Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Combined Case Information: 55228
Short Caption:SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON VS. DIST. CT. (DEPT. OF TAXATION)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):67497
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 09OC000161BClassification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:11/02/2010 at 11:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:11/02/2010How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/08/2010Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Norman Azevedo - cash.
01/08/2010Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus.10-00713
01/08/2010AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ.10-00714
01/13/2010Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Evidentiary Appendix in Support of Petitioner Southern California Edison's Original Petition for Writ of Mandamus (CD - submitted with document).10-01085
01/19/2010MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Motion for Leave of Court Pursuant to N.R.A.P. 29(f) for Later Filing of Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Southern California Edison's Petition for Writ of Mandamus.10-01422
01/21/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Answer due: 30 days.10-01716
01/29/2010BriefReceived Amicus Brief. Via E-Flex. Brief of Amici Curiae in Support of Southern California Edison's Petition for Writ of Mandamus. FILED PER ORDER OF 3/5/10.
02/22/2010Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. Answer to Southern California Edison's Petition for Writ of Mandamus10-04715
02/22/2010AppendixFiled Appendix. Respondent's Appendix in Opposition to Petitioner Southern CA Edison's Original Petition for Writ of Mandamus10-04716
02/25/2010MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Opposition to Petition for Writ of Mandamus.10-05041
02/26/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. this court does not require a motion for leave to be filed by Clark County. No action is required with respect to its motion, and the clerk shall file the amicus curiae brief received on February 25, 2010.10-05199
02/26/2010BriefFiled Amicus Brief. Clark County's Amicus Curiae Brief in Opposition to Petition for Writ of Mandamus.10-05202
02/26/2010AppendixFiled Appendix. to Clark County's Amicus Brief.
03/02/2010MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Motion for Leave to File a Reply to the Department's Answer to Writ Petition for Writ of Mandamus and Clark County's Amicus Curiae Brief.10-05514
03/03/2010Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. -Paul Johnson (Counsel for Amicus Curaie - Clark County).10-05555
03/03/2010BriefFiled Amicus Brief. Amicus Curiae Brief of the Legislature of the State of Nevada in Support of Taxation of the State of Nevada and In Opposition to the Petition for Writ of Mandamus.10-05577
03/05/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motions for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief and Reply. We direct the clerk of this court to file the proposed amici curiae brief received on 1/20/10. The clerk shall file the reply received on March 2. 2010.10-05854
03/05/2010BriefFiled Amicus Brief. Brief of Amici Curiae in Support of Southern California Edison's Petition for Writ of Mandamus10-05858
03/05/2010Petition/WritFiled Reply to Answer to Petition. Edison's Reply to the Department's Answer to the Petition for Writ of Mandamus and Clark County's Amicus Curiae Brief.10-05515
03/09/2010MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Motion for Leave to File a Reply to the Amicus Curiae Brief of the Legislature of the State of Nevada.10-06131
03/12/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion to File Reply. The clerk of this court shall file the reply received on March 9, 2010.10-06669
03/12/2010BriefFiled Amicus Brief. Edison's Reply to the Amicus Curiae Brief of the Legislature of the State of Nevada.10-06132
08/11/2010MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Edison's Request for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Edison's Petition for Writ of Mandamus.10-20780
08/11/2010Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Change of Attorney Information for pro hac vice Charles Read. (New law firm.)10-20782
09/24/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion for Leave to Submit Supplemental Authorities. We direct the clerk of this court to return unfiled petitioner's supplemental authority received on August 11, 2010.10-24664
10/08/2010Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for November 2, 2010 at 11:30 a.m. in Carson City before the En Banc Court.10-26328
10/19/2010MotionFiled Motion to Consolidate Petitions for Writ of Mandamus 55228 and 56740.10-27323
10/20/2010Notice/OutgoingFiled Oral Argument Reminder Notice.10-27390
10/25/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion to Consolidate.10-27837
10/25/2010MotionFiled Response to Motion to Consolidate Petitions For Writ of Mandamus.10-27921
11/01/2010MotionFiled Motion of Amici Curiae to Participate in Oral Argument.10-28512
11/02/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. This court concludes that the participation of amici curiae Nevada Taxpayers Association and the Council on State Taxation is warranted, and the motion is therefore granted.10-28602
11/02/2010Case Status UpdateOral Argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
05/26/2011Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "We grant the petition and direct the clerk of this court to issue a writ of mandamus directing the district court to vacate its order that provides that the matter will proceed as an NRS Chapter 233B petition for judicial review and to instead allow the matter to proceed as filed, an independant action." Before the court EN BANC. Author: Douglas, J. Majority: Douglas/Cherry/Saitta/Gibbons/Pickering/Hardesty/Parraguirre. 127 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 2211-15521
05/26/2011WritIssued Writ. Original and one copy of writ and copy of mailed to Norman J. Azevedo for service upon Judge James Todd Russell.
06/02/2011WritFiled Returned Writ. Original Writ returned. Served on Judge James Todd Russell on 05/31/2011.11-16227
06/13/2011Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing On Judicial Estoppel. (Respondent State of Nevada Department of Taxation).11-17527
06/13/2011ExhibitFiled Exhibits to Petition For Rehearing on Estoppel.11-17536
07/07/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Petitioner: Answer due: 15 days.11-20239
07/14/2011Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address.11-21222
07/20/2011Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Answer to Petition for Rehearing.11-21904
08/24/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter to Publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 50262/52496, 54779, 55159, 49732, 51629, 53436/54173, 55228, 50668, 57649, 53518, 54165, 46623, and 53225/53340. (Letter entered in 50262 as document no. 11-26481.)
09/20/2011Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c).11-28697
09/21/2011Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service of Order Denying Rehearing.11-28806
10/17/2011RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu/Rehearing.11-31889
10/17/2011Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/13/2012Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter to Publishers with Corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 52861, 54332, 55228, 53872, 59506, 54703, 55200, 58774. (Letter entered in 52861 as document no. 12-12068.)