The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 56030
Short Caption:VILLAGE LEAGUE TO SAVE INCLINE VS. STATE BD. OF EQUALIZATIONClassification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Related Case(s):43441, 63581
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0306922Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:PickeringPanel Assigned: En Banc
Replacement:None for Justice Pickering
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:11/01/2011 at 10:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:11/01/2011How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/13/2010Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/No Settlement. Notice of exemption from settlement conference program mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)10-12478
05/13/2010Filing Fee Filing Fee due. Filing fee will be fowarded by the District Court.
05/14/2010OtherDisqualification of Justice Pickering. Law firm of Morris Peterson
05/19/2010Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 3/25/10. To Court Reporter: Stephanie Koetting.10-12992
05/19/2010Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Morris Peterson. Check No. 29638.
05/19/2010Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Representing respondent - State, Bd. of Equalization: Deonne Enn Contine of the Attorney General's Office.10-13073
06/01/2010Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.10-13988
06/01/2010TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Stephanie Koetting stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 5/25/10.10-14077
06/24/2010MotionFiled Motion to Consolidate. Motion to Consolidate Cases Pending before the Supreme Court and/or for an Appeal Conference. Nos. 54947/56030/56253.10-16598
07/06/2010MotionFiled Response to Motion. Response to Washoe County's Motion to Consolidate Cases Pending Before the Supreme Court and/or for an Appeal Conference. Nos. 54947/56030/56253.10-17440
07/07/2010MotionFiled Response to Motion. Points and Authorities in Opposition to Motion to Consolidate Cases Pending Before the Supreme Court. Nos. 54947/56030/56253.10-17487
07/13/2010MotionFiled Reply to Response. Reply to State of Nevada's Response to Washoe County's Motion to Consolidate Cases and to Certain Taxpayers' Points and Authorities in Opposition to Motion to Consolidate. Nos. 54947/56030/56253.10-17973
07/23/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Denying Motions to Consolidate. Nos. 54947/56030/56253.10-19013
09/09/2010MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time (First Request). (Opening Brief).10-23071
09/09/2010Notice/OutgoingFiled The motion/stipulation to extend the time to file the opening brief is approved. Brief due: October 1, 2010.10-23075
09/30/2010AppendixFiled Joint Appendix with CD-ROM included. Volumes 1-4.10-25371
10/04/2010BriefFiled Opening Brief.10-25505
11/02/2010BriefFiled Respondents Washoe County, Washoe County Assessor and Treasurer's Answering Brief.10-28614
11/02/2010AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief.10-28616
11/03/2010BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief with attachments (State Board of Equalization). (AGENDA AT PAGE 12 OF ATTACHED APPENDIX STRICKEN AND NOTICE OF DECISION-DETACHED AND STRICKEN PER ORDER FILED 03/07/2011.)10-28833
11/30/2010MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time (First Request).10-31029
12/01/2010MotionFiled Motion. Supplement to Motion for Extension of Time.10-31219
12/20/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief. Single reply brief due 30 days.10-33159
01/19/2011MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time for Appellants to File Reply Brief (Second Request).11-01937
01/21/2011Notice/IncomingFiled Notice Objections to State Board's Requests for Judicial Notice11-02078
01/21/2011BriefReceived Appellant's Reply Brief (via e-flex). (FILED PER ORDER 03/07/2011).
01/21/2011Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of New Authority.11-02183
03/07/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief and Sustaining in Part and Denying in Part Objection to State Board's Requests for Judicial Notice. We direct the clerk of this court to file the reply brief received on January 21, 2011. We direct the clerk of the court to strike the agenda, included in the Board's appendix at page 12. We direct the clerk of this court to detach and strike the Notice of Decision, attached to the answering brief. Judicial notice is not necessary. The objection to this request is overruled.11-07001
03/07/2011BriefFiled Appellants' Reply Brief.11-07004
03/07/2011Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
03/08/2011Other Incoming DocumentFiled Repsonse to Notice of New Authority.11-07060
08/03/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Clerk to Schedule Oral Argument. The clerk of this court is directed to schedule this matter for oral argument before the panel on the next available calendar. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes.11-23387
09/12/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled for November 2, 2011, at 11:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City before the En Banc Court.11-27621
10/11/2011Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. This matter was previously scheduled for Wednesday, November 2, 2011, at 11:30 a.m. The argument is hereby rescheduled, and oral argument before the en banc court will be held on Tuesday, November 1, 2011, at the hour of 10:30 a.m. in Carson City. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes.11-31105
10/13/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order. This case is currently scheduled for oral argument on November 1, 2011, at 10:30 a.m. Although counsel should be prepared to address any of the issues raised in this appeal, counsel should be prepared specifically to address the appropriate standard review with regard to the district court's order and whether the petition for writ of mandamus was dismissed based on the motions to dismiss or if the district court converted the motions to dismiss into motions for summary judgment. Additionally, counsel should be prepared to address whether the Village League's prayer for relief constituted part of its cause of action.11-31489
10/18/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.11-32160
10/27/2011BriefFiled Notice of Supplemental Authority.11-33152
11/01/2011Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
02/24/2012Order/DispositionalFiled Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." Fn2[The Honorable Kristina Pickering, Justice, voluntarily recused herself from participation in the decision of this matter].12-06015
03/21/2012RemittiturIssued Remittitur.12-08972
03/21/2012Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed
03/30/2012RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on March 23, 2012.12-08972
03/30/2012RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on March 21, 2012.12-08972