The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Administrative Case: ADKT 0417
Short Caption:IN RE: RULE 10 OF THE SECOND JUDICIAL DISTRICT COURTClassification:Administrative - ADKT - ADKT
Case Status:ADKT Order Filed
Filed Date:08/20/2007Public Hearing:
Closed Date:06/20/2008

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/20/2007Administrative CaseFiled Petition.07-28460
11/19/2007Administrative CaseFiled Order Amending Rule 10 of the Local Rules of Practice for the Second Judicial District Court (WDCR 10) (Exhibit A attached.) Effective 30 days from the date of this order.07-28461
06/20/2008Administrative CaseCase Closed.
11/02/2016Administrative CaseCase Reopened.
11/02/2016Administrative CaseFiled Petition.Y16-34173
02/16/2017Administrative CaseFiled Amended Petition.Y17-05638
03/24/2017Administrative CaseFiled Order Amending Rule 10 of the Local Rules of Practice for the Second Judicial District Court (WDCR 10) (Exhibit A attached.)17-09798