Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Administrative Case: ADKT 0386
Short Caption:IN RE: CREATION OF A BENCH-BAR COMMITTEECourt:Supreme Court
Classification:Administrative - ADKT - ADKTCase Status:Petition Filed
Filed Date:06/10/2005Public Hearing:
Closed Date:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/10/2005Administrative CaseFiled Order Adopting Rule 14 of the Supreme Court Rules. New Rule 14 of Supreme Court Rules shall become effective immediately.05-25519
06/10/2005Administrative CaseIssued Notice of Rule Change.05-25520
10/10/2005Administrative CaseFiled Order Implementing Rule 14 of the Supreme Court Rules. This court has now selected the initial attorney members of the bench-bar committee with staggered terms and geographical diversity required by SCR 14 (3). See order for list of members, terms and county. This order was not published.05-25521
11/08/2006Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment Re: Supreme Court Bench-Bar Committee.06-26795
11/15/2007Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment Re: Supreme Court Bench-Bar Committee.07-28427
09/12/2008Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment Re: Supreme Court Bench-Bar Committee.08-33140
01/08/2010Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment Re: Supreme Court Bench-Bar Committee.10-34200
10/25/2010Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment Re: Supreme Court Bench-Bar Committee.10-34201
09/27/2011Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment Re: Supreme Court Bench-Bar Committee. (See order for appointees.)11-29382
12/08/2011Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment Re: Supreme Court Bench-Bar Committee. Jennifer Smith having resigned as a member of the Supreme Court Bench-Bar Committee, David O'Mara is appointed to fill her unexpired term ending October 2013.11-37638
12/27/2011Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment Re: Supreme Court Bench-Bar Committee. (F. Travis Buchanan)11-39654
11/28/2012Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment Re: Supreme Court Bench-Bar Committee. (See order for appointees.)12-37540
10/28/2013Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment Re: Supreme Court Bench-Bar Committee. (See order for appointees.)13-32251
04/24/2014Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment Re: Supreme Court Bench-Bar Committee. (Tami D. Cowden)14-13295
10/09/2015Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment Re: Supreme Court Bench-Bar Committee. (See order for appointees.)15-30804
10/09/2015Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment Re: Supreme Court Bench-Bar Committee. (See order for appointees.)15-30805
10/25/2016Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment Re: Supreme Court Bench-Bar Committee. (See order for appointees.)16-33400
09/21/2017Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment Re: Supreme Court Bench-Bar Committee. (See order for appointees.)17-31977
10/11/2018Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment Re: Supreme Court Bench-Bar Committee. (See order for appointees.)18-39899
11/01/2019Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment Re: Supreme Court Bench-Bar Committee. The terms of Thomas D. Beatty, Karla Butko, Julie Cavanaugh-Bill, Kathleen Drakulich, Robert L. Eisenberg, Seth T. Floyd, Dominic P. Gentile, Dennis L. Kennedy, Kim Irene Mandelbaum, Terrence P. McCarthy, Steve L. Morris, David O'Mara, Daniel F. Polsenberg, Jay P. Raman, Karl O. Riley, David M. Stanton, and Telia U. Williams, expired in October 2019. Accordingly, it is hereby ordered that Julie Cavanaugh-Bill, Robert L. Eisenberg, Seth T. Floyd, Dominic P. Gentile, Dennis L. Kennedy, Kim Irene Mandelbaum, Steve L. Morris, David O'Mara, Daniel F. Polsenberg, Jay P. Raman, David M. Stanton, and Telia U. Williams be reappointed for three-year terms expiring October 2022. It is further ordered that Karen L. Bashor, Zelalem Bogale, Agnes Botelho, Belinda T. Harris, and Kevin C. Speed be appointed to three-year terms expiring October 2022. It is further ordered that Darin Imlay be appointed to fill the unexpired term of Philip J. Kohn. Mr. Imaly's term will expire in October 2020.19-45069