The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 56329
Short Caption:CORNELLA (MARY LOU) VS. CHURCHILL CO. (STATE)Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Certiorari
Lower Court Case(s):Churchill Co. - Tenth Judicial District - CR00034Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: Panel
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:06/08/2011 at 10:00 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:06/08/2011How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/30/2010Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/30/2010Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ. (Writ of Review)10-17088
06/30/2010AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ. Volumes 1 and 2. (CD-ROM attached)10-17090
06/30/2010Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Filing of Writ Petition.10-17091
06/30/2010Filing Fee Returned Filing Fee. Check No. 5519 returned to The Digesti Law Firm.
11/08/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Answer due: 20 days.10-29191
11/29/2010Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. Respondent's Answering Brief.10-30851
11/29/2010AppendixFiled Appendix. Respondent's Supplemental Appendix. CD-ROM included.10-30854
12/27/2010MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Reply Brief to Respondent's Answering Brief.10-33659
12/29/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court is directed to file petitioner's reply brief received on December 27, 2010.10-33914
12/29/2010Petition/WritFiled Reply to Answer to Petition.10-33915
03/30/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Clerk to Schedule Oral Argument. The clerk of this court is directed to schedule this matter for oral argument before the panel on the next available calendar. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes.11-09561
04/28/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled for June 8, 2011 at 10:00 a.m. in Carson City for 30 minutes before the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP11-NS/JH/RP11-12551
05/26/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.11-15598
06/08/2011Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision
01/03/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Firm Name Change (The Digesti Law Firm LLP's name will be changed to The Digesti Law Firm, LTD.).13-00242
08/12/2016Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition granted." Direct the clerk of this court to issue a writ of certiorari instructing the district court to reconsider Cornella's direct appeal for the sole purpose of applying NRS 484B.657(1) consistent with the interpretation of the statute in this opinion. Before: Parraguirre/Hardesty/Saitta/ Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Parraguirre/Saitta. 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 58. SNP11-RP/JH/NS16-24992
08/12/2016WritIssued Writ with letter. Original and one copy of writ and copy of the opinion mailed to attorney Laurence Peter Digesti for service upon The Tenth Judicial District Court, Department 1.16-25085
08/19/2016WritFiled Returned Writ. Original Writ returned. Served on Judge The Tenth Judicial District Court, Department 1 on August 15, 2016.16-25859
09/07/2016RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.16-27774
09/07/2016Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/03/2016Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 11/01/16. Order issued by Judge Kosach in Response to the Writ of Certiorari.16-34361
11/07/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter to Publishers regarding Corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 67656/64349;64452;65497/64702;65007;65172/65562/66697/66157/67660/56329/69169 (Filed in docket no. 67656 document no. 16-34632)