Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 53085
Short Caption:MITCHELL (DEANGELO) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):37531, 37553, 40150, 42638, 44093, 46213, 46887, 51332, 62069, 62372, 66079, 66080, 66428, 66428-COA, 66773, 66773-COA, 69542, 70017, 70017-COA, 76899, 82127, 82127-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C156542Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/02/2009How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/13/2009Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
01/13/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.09-01007
01/14/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)09-01191
01/14/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days09-01192
02/02/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. (filed in district court on 1/8/09 and 1/12/09, but not transmitted to this court.) Due Date: 10 days09-02904
02/05/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement and Request Transcripts. Appellant Mitchell.09-03257
02/13/2009TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Kim Tuchman stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 11/20/08.09-03911
02/13/2009Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.09-03912
02/13/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement.09-03913
02/25/2009TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Kim Tuchman stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 11/20/08.09-04883
04/29/2009BriefFiled Opening Brief.09-10668
04/29/2009AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief.09-10669
06/02/2009BriefFiled Answering Brief.09-13710
06/02/2009AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. Vols 1-3.09-13711
07/02/2009BriefFiled Reply Brief.09-16357
07/02/2009Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
01/07/2010Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP10-JH/MD/KP10-00525
02/02/2010RemittiturIssued Remittitur.10-02360
02/02/2010Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/11/2010RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 5, 2010.10-02360