The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Administrative Case: ADKT 0126
Short Caption:IN RE: ALTERNATIVES TO TRADITIONAL LITIGATION (ARBITRATORS/ARBITRATION)Classification:Administrative - ADKT - ADKT
Case Status:ADKT Order Filed
Filed Date:12/19/1989Public Hearing:
Closed Date:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/19/1989Administrative CaseFiled Petition to Appoint Study Committee.89-00001
12/20/1989Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Study Committee.89-00002
01/23/1990Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Peggy Manes, Esq. as an additional member to the committed.90-00001
11/29/1990Administrative CaseFiled Final Report of Study Committee.90-00002
02/22/1991Administrative CaseFiled Order Amending Nevada Supreme Court Rules by Adding Subpart A to Part V, Nevada Arbitration Rules. Exhibit A attached.91-00001
03/12/1991Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Implementation Committee. Exhibit A attached.91-00002
07/12/1991Administrative CaseFiled Order Amending Rules 3, 16, 20 and 24 of the Nevada Arbitration Rules.91-00003
04/08/1992Administrative CaseFiled Order Amending the Nevada Arbitration Rules. Exhibit A attached.92-00001
07/24/1992Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Panel of Attorney Arbitrators.92-00002
08/10/1992Administrative CaseFiled Supplemental Order Appointing Panel of Attorney Arbitrators.92-00003
09/03/1992Administrative CaseFiled Supplemental Order Appointing Panel of Attorney Arbitrators.92-00004
10/05/1992Administrative CaseFiled Court Annexed Alternate Dispute Resolution (Implementation Committee Report).92-00005
11/05/1992Administrative CaseFiled Order. It is hereby ordered that a General Implementation Subcommittee be appointed to evaluated the efficiency and progress of the ADR program. Exhibit A attached. The subcommittee shall filed a formal report with the clerk of this court as six (6) month intervals.92-00006
05/07/1993Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Panel of Attorney Arbitrators.93-00001
06/28/1993Administrative CaseFiled Second Implementation Subcommittee Report.93-00002
09/24/1993Administrative CaseFiled Order Amending the Nevada Rules of Arbitration.93-00003
09/24/1993Administrative CaseFiled Order Relating to the Appointment of Arbitrators. Executive Sectretary of the State Bar's Report due: 20 days.93-00004
09/24/1993Administrative CaseFiled Supplemental Order Appointing Panel of Attorney Arbitrators. (J. Mitchell Cobeaga, Allan Earl, Aubrey Goldberg, Bert Mitchell, Carl J. Christensen)93-00005
12/22/1993Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Panel of Attorney Arbitrators. (See order for appointments).93-00006
12/22/1993Administrative CaseFiled Order Extending the Nevada Rules of Arbitration.93-00007
04/22/1994Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Arbitrators. (See order for appointments.)94-00001
06/08/1994Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Panel of Attorney Arbitrators.94-00002
06/22/1995Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Panel of Attorney Arbitrators. (See order for appointments.)95-00001
10/05/1995Administrative CaseFiled Order Vacating Order entered on June 22, 1995 and Amended Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrators and Non-Attorney Arbitrators.95-00002
10/12/1995Administrative CaseFiled Order Denying Appointment. We deny Herndon's request for appointment.95-00003
12/21/1995Administrative CaseFiled Order Amending Rules 3 and 16 of the Nevada Arbitration Rules.95-00004
08/16/1996Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Subcommittee. (see exhibit A).96-00001
12/27/1996Administrative CaseFiled Supplemental Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrators.96-00002
01/30/1997Administrative CasePublic Meeting on the Administrative Docket.
02/13/1997Administrative CaseFiled Order Reconstituting Subcommittee. (See exhibit A). Subcommittee Report due: 90 days.97-00004
03/28/1997Administrative CaseFiled Order. The General Implementation Subcommittee shall have to and including August 12, 1997, to file a subcommittee report.97-00005
06/19/1997Administrative CaseFiled Supplemental Order Appointing Panel of Attorney Arbitrators. (See order for appointments).97-00007
09/02/1997Administrative CaseFiled Order the subcommittee shall have to and including October 13, 1997, to file with the clerk of this court a formal subcommittee report.97-00008
10/16/1997Administrative CaseFiled Report of the General Implementation Subcommittee Re: ADR.97-00009
11/19/1997Administrative CasePublic Hearing held on the Administrative Docket.
12/03/1997Administrative CaseFiled Opposition to Proposed Amendments to Nevada Arbitration Rules. (Submitted by John V. Riggs, Esq.)97-00010
12/24/1997Administrative CaseFiled Order Amending the Nevada Rules of Arbitration with Exhibit A attached.97-00011
12/24/1997Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rule Change to the State Bar of Nevada for Publication.97-00012
12/31/1997Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrator: Gregory Barlow.97-00013
04/10/1998Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Non-Attorney Arbitrators.98-00597
04/10/1998Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrators. (See order for appointments.)98-00598
05/20/1998Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbritators. (See order for appointments).98-00601
05/20/1998Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Non-Attorney Arbitrator: Karl Edward Neathammer.98-00602
08/14/1998Administrative CaseFiled Application for Certification as an Arbitrator: applicant Sharon E. Claassen.98-00605
09/02/1998Administrative CaseFiled Order - State Bar Report regarding Benjamin Zvenia due: 30 days.98-00606
10/01/1998Administrative CaseFiled Recommendation and Report pursuant to Order of Referral Re: Benjamin Zvenia.98-00607
12/30/1998Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrator: Sharon E. Claassen.98-00608
03/26/1999Administrative CaseFiled Order Removing Benjamin Zvenia as an Appointed Non-Attorney Arbitrator.99-13465
04/28/1999Administrative CaseFiled letter from Judges David Gamble and Michael Gibbons regarding Michael C. Riley's and Eric M. Teitelman's certification as arbitrators.99-13467
06/01/1999Administrative CaseFiled Order Denying Motion. We conclude that Zvenia has not demonstrated good cause for an enlargement of time prescribed in NRAP 40 for rehearing petitions.99-13468
08/20/1999Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Non-Attorney Arbitrators. (Michael C. Riley and Eric M. Teitelman)99-13470
04/27/2000Administrative CaseFiled Order Amending Rules 20 and 24 of the Nevada Rules of Arbitration.00-22781
04/27/2000Administrative CaseIssued Notice - Mailed to State Bar of Nevada for publication in the next issue of Nevada Lawyer.00-22782
06/07/2000Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrator William S. Barker.00-22783
01/26/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from the State Bar: Arbitration Training Certification (Richard Staub)01-21962
03/20/2001Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrators. (75 attorneys)01-21963
05/08/2001Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrator: Henry H. Rawlings, Jr.01-21964
06/18/2001Administrative CaseFiled Order Amending Nevada Arbitration Rule 7 with Exhibit A attached.01-21965
06/19/2001Administrative CaseIssued Notice of Rule Change - Mailed to State Bar of Nevada for publication in the next issue of Nevada Lawyer.01-21966
10/03/2001Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Non-Attorney Arbitrators. (See order for appointments).01-21967
10/25/2001Administrative CaseFiled Order Amending Rule 24 of tne Nevada Rules of Arbitration (Exhibit A attached).01-21968
10/25/2001Administrative CaseIssued Notice of Rule Change - Mailed to State Bar of Nevada for publication in the next issue of Nevada Lawyer.01-21969
02/06/2002Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrators. (See order for appointments.)02-22265
03/06/2002Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrators. (See order for appointments).02-22266
03/06/2002Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Non-Attorney Arbitrators. (See order for appointmens).02-22267
04/08/2002Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrators. (See order for appointments).02-22268
07/26/2002Administrative CaseFiled Order Amending Rule 7 of the Nevada Rules of Arbitration.02-22269
07/26/2002Administrative CaseIssued Notice of Rule Change - Mailed to State Bar of Nevada for publication in the next issue of Nevada Lawyer.02-22270
10/30/2002Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrators. (See order for appointments).02-22271
02/21/2003Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrators. (See order for appointments.)03-21746
04/28/2003Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrator. (Craig M. Murphy)03-21747
04/28/2003Administrative CaseFiled Order Amending Rule 20 of the NAR. (Exhibit A attached.) Effective in 60 days.03-21748
04/28/2003Administrative CaseIssued Notice of Rule Change - Mailed to State Bar of Nevada for publication in the next issue of Nevada Lawyer.03-21749
05/23/2003Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrator. Joanne M. Grundman.03-21750
06/05/2003Administrative CaseFiled Corrected Order Appointing Arbitrator. Joanne M. Grundman is appointed as a non-attorney arbitrator.03-21751
08/29/2003Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrators. (See order for appointments.)03-21752
08/29/2003Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Non-Attorney Arbitrators. (See order for appointments.)03-21753
10/27/2003Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrators. (See order for appointments.)03-21754
03/24/2004Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrators. (See order for appointments.)04-23744
03/24/2004Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Non-Attorney Arbitrators. (See order for appointments.)04-23745
07/16/2004Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Non-Attorney Arbitrators. (See order for appointments.)04-23746
09/13/2004Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Arbitrators. (See order for appointments).04-23747
12/16/2004Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrators. (See order for appointments.)04-23748
12/16/2004Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Non-Attorney Arbitrators. (See order for appointments.)04-23749
04/05/2005Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrators. (See order for appointments.)05-25501
10/07/2005Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Non-Attorney Arbitrators. (See order for appointments.)05-25502
10/07/2005Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrators. (See order for appointments.)05-25503
01/13/2006Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrators. (See order for appointments.)06-26775
01/13/2006Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Non-Attorney Arbitrators. (See order for appointments.)06-26776
03/13/2006Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrators. (See order for appointments.)06-26777
03/13/2006Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Non-Attorney Arbitrator. (Robert M. Shaw)06-26778
05/05/2006Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrators. (See order for appointments.)06-26779
07/07/2006Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrator. David P. Lane.06-26780
11/06/2006Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrators. (See order for appointments.)06-26781
03/02/2007Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrators. (See order for appointments.)07-28410
04/30/2007Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrator. Paul H. Lamboley.07-28411
06/22/2007Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrators. Jeffrey A. Cogan and Robert T. Robbins.07-28412
09/12/2007Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrators. (Katherine F. Parks, Thomas R. Brooksbank, Patrick N. Chapin, Kevin R. Hansen)07-28413
09/12/2007Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Non-Attorney Arbitrator. Gerhardt Schreiber.07-28414
11/14/2007Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrator. Michael R. Griffin.07-28415
12/24/2007Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrators. Scott Chapman and Christian Hardigree.07-28416
02/08/2008Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrators. Brian Holthus, Michael K. Johnson, Gregory Miles, Richard Terry, Lee Bateman, Sunny Kwon, Michael R. Merritt, David Sampson.08-33131
03/20/2008Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrator. Richard J. Vilkin.08-33132
07/09/2008Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrators. Adam Ganz, Steven Goldstein, Dawn Hooker, James Kohl, Jonathan Reed, William Richardson, George Greenberg.08-33133
03/18/2009Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrators. Charles Bennion, Devon Reese, Margaret Crowley, Sharon Nelson.09-31675
03/26/2009Administrative CaseFiled Order Removing Robert Shaw from list of Appointed Non-Attorney Arbitrators.09-31676
05/20/2009Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrator. Marshall Smith.09-31677
10/07/2009Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrators. Sherry Bowers and Jack Chen Min Juan.09-31678
10/07/2009Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Non-Attorney Arbitrator Robert A. Spoon.09-31679
11/03/2009Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrators. Paul Lychuk and Brent Harsh.09-31680
12/08/2009Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Non-Attorney Arbitrator Nancy K. Aten.09-31681
12/08/2009Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrators. Richard Avila, Richard Englemann, Scott Heaton, Charlie Luh, Thomas Perkins, Tina Yan, James Puzey.09-31682
02/16/2010Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrators. Noah Allison, Kurt Bonds, Douglas R. Brown, Tracey B. Howard, James W. Howard, Steven J. Klearman, Adam Muslusky, Tiffinay B. Pagni, Esther Rodriguez, David Zaniel.10-34191
05/05/2010Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrator. Steven M. Burris.10-34192
07/27/2010Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrator. Charles Lybarger.10-34193
12/08/2010Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrators. Aaron Lovaas, Richard Young.10-31931
12/27/2010Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrators. Marjorie L. Hauf and Dean J. Gould.10-33692
02/24/2011Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrator. Matthew Vannah.11-05690
04/06/2011Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrators. (Carlos Blumberg, Theresa M. Dowling, Brent J. Jordan, David H. Putney)11-10174
05/17/2011Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrators. (Larry Hankins, Amy Honodel, Louis Csoka)11-14673
05/17/2011Administrative CaseFiled Order Denying Appointment of Attorney Arbitrator. (Gregory Cortese)11-14674
07/12/2011Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrators. (Matthew Dunkley, Douglas Gardner, Dale Kleven, Mark Liapis).11-20765
09/20/2011Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrators. (James W. Penrose, Michelle O. Tobler, Mark R. Borghese, William P. Volk, Justin L. Wilson).11-28744
01/20/2012Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrator. (Denise Mikrut)12-01966
01/20/2012Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrators. (Brian Dziminski, Leah Martin, Kevin Sprenz, James Van Winkle)12-01967
02/24/2012Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrators. (Naomi Arin, Robert Baird, Susan Bush, Sean Claggett)12-05973
02/24/2012Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Non-Attorney Arbitrator. (Todd Westergard)12-05974
03/15/2012Letter/IncomingFiled Letter from Admissions Director stating that Matthew Dunkley did not comply with the court's order to participate in the training and must be removed from the list of attorney arbitrators.12-09580
03/15/2012Letter/IncomingFiled Letter from Admissions Director stating that Dale Kleven did not comply with the court's order to participate in the training and must be removed from the list of attorney arbitrators.12-09581
03/16/2012Administrative CaseFiled Certificate of Arbitrator Applicant Background Investigation. Non-attorney Ira David.12-09584
03/16/2012Administrative CaseFiled Certificates of Nevada License Attorney Arbitrator Applicant Membership File Review. Attorneys Michael T. Gebhart, Alexandra B. McLeod, Robert B. Ryder, Mark E. Trafton.12-09585
04/10/2012Administrative CaseFiled Certificates of Nevada License Attorney Arbitrator Applicant Membership File Review. Attorneys Jason J. Bach, Jay A. Kenyon, Marc P. Picker, Stephen L. Titzer.12-11305
05/08/2012Administrative CaseFiled Certificate of Nevada License Attorney Arbitrator Applicant Membership File Review. (Patti Wise)12-14825
05/17/2012Administrative CaseFiled Certificate of Nevada License Attorney Arbitrator Applicant Membership File Review. (Gary Call)12-15745
05/23/2012Administrative CaseFiled Order Removing Attorneys from List of Appointed Arbitrators. Attorneys did not comply with this court's order to participate in the training (Matthew Dunkley and Dale Kleven).12-16306
05/23/2012Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrators. (Jason J. Bach, Michael T. Gebhart, Jay A. Kenyon, Alexandra B. McLeod, Marc P. Picker, Robert B. Ryder, Mark E. Trafton, Stephen L. Titzer, Patti Wise)12-16317
05/23/2012Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Non-Attorney Arbitrator. (Ira David)12-16329
06/11/2012Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrator. (Cary Call)12-18223
08/17/2012Administrative CaseFiled Certificate of Nevada License Attorney Arbitrator Applicant Membership File Review (Peter Mortenson).12-25977
08/29/2012Administrative CaseFiled Certificate of Nevada License Attorney Arbitrator Applicant Membership File Review (Mary Maynard).12-27473
08/29/2012Administrative CaseFiled Certificate of Nevada License Attorney Arbitrator Applicant Membership File Review (Raymond McKay).12-27479
08/29/2012Administrative CaseFiled Certificate of Nevada License Attorney Arbitrator Applicant Membership File Review (Darius Rafie).12-27481
09/05/2012Administrative CaseFiled Certificate of Arbitrator Applicant Background Investigation. (Non-Attorney Ileana Drobkin)Y12-27944
10/02/2012Administrative CaseFiled Certificate of Arbitrator Applicant Background Investigation. (Non-Attorney Robert Shaw)Y12-31277
10/05/2012Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrators. (Mary Maynard, Peter Mortenson, Darius Rafie, Raymond McKay)12-31475
10/17/2012Administrative CaseFiled Certificate of Nevada Licensed Attorney Arbitrator Applicant Membership File Review (Colby Beck, Samuel Benham, John Samberg, Marsha Stephenson).12-32998
10/17/2012Administrative CaseFiled Certificate of Arbitrator Applicant Background Investigation. (Non-Attorney Stephen Quinn)12-32999
10/22/2012Administrative CaseFiled Certificate of Nevada Licensed Attorney Arbitrator Applicant Membership File Review (Colby Beck). Updated certificate.12-33453
10/22/2012Administrative CaseFiled Letter from Laura Gould stating that Steven Burris has not complied with the court's order to participate in training and should be removed from the list of attorney arbitrators.Y12-33455
10/31/2012Administrative CaseFiled Certificate of Nevada Licensed Attorney Arbitrator Applicant Membership File Review. (Amanda Cowley, Ryan Johnson, Tony May, Justin Watkins)12-40674
11/09/2012Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrators. (Colby Beck, Marsha Stephenson, Samuel Benham, John Samberg)12-35475
11/09/2012Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Non-Attorney Arbitrator. (Stephen Quinn)12-35499
12/26/2012Administrative CaseFiled Certificate of Nevada Licensed Attorney Arbitrator Applicant Membership File Review (Matthew Hoffman, Ross Smillie).12-40675
02/22/2013Administrative CaseFiled Certificate of Nevada Licensed Attorney Arbitrator Applicant Membership File Review. (Richard L. Litt, Christine A. Roberts)13-05723
03/13/2013Administrative CaseFiled Certificate of Nevada Licensed Attorney Arbitrator Applicant Membership File Review. (Samuel Harding, John Moore, Nikola Skrinjaric)13-07604
03/14/2013Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrators. (Ryan Johnson, Tony May, Christine Roberts, Ross Smillie, Amanda Cowley, Samuel Harding, Matthew Hoffmann, Richard Litt, John Moore, Nikola Skrinjaric, Justin Watkins)13-07831
03/18/2013Administrative CaseFiled Certificate of Nevada Licensed Attorney Arbitrator Applicant Membership File Review. (Douglas Rands)13-08060
04/01/2013Administrative CaseFiled Certificate of Nevada Licensed Attorney Arbitrator Applicant Membership File Review. (Paul Georgeson, Martina Shindelus).13-13444
04/08/2013Administrative CaseFiled Certificate of Nevada Licensed Attorney Arbitrator Applicant Membership File Review. (Jane Eberhardy, Thomas Harper)13-10238
05/13/2013Administrative CaseFiled Certificate of Nevada Licensed Attorney Arbitrator Applicant Membership File Review. (Richard Johnson)13-14057
05/17/2013Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrators. (Richard S. Johnson, Jane Eberhardy, Paul Georgeson, Thomas Harper, Douglas Rands, Martina Shindelus).13-14578
06/19/2013Administrative CaseFiled Certificate of Nevada Licensed Attorney Arbitrator Applicant Membership File Review. (Kristine Jensen, Leonard Stone)13-18069
06/19/2013Administrative CaseFiled Certificate of Non-Attorney Arbitrator Applicant Background Investigation. (Lawrence Pentis)13-18071
07/09/2013Administrative CaseFiled Certificate of Nevada Licensed Attorney Arbitrator Applicant Membership File Review. (Curtis Rawlings)13-19941
08/08/2013Administrative CaseFiled Certificate of Nevada Licensed Attorney Arbitrator Applicant Membership File Review. (Marisa Guarino)13-23241
08/12/2013Administrative CaseFiled Certificate of Nevada Licensed Attorney Arbitrator Applicant Membership File Review. (Michael Federico)13-23651
10/08/2013Administrative CaseFiled Certificate of Nevada Licensed Attorney Arbitrator Applicant Membership File Review. (David M. Moore)13-30099
10/08/2013Administrative CaseFiled Certificate of Nevada Licensed Attorney Arbitrator Applicant Membership File Review. (Daniel J. Reed)13-30101
11/01/2013Administrative CaseFiled Certificate of Nevada Licensed Attorney Arbitrator Applicant Membership File Review. (Michael Brock)13-33009
11/01/2013Administrative CaseFiled Certificate of Nevada Licensed Attorney Arbitrator Applicant Membership File Review. (Dustin Dingman)13-33010
12/02/2013Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrators. (Dustin L. Dingman, Michael J. Brock, Michael A. Federico, Marisa C. Guarino, Kristine Jensen, David M. Moore, Curtis R. Rawlings, Daniel J. Reed, Leonard Stone)13-36118
12/02/2013Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Non-Attorney Arbitrator. (Lawrence Pentis)13-36119
12/16/2013Administrative CaseFiled Letter from Laura Gould stating that Naomi Arin, Samuel Benham, Samuel Harding and John Samberg have not complied with the court's order to participate in training and should be removed from the list of attorney arbitrators. lcastilloY13-38110
12/24/2013Letter/IncomingFiled Letter from John Samberg re: Arbitrator Training--Request for Waiver to Attend Next Program.13-39161
01/27/2014Administrative CaseFiled Arbitrator Application. (David B. Wasson)14-02636
02/03/2014Administrative CaseFiled Certificates of Nevada Licensed Attorney Arbitrator Applicant Membership File Review. (Monti Levy, Donald Lowrey, Eric Marshall, Michaela Tramel)14-03430
03/24/2014Administrative CaseFiled Certificate of Nevada Licensed Attorney Arbitrator Applicant Membership File Review. (David Boehrer)14-09267
04/02/2014Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrators. (Monti Levi; David B. Wasson; David Boehrer; Donald Lowrey; Eric Marshall; Michaela Tramel)14-10428
04/23/2014Administrative CaseFiled Order Removing Attorneys from List of Appointed Arbitrators. (Naomi Arin; Samuel Benham; Steven Burris; Samuel Harding)14-13016
05/05/2014Administrative CaseFiled Certificate of Nevada Licensed Attorney Arbitrator Applicant Membership. (Francis Kelly Cawley) (Michael G. Chapman) (Robert D. Kurdziel)14-14401
06/03/2014Administrative CaseFiled Certificate of Nevada Licensed Attorney Arbitrator Applicant. (Andrew S. Fritz; George G. Trachtman)14-18068
06/03/2014Administrative CaseFiled Certificate of Arbitrator Applicant Background Investigation. (Non-Attorney John E. Carne)14-18073
06/26/2014Administrative CaseFiled Certificate of Nevada Licensed Attorney Arbitrator Applicant. (Kimberly L. Johnson)14-21054
08/28/2014Administrative CaseFiled Certificate of Nevada Licensed Attorney Arbitrator Applicant. (James A. Fontano; Lyn MacNabb; David M. Jones; Yianna Reizakis)14-28487
10/10/2014Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Non-Attorney Arbitrator. (John E. Carne)14-33765
10/10/2014Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrators. (Francis Kelly Cawley; Andrew S. Fritz; Kimberly L. Johnson; Lynn MacNabb; Michael G. CHapman; James A. Fontano; David M. Jones; Robert D. Kurdziel; George G. Trachtman)14-33768
10/20/2014Administrative CaseFiled Certificate of Nevada Licensed Attorney Arbitrator Applicant. (Chris Davis; Jeffrey Galliher; Jonathan Remmel)14-34804
11/25/2014Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrators. (Yianna Reizakis; Chris Davis; Jeffrey Galliher; Jonathan Remmel)14-38884
12/01/2014Administrative CaseFiled Certificate of Nevada Licensed Attorney Arbitrator Applicant (Jared B Anderson).14-39137
12/17/2014Administrative CaseFiled Certificate of Nevada Licensed Attorney Arbitrator Applicant (Athanasia Dalacas; Melissa Alessi).14-41110
01/02/2015Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrators. (Athanasia Dalacas; Jared Anderson; Melissa Alessi)15-00005
01/15/2015Administrative CaseFiled Certificate of Nevada Licensed Attorney Arbitrator Applicant (Cassandra Jones; Paul Shindelus).15-01728
01/23/2015Administrative CaseFiled Certificate of Nevada Licensed Attorney Arbitrator Applicant (James E Murphy; Robert S Rasmussen).15-02632
02/06/2015Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrators. (Cassandra Jones; James E. Murphy; Robert S. Rasmussen; Paul Shindelus)15-04049
02/06/2015Administrative CaseFiled Certificate of Nevada Licensed Attorney Arbitrator Applicant. (Andrew Craner)15-04052
03/02/2015Administrative CaseFiled Certificate of Nevada Licensed Attorney Arbitrator Applicant. (Kevin P. King)15-06495
03/10/2015Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrators. (Andrew Craner)15-07439
03/16/2015Administrative CaseFiled Certificate of Nevada Licensed Attorney Arbitrator Applicant. (Jacquelyn Leleu; Williams Sykes)15-08071
03/23/2015Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrators. (Kevin P. King; Jacquelyn Leleu; William Sykes)15-08829
04/21/2015Administrative CaseFiled Certificate of Nevada Licensed Attorney Arbitrator Applicant. (Nadine Morton)15-12027
04/27/2015Administrative CaseFiled Certificate of Nevada Licensed Attorney Arbitrator Applicant. (Richard Hawkins)15-12713
05/08/2015Administrative CaseFiled Revised Certificate of Nevada Licensed Attorney Arbitrator Applicant. (Richard Hawkins)15-14175
06/09/2015Administrative CaseFiled Certificate of Nevada Licensed Attorney Arbitrator Applicant. (John Shook)15-17506
06/15/2015Administrative CaseFiled Certificate of Nevada Licensed Attorney Arbitrator Applicant. (Josephine McPeak; Kristan Lehtinen)15-18075
06/15/2015Administrative CaseFiled Certificate of Nevada Licensed Attorney Arbitrator Applicant. (Karl Olsen)15-18168
06/23/2015Administrative CaseFiled Letter from Dean Gould stating that Kristine Jensen, David Jones, and John Samberg have not complied with the court's order to participate in training and should be removed from the list of attorney arbitrators.15-19106
06/30/2015Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrators. (John Shook)15-19949
06/30/2015Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrators. (Josephine McPeak; Kristan Lehtinen)15-19950
07/02/2015Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrators. (Nadine Morton).15-20292
07/02/2015Administrative CaseFiled Order Denying Appointment of Attorney Arbitrator (Richard Hawkins).15-20293
07/20/2015Administrative CaseFiled Certificate of Nevada Licensed Attorney Arbitrator Applicant. (Marc Randazza)15-21867
08/05/2015Administrative CaseFiled Certificate of Nevada Licensed Attorney Arbitrator Applicant. (Jessica Peterson)15-23576
08/13/2015Administrative CaseFiled Order Removing Attorneys from List of Appointed Arbitrators. (Kristine Jensen; David Jones; John Samberg)15-24481
09/04/2015Administrative CaseFiled Certificate of Nevada Licensed Attorney Arbitrator Applicant. (Janice J. Brown; Jennifer A. Leone Ferris; Clay R. Treese)15-26940
10/20/2015Administrative CaseFiled Certificate of Nevada Licensed Attorney Arbitrator Applicant. (Bennair R. Bateman; David M. Jones)15-31954
10/22/2015Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrators. (8 attorneys)15-32289
11/06/2015Administrative CaseFiled Certificate of Nevada Licensed Attorney Arbitrator Applicant. (Casey D. Gish; A. Autumn Betke)15-33988
11/10/2015Administrative CaseFiled Certificate of Arbitrator Applicant Background Investigation. (Non-Attorney Courtney E. Anderson)15-34255
01/26/2016Administrative CaseFiled Certificate of Nevada Licensed Attorney Arbitrator Applicant. (Natasha A. Landrum; Amanda C. Yen; Justin J. Zarcone)16-02653
02/17/2016Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrators. (See order for appointments)16-05179
05/19/2016Administrative CaseFiled Certificate of Nevada Licensed Attorney Arbitrator Applicant. (Cory R. Eichelberger; Jerry R. Graf; Alice K. Herbolsheimer)16-15841
07/06/2016Administrative CaseFiled Filed Certificate of Nevada Licensed Attorney Arbitrator Applicant. (Robert S. Cardenas)16-20923
07/08/2016Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrators. (Alice K. Herbolsheimer; Cory R. Eichelberger; Jerry R. Graf)16-21312
08/24/2016Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrators. (Robert S. Cardenas)16-26420
11/01/2016Administrative CaseFiled Filed Certificate of Nevada Licensed Attorney Arbitrator Applicant. (James J. Reese)16-34059
11/15/2016Administrative CaseFiled Certificate of Nevada Licensed Attorney Arbitrator Applicant. (Anthony T. Garasi)16-35588
11/23/2016Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrator. (James J. Reese)16-36592
12/13/2016Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrator. (Anthony T. Garasi)16-38650
12/19/2016Administrative CaseFiled Certificate of Nevada Licensed Attorney Arbitrator Applicant. (Radha Chanderraj)16-39385
12/27/2016Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrator. (Radha Chanderraj)16-40207
01/12/2017Administrative CaseFiled Certificate of Nevada Licensed Attorney Arbitrator Applicant. (Jennifer A. Salem)17-01242
02/10/2017Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrator. (Jennifer A. Salem)17-04812
02/21/2017Administrative CaseFiled Certificate of Nevada Licensed Attorney Arbitrator Applicant. (Thomas D. Boley)17-05991
02/21/2017Administrative CaseFiled Certificate of Arbitrator Applicant Background Investigation. Non-attorney Frank Y. Jackson.17-05992
03/07/2017Administrative CaseFiled Certificate of Nevada Licensed Attorney Arbitrator Applicant. (Jason M. Gerber; Loren S. Young)17-07700
03/10/2017Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrator. (Frank Y. Jackson)17-08191
03/10/2017Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrator. (Thomas D. Boley)17-08192
03/10/2017Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrator. (Jason M. Gerber)17-08193
03/10/2017Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Attorney Arbitrator. (Loren S. Young)17-08194