Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Administrative Case: ADKT 0171
Short Caption:IN RE: COMMITTEES RELATING TO THE ADMISSION OF APPLICANTSCourt:Supreme Court
Classification:Administrative - ADKT - ADKTCase Status:ADKT Order Filed
Filed Date:09/29/1993Public Hearing:
Closed Date:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/29/1993Administrative CaseFiled Order Amending Part III, Section B of the Supreme Court Rules and Establishing Committees Relating to the Admission of Applicants to Practice Law.93-00008
11/17/1993Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment. (See order for appointments.)93-00009
10/10/1994Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment. (See order for appointments.)94-00003
01/24/1995Administrative CaseFiled Order or Appointment. (Richard G. Campbell).95-00013
12/08/1995Administrative CaseFiled Motion to amend AKDT 171 filed September 29, 1993. (Received from Ronald D. Alling, Chair Board of Bar Examiners).95-00014
04/05/1996Administrative CaseFiled Order re: Committee on Moral Character and Fitness. This court has reviewed and considered the Board of Bar Examiner's proposed changes to the composition and functioning of this Committee, and it appears to this court that the amendment of its order of September 29, 1993, is warranted with respect to the provisions regarding the composition of the Committee on Moral Character and Fitness, and the number of members necessary to constitute a quorum. This order shall be effective immediately, and the additional members of this committee shall be appointed within 30 days from the date of this order.96-00003
10/30/1997Administrative CaseFiled Petition.97-00014
11/19/1997Administrative CasePublic Meeting on the Administrative Docket.
12/18/1997Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment. (See order for appointments).97-00015
06/25/1998Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment Re: Character and Fitness Committee. (See order for appointments).98-00612
06/25/1998Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment Re: Functional Equivalency Committee. (See order for appointments).98-00613
12/30/1998Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment. (See order for appointments).98-00614
04/08/2002Administrative CaseFiled Order Amending Rule 49 of the Supreme Court Rules and Addenda 1 and 2 to the Supreme Court Rules (Exhibit A and B attached). ADKT 171, 176, and 240.02-22272
04/08/2002Notice/OutgoingFiled Notice of Rule Changes to the State Bar of Nevada for publication in the next issue of Nevada Lawyer. ADKT 171, 176 , and 240.02-22273
04/08/2002Administrative CaseFiled Order Implementing Amendments to Rule 49 of the Supreme Court Rules. ADKT 171, 176 , and 240.02-22274
05/20/2002Administrative CaseFiled Order Implementing Amendments to Rule 49 of the Supreme Court Rules. ADKT 171, 176, and 240.02-22275
02/21/2003Administrative CaseFiled Order Implementing Amendments to Rule 49 of the Supreme Court Rules. ADKT 171 and 176.03-21755
02/21/2003Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment Re: Functional Equivalency Committee. (Charles T. Meredith).03-21756
02/21/2003Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment Re: Board of Bar Examiners. C. Robert Cox has resigned and John Reese Petty is appointed to fill the unexpired term of Mr. Cox. Further, Mr. Petty is appointed to a full three-year term commencing in October 2003,03-21757
03/06/2003Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment Re: Functional Equivalency Committee. (Charles T. Meredith).03-21758
12/18/2003Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment Re: Board of Bar Examiners. (Allan R. Earl).03-21759
05/28/2004Administrative CaseFiled Order Implementing Amendments to Rule 49 of the Supreme Court Rules. ADKT 171 and 368. (See order for appointments).04-23750
11/03/2004Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment Re: Board of Bar Examiners. (George W. Foley, Jr. and Floyd A. Hale).04-23751
10/07/2005Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment Re: Board of Bar Examiners. (Richard M. Trachok, II and Ann Morgan.)05-25504
10/07/2005Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment Re: Character and Fitness Committee. (See order for appointments).05-25505
10/10/2005Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment Re: Functional Equivalency Committee. (See order for appointments.)05-25506
05/04/2006Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment Re: Board of Bar Examiners. (See order for appointments.)06-26782
11/08/2006Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment Re: Board of Bar Examiners. (See order for appointments.)06-26783
11/08/2006Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment Re: Character and Fitness Committee. (See order for appointments.)06-26784
11/08/2006Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment Re: Functional Equivalency Committee. (See order for appointments.)06-26785
12/05/2007Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment Re: Board of Bar Examiners. (See order for appointments.)07-28418
12/05/2007Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment Re: Character and Fitness Committee. (See order for appointments.)07-28419
12/05/2007Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment Re: Functional Equivalency Committee. (See order for appointments.)07-28417
12/03/2008Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment Re: Character and Fitness Committee. (See order for appointments.)08-33136
12/03/2008Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment Re: Functional Equivalency Committee. (See order for appointments.)08-33135
12/17/2008Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment Re: Board of Bar Examiners. (See order for appointments.)08-33137
02/17/2010Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment re: Board of Bar Examiners. Judge Allan Earl and John Petty are reappointed as members for 3-year terms expiring October 2012.10-34196
02/17/2010Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment re: Character and Fitness Committee. Margo Piscevich reappointed as a member for a 3-year term expiring October 2012. John C. Lambrose and Kathleen Janssen are appointed as members for 3-year terms expiring October 2012.10-34197
02/17/2010Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment re: Functional Equivalency Committee. Paul Lychuk is reappointed as a member for a 3-year term expiring October 2012.10-34198
10/25/2010Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment re: Board of Bar Examiners. John P. Desmond, Floyd A. Hale and Shawn Meader are reappointed as members for 3-year terms expiring October 2013.10-34194
10/25/2010Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment re: Character and Fitness Committee. Michael P. Mersch is reappointed as a member for a 3-year term expiring October 2013.10-34195
10/25/2010Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment re: Functional Equivalency Committee. George B. Hibbeler is reappointed as a member for a 3-year term expiring October 2013.10-34199
06/29/2011Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment re: Board of Bar Examiners. Richard M. Trachok is reappointed as Chair, Lynn S. Fulstone is appointed as Vice Chair, Mark Wenzel reappointed as a member, and Dawn Ellerbrock appointed as a member for 3-year terms expiring October 2014.11-19309
10/27/2011Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment re: Functional Equivalency Committee. Thomas Beatty is reappointed as Chair, and Jeffrey Rodefer is reappointed as Vice-Chair for 3-year terms expiring October 2013.11-33159
11/17/2011Administrative CaseFiled Order Correcting Clerical Error. On October 27, 2011, this court entered an order reappointing Thomas Beatty and Jeffrey Rodefer to the Functional Equivalency Committee for terms of three years. The order contained a clerical error regarding the expiration date of the terms. The terms will expire October 2014.11-35464
12/08/2011Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment re: Character and Fitness Committee. Janet Blumen is reappointed as a member for a 3-year term expiring October 2014.11-37628
09/07/2012Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment re: Board of Bar Examiners. John Petty is reappointed as a member for a 3-year term expiring October 2015.12-28265
09/07/2012Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment re: Character and Fitness Committee. John Lambrose, Margo Piscevich and Kathleen Janssen reappointed as members for 3-year terms expiring October 2015.12-28269
09/20/2012Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment Re: Board of Examiners. It is hereby ordered that the Hon. Jennifer Togliatti is appointed as a member of the Board of Examiners to a three-year term expiring in October 2015.12-29778
10/08/2012Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment re: Functional Equivalency Committee. Paul Lychuk and Pamela Lawson reappointed for three-year terms expiring October 2015.12-31624
05/06/2013Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment re: Character and Fitness Committee. Michael S. Rowe has requested a leave of absence from service on the committee. John Bailey will serve as Interim Acting Chair until further order of this court.13-13571
09/04/2013Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment re: Board of Bar Examiners. John P. Desmond and Shawn Meader are reappointed as members for 3-year terms expiring October 2016.13-26046
09/04/2013Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment re: Functional Equivalency Committee. George B. Hibbeler is reappointed as a member for a 3-year term expiring October 2016.13-26047
09/11/2013Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment Re: Board of Examiners. It is hereby ordered that Michael Buckley is appointed as a member of the Board of Examiners to a three-year term expiring in October 2016.13-26798
10/07/2013Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment re: Character and Fitness Committee. Michael Mersch is reappointed as a member for a 3-year term expiring October 2016.13-29849
06/10/2014Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment re: Functional Equivalency Committee. Thomas D. Beatty and Jeffrey R. Rodefer are reappointed as members for 3-year terms expiring October 2017.14-18855
06/10/2014Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment Re: Board of Examiners. It is hereby ordered that Richard M. Trachok, II, is reappointed as Chair, Lynn S. Fulstonr is reappointed as Vice Chair, and the Honorable Jennifer Togliatti is reappointed as a member of the Board of Examiners to three-year terms expiring in October 2017.14-18856
06/10/2014Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment re: Character and Fitness Committee. Janet Blumen is reappointed as a member for a 3-year term expiring October 2017.14-18859
04/10/2015Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment Re: Board of Bar Examiners. John R. Petty is reappointed as a member of the Board of Bar examiners to a three-year term expiring in October 2018.15-10863
04/10/2015Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment Re: Functional Equivalency Committee. Paul Lychuk and Pamela Lawson are reappointed as members of the Functional Equivalency Committee for three-year terms expiring in October 2018.15-10864
07/24/2015Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment Re: Character and Fitness Committee. John Bailey will serve as the Chair of the Character and Fitness Committee until further order of this court.15-22472
07/24/2015Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment Re: Character and Fitness Committee. John Lambrose, Margo Piscevich, and Kathleen Janssen are reappointed as members of the Character and Fitness Committee for three-year terms expiring in October 2018.15-22473
10/12/2015Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment Re: Character and Fitness Committee. Uri Clinton and Richard Glasson are appointed as members of the Character and Fitness Committee for three-year terms expiring in October 2018.15-30985
07/22/2016Administrative CaseFiled Filed Order of Appointment Re: Functional Equivalency Committee. George B. Hibbeler is reappointed as member of the Functional Equivalency Committee for three-year terms expiring in October 2019.16-22817
07/22/2016Administrative CaseFiled Filed Order of Appointment Re: Character and Fitness Committee. John R. Bailey is reappointed as Chair of the Committee on Moral Character and Fitness for three-year term expiring in October 2019.16-22818
07/22/2016Administrative CaseFiled Filed Order of Appointment Re: Character and Fitness Committee. Michael P. Mersch is reappointed as member of the Character and Fitness Committee for a three-year term expiring in October 2019.16-22819
11/15/2016Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment Re: Board of Bar Examiners. John P. Desmond, Shawn B. Meador, Michael Buckley, and the Hon. Bridget Robb are reappointed as members of the Board of Bar Examiners to three-year terms expiring in October 2019.16-35591
09/11/2017Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment re: Functional Equivalency Committee. Thomas D. Beatty is reappointed as Chair, and Jeffrey R. Rodefer is reappointed as Vice Chair for 3-year terms expiring October 2020.17-30473
09/11/2017Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment re: Character and Fitness Committee. Janet Blumen is reappointed as a member for a 3-year term expiring October 2020.17-30474
10/23/2017Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment Re: Board of Examiners. It is hereby ordered that Richard M. Trachok, II, is reappointed as Chair, Lynn S. Fulstone is reappointed as Vice Chair, and the Honorable Jennifer Togliatti is reappointed as a member of the Board of Examiners to three-year terms expiring in October 2020.17-36131
12/20/2017Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment Re: Board of Examiners. John Petty has resigned from the Board of Bar Examiners prior to the expiration of his term in October 2018. It is hereby ordered that the Hon. Tierra Jones, is appointed as a member of the Board of Bar Examiners to fill the unexpired term of John Petty.17-43977
09/21/2018Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment re: Character and Fitness Committee. Kathleen Janssen, the Honorable Richard Glasson, and Uri L. Clinton are reappointed as a members for a 3-year term expiring October 2021. Carli Kinne is appointed to fill seat B on the Northern Panel of the committee and John Shook is appointed to fill seat C on the Southern Panel of the Committee.18-37025
11/09/2018Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment re: Functional Equivalency Committee. Paul Lychuk and Pamela Lawson are reappointed as members of the Functional Equivalency Committee for three-year terms expiring in November 2021.18-903552
06/28/2019Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment Re: Board of Bar Examiners. It is hereby ordered that the Honorable Tierra Jones is reappointed as a member of the Board of Bar Examiners, effective October 2018, to a three-year term expiring on 2021.19-27866
09/06/2019Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment Re: Character and Fitness Committee. Michael P. Mersch is reappointed as member of the Character and Fitness Committee for a three-year term expiring in October 2022.19-37422
09/06/2019Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment Re: Board of Bar Examiners. John P. Desmond, Shawn B. Meador, Michael Buckley, and the Hon. Bridget Robb are reappointed as members of the Board of Bar Examiners to three-year terms expiring in October 2022.19-37423
09/06/2019Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment Re: Functional Equivalency Committee. George B. Hibbeler is reappointed as member of the Functional Equivalency Committee for three-year term expiring in October 2022.19-37426