Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 55159
Short Caption:POWELL VS. LIBERTY MUTUALCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0701632Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:01/05/2010 / Yott, LaurieSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:01/12/2011 at 11:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:01/12/2011How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/30/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).)09-31499
12/30/2009Filing Fee Filing Fee due. Filing fee will be fowarded by the District Court.
01/04/2010Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Matthew L. Sharp - check no. 2284.
01/05/2010Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Laurie A. Yott10-00247
01/20/2010Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Docketing Statement Civil Appeals with Exhibits10-01567
02/02/2010Docketing StatementFiled Response to Docketing Statement. 10-02790
02/03/2010Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a conference is scheduled for 3/25/1010-02921
03/29/2010Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.10-08050
03/30/2010Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix.10-08239
04/27/2010Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Request Transcripts.10-10806
06/03/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order Conditionally Imposing Sanctions. Conditional sanction of $500 due: 15 days or transcript request form due: 10 days.10-14271
06/07/2010Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request.10-14516
06/28/2010BriefFiled Opening Brief. 10-16879
06/29/2010AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Volume 1 - Part 1-510-16911
06/29/2010AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Volume 1 - Part 6-910-16914
06/29/2010AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Volume 2 - Part 1-610-16916
06/29/2010AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Volume 2 - Part 710-16917
07/29/2010BriefFiled Answering Brief. 10-19579
07/29/2010AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 10-19580
08/26/2010BriefFiled Reply Brief10-21945
12/15/2010Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled for January 12, 2011 at 11:30 a.m. in Carson City for 30 minutes before the Northern Nevada Panel. (NNP11-MD/MC/KP)10-32773
12/30/2010Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.10-34155
01/06/2011Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address of Appellant's Counsel, Matthew L. Sharp, Esq.11-00641
01/12/2011Case Status UpdateOral Argument Held this Day. Case Submitted for Decision. To the Northern Nevada Panel. (NNP11-MC/MG/KP)
05/05/2011Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before Cherry/Gibbons/Pickering. Author: Gibbons, J. 127 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 14. NNP11-Cherry/Gibbons/Pickering.11-13265
05/23/2011Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing (Respondent).11-15174
05/24/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Filing Fee on Rehearing. Due date: 10 days.11-15187
05/26/2011Filing FeeRehearing Fee Paid. $150.00 from Koeller, Nebeker, Carlson & Haluck, LLP - check no. 4333.
05/27/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Appellant's Answer due: 15 days.11-15685
06/10/2011Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Answer to Petition for Rehearing due: June 20, 2011.11-17405
06/20/2011Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Answer to Petition for Rehearing.11-18242
07/01/2011Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c).11-19580
07/18/2011Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent's petition for en banc reconsideration due: July 25, 2011.11-21481
07/25/2011Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for En Banc Reconsideration.11-22367
08/24/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter to Publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 50262/52496, 54779, 55159, 49732, 51629, 53436/54173, 55228, 50668, 57649, 53518, 54165, 46623, and 53225/53340. (Letter entered in 50262 as document no. 11-26481.)
09/20/2011Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC11-28695
10/17/2011RemittiturIssued Remittitur.11-31899
10/17/2011Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/20/2011RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 18, 2011.11-31899