Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 53080
Short Caption:SIMPSON (ORENTHAL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):52166, 52343, 52348, 52399, 53100, 61136, 64529
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C237890Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:06/11/2010 at 10:00 AMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:06/11/2010How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/12/2009Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
01/12/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.)09-00911
01/14/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Judgment of Conviction filed 12/05/08 and Order Denying Motion for New Trial. Filed 12/16/08. Due Date: 10 days09-01168
01/23/2009Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of Judgment of Conviction filed in district court on December 5, 2008.09-02038
01/23/2009Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of Order Denying Defendant Simpson's Motion for New Trial, Defendant Stewart's Motion for New Trial Pursuant to NRS 176.515 and Defendant Simpson's Joinder in Co-Defendant's Motion for New Trial filed in district court on December 16, 2008.09-02039
01/26/2009Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 9/8/08 through 9/11/08, 9/15/08 through 9/19/08, 9/22/08 through 9/26/08, 9/29/08 through 10/2/08, 10/3/08, 12/5/08, 12/19/08. Court Reporter: Rachelle Hamilton. Filed in district court on: 1/22/09.09-02245
02/09/2009TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Rachelle Hamilton stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/05,08, 12/19/08, 9/08/08 through 9/11/08, 9/15/08 through 9/19/08, 8/22/08 through 9/29/08, and 10/03/08.09-03426
02/20/2009MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Appellant's Motion to Extend Time for Filing Fast Track Statement Currently Due February 18, 2009.09-04390
02/24/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due 30 days.09-04726
03/26/2009MotionFiled Motion. Appellant's Motion for Full Briefing Due to the Complexity of Issues and the Inability to Brief Issues within Page Limits Imposedy by NRAP 3C.09-07587
03/27/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion for Full Briefing. Opening Brief and Appendix due: 60 days.09-07753
05/18/2009MotionFiled Motion. Malcolm P. Lavergne for Gavriel L. Grasso as counsel for appellant.09-12283
05/20/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Regarding Counsel. The clerk of this court shall remove Mr. Grasso as counsel of record for appellant. Counsel reminded that the opening brief and appendix are due May 26, 2009.09-12477
05/26/2009BriefFiled Opening Brief.09-12931
05/26/2009MotionFiled Motion. Motion Requesting Filing of Joint Appendix Pursuant to NRAP 30. Nos. 53080/53100.09-12942
05/28/2009Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from attorney Malcolm Lavigne requesting a one day extension to file the joint appendix.09-13268
05/28/2009AppendixReceived Joint Appendix. Vols. 1 through 27. Nos. 53080/53100. (RETURNED UNFILED PER ORDER 05/29/09).09-13315
05/29/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Denying Motions. The clerk of this court shall return, unfiled the joint appendix received in these matters. Appellants shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file separate appendices containing the transcripts and portions of the trial court record that are necessary for this court's review of their separate appeals. fn2[Appellant Simpson's request for an extension of time to file the joint appendix is denied as moot.] Nos. 53080/53100.09-13444
05/29/2009Other Returned Unfiled Document. Joint Appendix; Vols. 1 through 27. Nos. 53080/53100.09-13315
06/01/2009MotionFiled Motion.09-13576
06/04/2009MotionFiled Response to Motion. State's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Bail Pending Appeal.09-14109
06/12/2009MotionFiled Motion. Motion Requesting Transmission of Original Exhibits/Media Pursuant to NRAP 30(d).09-14707
06/12/2009Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Compliance. (in response to Order 5/29/09)09-14710
06/12/2009AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols 1-23.09-14712
06/15/2009MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Permission to File a Reply Brief to the State's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Bail Pending Appeal.09-14786
06/26/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion. Appellant: 10 days to file reply.09-15898
06/29/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is hereby scheduled before the Northern Nevada Panel on August 3, 2009, at the hour of 10:00 a.m., in Las Vegas, Nevada.09-16006
06/30/2009MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion to Transmit Original Exhibits/Media Pursuant to NRAP 30(d)09-16122
06/30/2009Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from courtney Holmes of KVBC News 3 requesting cameras in the courtroom on August 3, 2009.09-16125
07/02/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. and Directing District Court Clerk to Transmit Digital Recordings. Due 30 days. Nos. 53080/53100.09-16387
07/06/2009MotionFiled Reply to Response. Defendant Simpson's Reply to State's Opposition for Bail Pending Appeal.09-16448
07/10/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. permission is granted for photographic or electronic media coverage of the hearings to be held August 3, 2009, at 10:00 a.m. and 10:30 a.m. Nos. 53080/53100.09-17023
07/13/2009MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: August 12, 2009.09-17129
07/13/2009Notice/OutgoingFiled Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering brief due August 12, 2009.09-17130
07/17/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Before the Northern Nevada Panel. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on August 3, 2009 at 10:00 a.m. NNP09-MC/NS/MG09-17583
07/22/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.09-17960
08/12/2009MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (30) days.09-19605
08/13/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. for extension. Answering brief due 9/11/09.09-19785
09/04/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. we deny the motion for bail pending appeal.09-21567
09/14/2009MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to File 39 Page Answering Brief.09-22155
09/14/2009Notice/OutgoingFiled Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. The motion for excess pages for the Answering Brief is approved. 39 pages granted.09-22156
09/14/2009BriefFiled Answering Brief. 09-22157
09/14/2009AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 09-22158
10/16/2009MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: November 13, 2009.09-25257
11/16/2009MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Extended Oral Argument.09-27843
11/16/2009MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Supplement Record With Out of State Order.09-27845
11/16/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Motion for Extended Oral Argument and Motion to Supplement Record With Out of State Order. Due date: 10 days.09-27847
11/16/2009BriefFiled Reply Brief.09-27849
11/17/2009MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion to Supplement Record09-28099
12/02/2009Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Motion for Extended Oral Argument and Motion to Supplement Record With Out of State Order.09-29185
12/04/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. to supplement the record.09-29537
04/12/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is hereby scheduled before the panel on Friday, June 11, 2010, at the hour of 10:00 a.m., in Las Vegas. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. fn1[The motion to extend the time for oarl argument to one hour is denied.]10-09480
04/14/2010Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Before the Northern Nevada Panel. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on June 11, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. NNP10-MD/NS/MG10-09721
04/19/2010Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. From Carol M. Gantt of IN SESSION (formerly Court TV) requesting cameras in the courtroom on June 11, 2010.10-10109
05/11/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Permission is granted for photographic or electronic media coverage of the foresaid matter, for news purposes and not for commercial exploitation. Carol M. Gantt of In Session is designated as pool cordinator.10-12234
05/25/2010BriefFiled Supplemental Brief. Respondent's Supplemental Memorandum.10-13597
05/28/2010Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.10-13890
06/04/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. that KVBC is granted permission to participate in the photographic or electonic media coverage of the aforesaid matter. Only one camera shall be allowed in the courtroom and KVBC shall arrange with Carol M. Gantt of In Session in order to pool their coverage. Nos. 53080/53100.10-14435
06/04/2010MotionFiled Motion. from KVBC/Joyce Kotnik-Klevins requesting cameras in the courtroom. Nos. 53080/53100.10-14491
06/07/2010MotionFiled Motion. from Brian Haynes/Las Vegas Review Journal requesting for the newspaper to have photographer in the court room. Nos. 53080/53100.10-14564
06/08/2010MotionFiled Motion. from Carolyn Kresser/KVVU Fox5 requesting permission to videotape oral argument. No.s 53080/53100.10-14621
06/08/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Brian Haynes of the Las Vegas Review-Journal is granted permission to photograph the court proceedings. Mr. Haynes shall coordinate with the pool coordinator Carol Gantt of In Session. Nos. 53080/53100.10-14626
06/09/2010MotionFiled Motion. from Larry Ish/ KTVN - 13 Action News requesting for camera and news crew coverage of oral arguments. Nos. 53080/53100.10-14835
06/09/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Only one video camera shall be allowed in the courtroom and KVVU and KTNV shall arrange with Carol M. Gantt of In Session in order to pool their coverage. Nos. 53080/53100.10-14919
06/10/2010MotionFiled Motion. from Esmeralda Servin/Inside Edition regarding permission to participate in the pool feed for oral argument.10-15070
06/10/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Inside Edition is granted permission to participate in the photographic or electronic media coverage. Inside Edition shall arrange with Carol M. Gantt of In Session in order to pool their coverage. Nos. 53080/53100.10-15111
06/11/2010Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
10/22/2010Order/DispositionalOrder of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED."10-27586
11/08/2010MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for an Enlargement of Time for Appellant to File a Petition for Rehearing of the Court's October 22, 2010 Panel Decision.10-29098
11/08/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Petition for Rehearing due: November 16, 2010.10-29231
11/16/2010Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing.10-29934
11/19/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Respondent's Answer due: 15 days.10-30299
12/06/2010Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Answer to Petition for Rehearing.10-31585
02/02/2011Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c).11-03336
02/15/2011Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's petition for en banc reconsideration due: February 22, 2011.11-04882
02/22/2011MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time for Appellant to File a Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (10) days.11-05408
02/22/2011Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Substitution or Change of Counsel Pursuant to N.R.A.P. 46(d)(2). (Y. Galanter, Esq. will no longer represent Mr. Simpson on the appeal).11-05480
02/23/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration due: 10 days.11-05651
03/04/2011MotionFiled Motion for an Enlargement of Time for Appellant to File a Petition for En Banc Reconsideration (Second Request).11-06647
03/17/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for extension of time. The clerk of this court shall file the petition for en banc reconsideration received via E-Flex on March 15, 2011.11-08124
03/17/2011Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant Orenthal J. Simpson's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration.11-08125
05/17/2011Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC11-14615
06/13/2011RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned Original Exhibit: JAVS Audio/Video Recordings. 35 CDs for dates 9/8/08 through 10/3/08. (submitted by Court Recorder R. Hamilton) on this day. Nos. 53080/53100.11-17500
06/13/2011Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed
06/22/2011RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 17, 2011.11-17500