Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 56411
Short Caption:CATHOLIC DIOCESE OF GREEN BAY VS. DIST. CT. (DOE)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):62840
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A555265Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/19/2010Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ. Petition for Writ of Mandamus or, Alternatively of Prohibition10-18341
07/19/2010Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
07/19/2010Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days10-18342
07/21/2010Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Barron & Pruitt, LLP - check no. 10759.
08/09/2010BriefFiled Supplemental Brief. Supplemental Brief in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus or, Alternatively, of Prohibition.10-20581
09/14/2010Order/Dispositional"We order the petition denied." Fn1 [In light of this order, we deny as moot petitioner's request for a stay of the district court proceedings, included in the petition."]10-23551
10/11/2010RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur10-26524
10/11/2010Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
02/14/2011MotionFiled Motion to Recall Notice in Lieu of Remittitur and Request for Leave to File Motion for Clarification.11-04798
03/10/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion to Recall Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.11-07421