Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 55173
Short Caption:LISLE (KEVIN) VS. STATE (DEATH PENALTY-PC)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):36949
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C124090 Classification:Criminal Appeal - Death Penalty - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/31/2011How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/30/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)09-31596
12/30/2009Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
01/19/2010Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.10-01531
01/21/2010Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Request Transcripts.10-01756
01/22/2010Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. Certification in Compliance With N.R.A.P. 9(a)(C)10-01879
01/22/2010Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Representing appellant: Brian Addington (Federal Public Defender).10-01881
04/29/2010MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (60) days.10-11034
04/30/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. for extension of time. Opening brief and appendix due: June 28, 2010.10-11106
06/28/2010MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (2nd Request).10-16772
07/02/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. for extension of time. Opening brief and appendix due July 28, 2010.10-17316
07/28/2010AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 110-19528
07/28/2010AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 210-19529
07/28/2010AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 310-19530
07/28/2010AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 410-19531
07/28/2010AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 510-19532
07/28/2010AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 610-19533
07/28/2010AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 710-19534
07/28/2010AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 810-19535
07/28/2010AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 910-19536
07/28/2010AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 1010-19537
07/28/2010AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 1110-19538
07/28/2010AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 1210-19539
07/28/2010AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 1310-19540
07/28/2010AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 1410-19543
07/28/2010AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 1510-19544
07/28/2010AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 1610-19548
07/28/2010AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 1710-19549
07/28/2010AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 1810-19550
07/28/2010AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 1910-19551
07/28/2010AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 2010-19552
07/28/2010AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 2110-19553
07/28/2010AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 2210-19554
07/29/2010MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Opening Brief (108) pages.10-19581
07/29/2010BriefReceived Opening Brief. Via E-Flex. FILED PER ORDER OF 7/30/10.
07/30/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. for leave to file an opening brief in excess of 80 pages. The clerk of this court shall file the opening brief received on July 29, 2010.10-19708
07/30/2010BriefFiled Opening Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief10-19710
07/30/2010MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion to File Opening Brief in Excess of Page Limit.10-19712
08/30/2010MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time/Answering Brief. (60) days10-22203
08/30/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion/Answering brief due October 29, 2010.10-22260
10/28/2010BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.10-28391
11/29/2010MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Request for Extension of Time within which to File Appellant's Reply Brief (first request).10-30902
11/30/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Reply Brief due: January 28, 2011.10-31021
01/31/2011BriefFiled Reply Brief.11-02901
01/31/2011Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted for Decision.
03/28/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant has submitted a proper person motion to consolidate and for substitution of counsel. We note that appellant has not sought leave to file documents in proper person in this appeal. The clerk of this court shall file the proper person doucment received on March 14, 2013.13-09261
03/28/2013MotionFiled Proper Person Motion to Supplement attached Petition for Consolidation of Cases C129540 and C124090 and Renew Motion for Substitution of Counsel.13-07839
03/11/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We direct the clerk of this court to file the "Motion in Propria Person for Substitution-Of-Counsel or in the Alternative Waive Right to Counsel" received on January 28, 2014. We therefore deny the motion to the extent that it requests appointment of substitute counsel. We direct the clerk of this court to transmit a copy of the motion to appellant's counsel. Appellant's counsel shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file a response to the motion to proceed without counsel, if deemed necessary.14-07670
03/11/2014MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Motion in Propria Persona for Substitution of Counsel or in the Alternative Waive Right to Counsel.14-02880
04/01/2014MotionFiled Motion to Seal Response to Court Order Re Pro Se Motion to Proceed Without Counsel, or, in the Alternative, to Permit Counsel to Consider Whether to Withdraw Materials Proposed to be Filed Under Seal.14-10186
04/03/2014MotionFiled Opposition to Motion to Seal Response.14-10600
04/10/2014MotionFiled Reply to Opposition to Motion to Seal Response.14-11512
05/19/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. The clerk of this court shall return, unfiled, the response submitted under seal on April 9, 2014. Counsel shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file a response to the March 11, 2014, order, if deemed necessary.14-16115
06/09/2014MotionFiled Response to Order Re Pro Se Motion to Proceed Without Counsel.14-18722
09/23/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. We therefore deny appellant's motion to proceed in proper person in this appeal.14-31611
02/27/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant's motion for leave to file, in proper person, rehearing en banc is denied.15-06363
06/25/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Parraguirre, J. Majority: Parraguirre/Hardesty/Douglas/Gibbons/Pickering. Cherry and Saitta, JJ., dissenting. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 39. EN BANC15-19370
07/13/2015MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time Within Which to File Petition for Rehearing.15-21245
07/22/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Petition for Rehearing due: August 3, 2015.15-22168
08/04/2015MotionFiled Motion to Permit Appellant to File a Petition for Rehearing in Excess of 4,667 Words. (DETACHED PETITION FOR REHEARING AND FILED SEPARATELY PER ORDER 8/13/15).15-23440
08/13/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall detach the petition for rehearing submitted with the motion on August 4, 2015, and file it separately in this matter.15-24444
08/13/2015Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (DETACHED FROM MOTION FILED ON AUGUST 4, 2015, AND FILED SEPARATELY PER ORDER 8/13/15).15-24445
10/20/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter dated October 8, 2015 to Publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. 55220/(63092/63359)/(63382/63790)/63644/63747/63683/64215/(60944/61329)/62840/63980/64287/62878/64750/55173/56548 (Letter entered in no. 55220 as document no. 15-31913)
10/22/2015Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). Cherry and Saitta, JJ., dissenting.15-32257
10/27/2015MotionFiled Motion to Stay the Remittitur.15-32807
11/06/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Cause appearing, we grant appellant's motion to stay issuance of the remittitur. See NRAP 41(b). We hereby stay issuance of the remittitur until March 16, 2016. Id. If the clerk of this court receives written notice by March 16, 2016, from the clerk of the United States Supreme Court that respondent has filed a petition for a writ of certiorari, the stay shall continue in effect until final disposition of the certiorari proceedings. If such notice is not received by March 16, 2016, the remittitur shall issue on March 17, 2016.15-33967
01/15/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Because appellant is represented by counsel in this appeal, we direct the clerk of this court to return, unfiled, the proper person documents received on January 7, 2016. Appellant should address all concerns regarding this appeal to counsel, and shall proceed through counsel in the prosecution of this appeal.16-01543
01/20/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Notice: The application for an extension of time within which to file a petition for a writ of certiorari in the above-entitled case has been presented to Justice Kennedy, who on January 12, 2016, extended the time to and including March 7, 2016.16-01929
03/16/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from US Supreme Court/Certiorari Filed. A petition for a writ of certiorari was filed March 9, 2016 and placed on the docket as Case No. 15-8499.16-08305
05/19/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from US Supreme Court/Certiorari Denied. The petition for a writ of certiorari is denied.16-15846
05/20/2016RemittiturIssued Remittitur.16-15907
05/20/2016Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/10/2016RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 27, 2016.16-15907