Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 55759
Short Caption:FLOWERS, III (NORMAN) VS. STATE C/W 53159Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:53159*, 55759Related Case(s):53159, 68140, 68140-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C228755 Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Submitted for Decision
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/11/2019How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/02/2010Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)10-08663
04/02/2010Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
04/12/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order re: Entry Written Judgment or Order. District Court Order due: 30 days.10-09411
04/19/2010Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.10-10166
04/19/2010MotionFiled Motion to Consolidate. Motion to Consolidate Appeals for Decision and Use of the Appendix. Nos. 55759/53159.10-10175
05/03/2010Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on April 24, 2010. Order Denying Defendant's Motion for New Trial.10-11289
05/21/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion. We grant appellant's unopposed motion to consolidate these appeals for purposes of disposition only. When briefing the appeal in Docket No. 55759, the parties may cite to the appendices filed in Docket No. 53159. Any additional documents necessary for the appeal in Docket No. 55759 that have not been included in the appendices filed in Docket No. 53159 must be provided in a supplemental appendix filed in Docket No. 55759. Nos. 53159/55759 (10-13282).
05/27/2010BriefFiled Opening Brief.10-13829
05/27/2010AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Appellant's Supplemental Appendix (Vol. 4)10-13830
07/01/2010BriefFiled Answering Brief. Nos. 53159/55759.10-17160
08/02/2010BriefFiled Reply Brief. Nos. 53159/55759.10-19857
01/06/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled for February 15, 2011 at 1:30 p.m. for 30 minutes before the Northern Nevada Panel at the Regional Justice Center in Las Vegas. Nos. 53159/55759. NNP11-MC/MG/KP11-00593
02/01/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. Nos. 53159/55759.11-03217
02/02/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Corrected Oral Argument Reminder Notice. Nos. 53159/55759.11-03261
02/08/2011Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. Flowers Rule 28J. Nos. 53159/55759.11-04001
02/15/2011Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP11-MC/MG/KP
06/13/2011MotionFiled Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss Appeals. Nos. 53159/55759.11-17607
06/15/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We will take no action on the motion or these appeals at this time. Appellant shall file a written report with the clerk of this court on or before July 21, 2011, regarding the status of the proceedings and sentencing in district court case no. C216032. Nos. 53159/5575911-17842
07/19/2011Notice/IncomingFiled Notice Regarding Status of Sentencing. Nos. 53159/55759.11-21707
08/01/2011Notice/IncomingFiled Notice Regarding Status of Sentencing. Nos. 53159/55759.11-22978
08/18/2011Notice/IncomingFiled Notice Regarding Status of Sentencing. Nos. 53159/55759.11-25146
09/28/2011Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeals. "ORDER these appeals DISMISSED." Nos. 53159/55759. Case Closed/No Remittitur Issued.11-29581
04/18/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Reinstate Appeals. Nos. 53159/55759.18-14864
04/18/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Motion to Reinstate Appeals Volume I of III. Nos. 53159/55759.18-14865
04/18/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Motion to Reinstate Appeals Volume III of III. Nos. 53159/55759.18-14866
04/18/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Motion to Reinstate Appeals Volume II of III. Nos. 53159/55759.18-14867
04/25/2018MotionFiled State's Opposition to Flower's Motion to Reinstate Appeals 53159 and 55759. Nos. 53159/55759.18-15835
05/11/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (C.B. Kirschner as counsel for appellant Norman Keith Flowers.) Nos. 53159/55759.18-18156
05/11/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to State's Opposition to Appellant's Motion to Reinstate Appeals. Nos. 53159/55759.18-18172
07/09/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Reinstating Appeal. Under the very narrow circumstances presented here, we grant appellant's motion and hereby reinstate these appeals. fn1[Appellant's motion for an extension of time to file a reply to the opposition is granted; the clerk of this court shall filed the reply provisionally received in this court on May 11, 2018.] Nos. 53159/55759.18-25926
07/09/2018MotionFiled Reply to State's Opposition to Appellant's Motion to Reinstate Appeals.18-25927
08/16/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant is directed to refile the appendices in Case Nos. 53159 and 55759 within 30 days of the date of this order. Further, the parties shall inform this court within 30 days of the date of this order whether the briefs filed in Case Nos. 53159 and 55759 require amendment so that the citations in the briefs correspond to the newly-filed appendices. Nos. 53159/55759.18-31815
08/23/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Remand for Appointment of New Counsel. Nos. 53159/55759.18-33007
08/23/2018MotionFiled Federal Public Defender's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Appellant. Nos. 53159/55759.18-33008
08/24/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel (Special Public Defender's Office for Appellant). Nos. 53159/55759.18-33231
09/14/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to Refile Appendices. Nos. 53159/55759.18-36001
09/20/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. The Special Public Defender has filed a motion to withdraw as counsel for appellant. The motion is denied without prejudice. The Special Public Defender shall have 20 days from the date of this order to comply with this court's August 16, 2018, order. Nos. 53159/55759.18-36800
09/27/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Motions. The clerk shall remove C.B. Kirschner and the Office of the Federal Public Defender as counsel of record for appellant. As appellant remains represented by the Special Public Defender, the motion to remand this appeal to the district court for the appointment of new counsel is denied. Nos. 53159/55759.18-37767
10/09/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to Refile the Appendices in Volumes 1 through 3 (First Request). Nos. 53159/55759.18-39657
10/29/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the appendix received on October 22, 2018. Appellant shall have 5 days from the date of this order to inform this court, in writing, whether the briefs filed in Case Nos. 53159 and 55759 require amendment so that the citations in the briefs correspond to the newly-filed appendices. Nos. 53159/55759.18-42382
10/29/2018AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Vol 1 of 3. Nos. 53159/55759.18-42383
10/29/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 2 of 3. Nos. 53159/55759.18-42384
10/29/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 3 of 3. Nos. 53159/55759.18-42385
10/31/2018MotionFiled Response to Order Dated October 29, 2018. Nos. 53159/55759.18-42780
11/02/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. Nos. 53159/55759.
02/08/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Supplemental Authorities. Appellant shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file and serve supplemental authorities that support the arguments raised in his opening and reply briefs. Respondent shall then have 14 days from the date when appellant's supplement authorities are filed to file and serve responding supplemental authorities in support of the arguments raised in its answering brief. The parties' filings shall not exceed 15 pages or one-half the type-volume specified for an opening or answering brief in a noncapital case by NRAP 32(a)(7)(A)(ii). No extensions of time will be permitted. Nos. 53159/55759. (SC)19-06090
02/19/2019BriefFiled Appellant's Supplemental Authorities. Nos. 53159/55759. (SC)19-07682
02/26/2019BriefFiled Respondent's Supplemental Authorities. Nos. 53159/55759. (SC)19-08709
04/29/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Tuesday, June 11, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas. (SC)19-18712
05/29/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC)19-23262
06/11/2019Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before Northern Nevada Panel. KP/RP/EC (SC)