Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 52964
Short Caption:WITTER (WILLIAM) VS. STATE (DEATH PENALTY)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):36927, 50447, 73431, 73444, 75417
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C117513Classification:Criminal Appeal - Death Penalty - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:PickeringCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/19/2009How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/23/2008Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
12/23/2008Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)08-32491
01/07/2009Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request.09-00334
01/07/2009Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.09-00336
04/08/2009MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. to File Appellant's Opening Brief09-08750
04/09/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order Extending Time. Opening brief due: June 8, 2009.09-08936
06/09/2009BriefFiled Opening Brief. 09-14420
06/09/2009AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volumes 1 & 2.09-14421
06/12/2009MotionFiled Motion to Consolidate. Motion to Consolidate Case Nos. 50447 and 52964.09-14722
06/26/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Denying Motion. Accordingly, appellant's motion to consolidate these appeals is denied. Case Nos. 50447/52964.09-15910
07/09/2009BriefFiled Answering Brief.09-16847
07/30/2009MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (60 days).09-18671
07/31/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Reply brief due: October 9, 2009. No further extensions of time will be granted absent showing of extraordinary circumstances and extreme need, and counsel's caseload will not be deemed such a circumstance.09-18795
10/08/2009MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Second Motion. (7) days.09-24615
10/15/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. for extension of time. Counsel cautioned. Reply brief due: 10/16/09.09-25179
10/19/2009BriefFiled Reply Brief. 09-25339
10/19/2009Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
09/20/2010OtherDisqualification of Justice Pickering. isqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Voluntary Recusal10-24127
11/17/2010Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Fn1 [The Honorable Kristina Pickering, Justice, voluntarily recused herself from participation in the decision of this matter.]10-30042
12/07/2010Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing.10-31798
12/07/2010AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume III-Appendix submitted with Petition for Rehearing.10-31799
01/19/2011Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). Fn1[The Honorable Kristina Pickering, Justice, voluntarily recused herself from participation in the decision of this matter.]11-01861
02/14/2011RemittiturIssued Remittitur.11-04710
02/14/2011Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/24/2011RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on February 18, 2011.11-04710