted for photographic or electronic media coverage of the aforesaid matter, for news purposes and not for commercial exploitation.09-05104
03/03/2009Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
03/10/2009OtherDisqualification of Justice Pickering.
03/10/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Justice Disqualification. Voluntary recusal of Justice Pickering.09-06028
12/24/2009Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition Granted." Before the Court EN BANC. Fn1-[The Honorable Kristina Pickering, Justice, voluntarily recused herself from participation in the decision of this matter.] Author: Hardesty, James W.. Majority: Hardesty/Parraguirre/Douglas/Cherry/Saitta/Gibbons. 125 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 63. EN BANC.09-31219
12/24/2009WritIssued Writ. Original and one copy of writ and copy of opinion mailed to Donald J. Campbell for service upon Judge Jackie Glass.09-31260
12/30/2009MotionFiled Motion. Respondent Judge Glass' Motion for Clarification of Writ Issued on December 24, 2009.09-31509
12/30/2009WritFiled Writ. Served on Judge Jackie Glass on December 29, 2009.09-31260
01/19/2010RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.10-00068
01/19/2010Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/16/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion for Clarification. fn1[The Honorable Kristina Pickering, Justice, voluntarily recused herself from participatition in the decision of this matter.]10-04062