The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Administrative Case: ADKT 0244
Short Caption:IN RE: NRAP 16 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCES IN CIVIL APPEALSClassification:Administrative - ADKT - ADKT
Case Status:ADKT Order Filed
Filed Date:09/18/1996Public Hearing:09/24/1996
05/05/2005 at 10:00 AM (Carson City)
Closed Date:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/18/1996Administrative CaseFiled Petition to Adopt Rule 16 of the NRAP.96-00004
09/23/1996Administrative CaseFiled Opposition to Adoption of Rule 16 of the NRAP.96-00005
09/24/1996Administrative CasePublic Meeting on the Administrative Docket.
12/27/1996Administrative CaseFiled Order Amending the NRAP by the Adoption of Rule 16 and Form 10.96-00006
12/27/1996Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rule Change to the State Bar of Nevada for publication in the next issue of Nevada Lawyer.96-00007
02/21/1997Administrative CaseFiled Order Re: Implementation of Civil Settlement Conference Program under NRAP 16.97-00016
02/21/1997Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Settlement Judges for Settlement Conference Program.97-00018
02/21/1997Administrative CaseFiled Opposition to Order re: Implementation of Civil Settlement Conference Program under NRAP 16 and Opposition to ORder Appointing Settlement Judges for Settlement Conference Program.97-00017
03/05/1997Administrative CaseFiled Amended Order Appointing Settlement Judges for Settlement Conference.97-00019
04/29/1997Administrative CaseFiled Amended Order Re: Implementation of Civil Settlement Conference Program under NRAP 16.97-00020
06/23/1997Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Settlement Judges for Settlement Conference Program.97-00021
10/17/1997Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Settlement Judge for Settlement Conference Program.97-00022
12/01/1997Administrative CaseFiled Order Amending Rule 16 of the NRAP. Effective 60 days from the date of this order.97-00023
12/01/1997Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rule Change to the State Bar of Nevada for publication in the next issue of Nevada Lawyer.97-00024
12/10/1998Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Settlement Judges for Settlement Conference Program.98-00615
02/08/1999Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Settlement Judges for Settlement Conference Program.99-13471
03/12/1999Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Settlement Judges for Settlement Conference Program.99-13472
06/01/1999Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Settlement Judges for Settlement Conference Program.99-13473
06/02/1999Administrative CaseFiled Order Re: Civil Settlement Conference Program under NRAP 16. Effective July 1, 1999.99-13474
06/09/1999Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Settlement Judge for Settlement Conference Program. (William Patterson Cashill).99-13475
04/17/2000Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Settlement Judge for Settlement Conference Program: John L. Thorndal.00-22784
05/26/2000Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Settlement Judge for Settlement Conference Program: John F. Mendoza.00-22785
07/13/2000Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Settlement Judge for Settlement Conference Program: Anita A. Webster.00-22786
08/18/2000Administrative CaseFiled Order Amending Rule 16 of the NRAP. Amendment effective 60 days from the date of this order.00-22787
08/18/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rule Change to State Bar of Nevada for publication in the next issue of Nevada Lawyer.00-22788
08/30/2000Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Settlement Judge for Settlement Conference Program: Michael C. Mills.00-22789
06/06/2001Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Settlement Judges for Settlement Conference Program. (See order).01-21970
09/28/2001Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Settlement Judges for Settlement Conference Program. (See order).01-21971
03/05/2002Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Settlement Judges for Settlement Conference Program. (See order).02-22276
07/26/2002Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Settlement Judge for Settlement Conference Program: Shawn B. Meador.02-22277
07/26/2002Administrative CaseFiled Order Amending Rule 16 of the NRAP. Amendment effective 60 days from the date of this order.02-22278
07/26/2002Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to the State Bar of Nevada for publication in the next issue of Nevada Lawyer.02-22279
10/10/2002Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Settlement Judge for Settlement Conference Program: Leonard I. Gang.02-22280
12/30/2002Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Settlement Judge for Settlement Conference Program: John W. Hawkins.02-22281
12/30/2002Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Settlement Judge for Settlement Conference Program: Roy E. Smith.02-22282
01/31/2003Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Settlement Judge for Settlement Conference Program: Stephen E. Haberfeld.03-21760
02/21/2003Administrative CaseFiled Amended Order Re: Implementation of Civil Settlement Conference Program under NRAP 16.03-21761
07/18/2003Administrative CaseFiled Amended Order Re: Implementation of Civil Settlement Conference Program under NRAP 16.03-21762
03/14/2005Administrative CaseFiled Order Scheduling Public Hearing and Allowing Public Comment.05-25507
03/14/2005Administrative CaseFiled Final Evaluation Summary with Recommendations.05-25508
03/17/2005Administrative CaseFiled Letter from attorney Becky A. Pintar with comments re: Final Evaluation Summary and Recommendations.05-25509
03/17/2005Administrative CaseFiled Letter from settlement judge Patrick King in response to March 14 order.05-25510
03/17/2005Administrative CaseFiled Letter from Robert L. Eisenberg in response to March 14 order.05-25511
03/21/2005Administrative CaseFiled Letter from Neil G. Galatz in response to March 14 order.05-25512
03/25/2005Administrative CaseFiled Letter from John W. Hawkins in response to March 14 order.05-25513
03/28/2005Administrative CaseFiled letter from judge Eugene Osko in response to March 14 order.05-25514
04/15/2005Administrative CaseFiled letter from settlement judge Carolyn A. Worrell in response to March 14 order.05-25515
05/05/2005Administrative CasePublic Meeting on the Administrative Docket.
11/18/2005Administrative CaseFiled Order Re: Recommendations of Settlement Conference Program Evaluation Report.05-25516
01/18/2006Administrative CaseFiled Order Amending Rule 16 of NRAP with Exhibit A attached. Effective 90 days from the date of this order.06-26786
01/18/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to the State Bar of Nevada for publication in the next issue of Nevada Lawyer.06-26787
03/10/2006Administrative CaseFiled Order Adopting Settlement Judge Application and Establishing Appointment Terms with Exhibit A attached.06-26788
03/10/2006Administrative CaseFiled Order Adopting Code of Conduct for Supreme Court Settlement Judges with Exhibit A attached.06-26789
07/07/2006Administrative CaseFiled Order Re: Supreme Court Settlement Judge Qualifications and Requirements.06-26790
12/26/2006Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Supreme Court Settlement Judges. (See order).06-26791
07/26/2007Administrative CaseFiled Amended Order Re: Implementation of Civil Settlement Conference Program under NRAP 16. (Hourly rates and miscellaneous expenses).07-28420
12/24/2007Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Supreme Court Settlement Judges. (See order).07-28421
12/19/2008Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Supreme Court Settlement Judges. (See order).08-33138
03/19/2009Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Supreme Court Settlement Judge (Salvatore Gugino).09-31683
12/23/2009Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Supreme Court Settlement Judges.09-31684
12/31/2009Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Supreme Court Settlement Judge (Michael Singer).09-31685
12/22/2010Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Supreme Court Settlement Judges.10-33436
12/20/2011Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Supreme Court Settlement Judges.11-39232
12/19/2012Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Supreme Court Settlement Judges.12-40198
12/19/2013Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Supreme Court Settlement Judges.13-38651
01/08/2015Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Supreme Court Settlement Judges.15-00819
05/22/2015Administrative CaseFiled Order Re: Implementation of Civil Settlement Conference Program Under NRAP 16. A settlement judge shall be compensated in accordance with the terms of this amended order for services performed on or after July 1, 2015.15-15862
12/17/2015Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Supreme Court Settlement Judges.15-38615
12/22/2016Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Supreme Court Settlement Judges.16-39882