Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 56137
Short Caption:GARCIA (JUAN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):42403, 44006, 47059, 48123, 62119, 65158, 65777, 69458, 70604, 70604-COA, 71005, 71005-COA, 71006, 71006-COA, 80987, 80988
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C178581 Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:DouglasCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/23/2010How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/02/2010Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.10-14131
06/02/2010Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/04/2010Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person.10-14425
06/04/2010OtherDisqualification of Justice Douglas. Sat in district court proceedings.
06/14/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 120 days.10-15386
09/23/2010Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. Volumes 1-10. (Via FTP).10-24490
09/23/2010Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
09/28/2010Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Documents. Document. Presentence Investigation Report (SEALED).
03/29/2011Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED."11-09467
04/25/2011RemittiturIssued Remittitur.11-12131
04/25/2011Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/05/2011RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on April 29, 2011.11-12131