The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Administrative Case: ADKT 0411
Short Caption:IN RE: REPRESENTATION OF INDIGENT DEFENDANTSClassification:Administrative - ADKT - ADKT
Case Status:Public Hearing Held
Filed Date:04/26/2007Public Hearing:02/07/2011 at 3:00 PM (Carson City)
12/04/2014 at 2:00 PM (Regional Justice Center, Las Vegas)
Closed Date:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/26/2007Administrative CaseFiled Order Establishing Study Committee on Representation of Indigent Defendants with Exhibit A attached.07-28443
11/20/2007Administrative CaseFiled Final Report and Recommendations of Supreme Court Indigent Defense Commission with attachments.07-28444
12/12/2007Administrative CaseFiled Letter from John McCormick, Rural Courts Coordinator, with attached statement regarding the impact of budget cuts on the program.07-28445
12/14/2007Administrative CasePublic Meeting held this day.
12/18/2007Administrative CaseFiled Comments of Jeffrey M. Wells, Asst. County Manager, Clark County in Response to ADKT 411 Hearing held on December 14, 2007.07-28446
12/18/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Public Meeting on the Administrative Docket. Thrusday, December 20, 2007, @ 2:00 p.m. at the Nevada Supreme Court, Courtroom, Carson City, NV.
12/19/2007Administrative CaseFiled Letter from Norman Lefstein on behalf of the American Bar Association containing comments regarding indigent defense representation.07-28447
12/19/2007Administrative CaseFiled Testimony of Holly A. Thomas, Assistance Counsel, NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc.07-28448
12/20/2007Administrative CaseFiled Testimony before the Nevada Supreme Court submitted by the National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers, Malia N. Brink.07-28449
12/20/2007Administrative CaseFiled letter re: Caseload and Performance Standards submitted by Michael Pescetta and Franny A. Forsman, Federal Public Defender.07-28450
12/20/2007Administrative CaseFiled Comparison of Caseload Standards submitted in open court by Federal Public Defender Franny Forsman.07-28451
12/20/2007Administrative CaseFiled Letter from State of Nevada Advisory Council for Prosecuting Attorneys, Brett Kandt, Exectuive Director.07-28452
12/20/2007Administrative CaseFiled Letter from Paul Elcano and Marc Ashley, Washoe Legal Services, containing comments re: report of the Indigent Defense Commission.07-28453
12/20/2007Administrative CaseFiled Letter from William F. Dressel, President, The National Judicial College, re: Status of Public Defenders Office.07-28454
12/20/2007Administrative CaseFiled Comments received via e-mail from Stephen Dahl.07-28455
12/20/2007Administrative CasePublic Meeting on the Administrative Docket this day.
01/04/2008Administrative CaseFiled Order adopting recommendations of the Indigent Defense Commission with Exhibit A attached.08-33146
02/08/2008Administrative CaseFiled Objection and Motion to Set Aside Order. (Pershing County D.A.)08-33147
02/11/2008Administrative CaseFiled Petition to Exempt Sixth Judicial District Court from Order Concerning Representation of Indigent Defendants or in the Alternative an Opportunity to be Heard.08-33148
02/21/2008Administrative CaseFiled Objection and Motion to Set Aside Order. (Humboldt County D.A.)08-33149
03/05/2008Administrative CaseFiled Letter from Robert M. Larkin, Chairman, Washoe County Commission, with comments re: indigent defense services.08-33150
03/06/2008Administrative CaseFiled Order scheduling public hearing for Tuesday, March 18, 2008, in the Nevada Supreme Court Courtroom, Carson City (videoconferenced to Courtroom in Las Vegas). Comment deadline: March 17, 2008 @ 5:00 p.m.08-33151
03/13/2008Administrative CaseFiled request for cameras in the courtroom at the March 18, 2008, hearing from Forrest Newton, Assistant Editor, The Humboldt Sun.08-33152
03/14/2008Administrative CaseFiled Comments from District Judge Sally Loehrer.08-33153
03/14/2008Administrative CaseFiled letter from Nye/Esmeralda County Public Defender Harold Kuehn with comments on impact of indigent defense directives on Mineral, Esmeralda and Nye Counties.08-33154
03/14/2008Administrative CaseFiled letter from attorney Kenneth V. Ward with comments re: Indigent Defense Order.08-33155
03/14/2008Administrative CaseFiled Order Allowing Media Coverage of Proceedings.08-33157
03/17/2008Administrative CaseFiled letter from Washoe County District Attorney Richard Gammick on behalf of the Nevada Prosecutor's Advisory Counsel and the Nevada District Attorney's Association with comments re: indigent defense order.08-33156
03/17/2008Administrative CaseFiled Letter from David Carroll, National Legal Aid & Defender Association, with comments re: implementation of ADKT 411.08-33158
03/17/2008Administrative CaseFiled Resolution Requesting the Nevada Supreme Court to Rescind or Postpone Implementation of the Court's Order submitted by the Lyon County Board of Commissioners.08-33159
03/17/2008Administrative CaseFiled additional email from Flo Jones re: desire to attend and comment at hearing.08-33162
03/17/2008Administrative CaseFiled Comments of Jeffrey M. Wells, Assistant County Manager, Clark County. (Filed via fax).08-33163
03/17/2008Administrative CaseFiled letter from Jeffrey Fontaine, Exectuive Director, Nevada Association of Counties, with comments re: ADKT 411.08-33164
03/17/2008Administrative CaseFiled Pershing County Additional Exhibits Demonstrating Costs.08-33165
03/17/2008Administrative CaseFiled Additional Documentation for the Objection and Motion to Set Aside Order from Russell D. Smith, Humboldt County District Attorney.08-33166
03/17/2008Administrative CaseFiled Cause for Documentation Representing Cost Increase to Remain with the State Public Defender.08-33167
03/17/2008Administrative CaseFiled Response from David Roger, Clark County DIstrict Attorney (via fax).
03/17/2008Administrative CaseFiled Response from David Roger, Clark County District Attorney (via fax).08-33168
03/18/2008Administrative CasePublic meeting on the administrative docket.
03/19/2008Administrative CaseFiled Letter from Pershing County District Attorney Jim Shirley (via fax) re: follow up on oral arguments on County's Objection.08-33169
03/20/2008Administrative CaseFiled ORIGINAL-Letter from Clark County District Attorney re: indigent defense order. (filed via fax on 03/17/08).08-33172
03/21/2008Administrative CaseFiled Order. The membership of the Indigent Defense Commission shall include two representatives from the Nevada District Attorneys Association; the April 1, 2008, implementation date the performance standards is stayed until July 15, 2008. The Indigent Defense Commission shall review and provide a report on or before June 30, 2008; Clark and Washoe Counties shall provide a written report on or before September 1, 2008; the Rural Issues Submcommittee shall provide a final report on or before December 31, 2008; this court shall hold a public hearing at 2:00 P.M. on Tuesday, July 1, 2008 to further consider issues; the representatives from Clark County, Washoe County, and the Indigent Defense Commission, shall appear at the hearing previously scheduled for September 5, 2008, for a status report. (Exhibit A attached).08-33173
04/24/2008Administrative CaseSee February 12, 2009, docket entry. Las Vegas Municipal Court plan was submitted on April 24, 2008.
04/30/2008Administrative CaseFiled Reno Municipal Court Plan for Indigent Defense submitted by Paul Hickman, Administrative Judge.08-33179
05/01/2008Administrative CaseFiled Clark County's Administrative Plan for Appointment of Counsel.08-33180
05/05/2008Administrative CaseFiled The Second Judicial District Court Indigent Defense Report.08-33181
05/05/2008Administrative CaseFiled Sparks Municipal Court Administrative Plan Regarding Appointment of Counsel, Approval of Fees and Determination of Indigency.08-33182
05/05/2008Administrative CaseFiled letter from David J. Carroll, Director of Research, National Legal Aid & Defender Association to Washoe Co. District Attorney Richard Gammick in response to his April 21, 2008, letter.08-33183
06/24/2008Administrative CaseFiled memo from John McCormick, AOC Rural Courts Coordinator, with attachments as filed below.08-33184
06/24/2008Administrative CaseFiled Model Plan for the Provision of Appointed Counsel for Urban Courts in Nevada dated May 22, 2008.08-33185
06/24/2008Administrative CaseFiled Nevada Indigent Defense Standards of Performance.08-33186
06/24/2008Administrative CaseFiled Indigent Defense Commission Minority Report dated June 23, 200808-33187
06/24/2008Administrative CaseFiled Nevada Indigent Defense Standards of Performance (with edits).08-33188
06/24/2008Administrative CaseFiled letter from Kevin Higgins, Sparks Justice Court Justice of the Peace, explaining his vote against the Report.08-33189
06/25/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Public Meeting on the Administrative Docket. Tuesday, July 1, 2008 @ 2:00 p.m. at Supreme Court of Nevada, Courtroom-Second Floor. Meeting will be video-conferenced to Regional Justice Center, 17th, Floor, Las Vegas.
06/30/2008Administrative CaseFiled letter from David J. Carroll, Director of Research, National Legal Aid & Defender Association. He is unable to attend the July 1 hearing and is including his report in the letter.08-33190
06/30/2008Administrative CaseFiled Comments re: Disputed/Undisputed Issues Performance Standards submitted by Federal Public Defender Franny Forsman.08-33191
07/01/2008Administrative CaseFiled letter from Jeffrey Fontaine, Executive Director, Nevada Association of Counties, with further comments re: indigent defense.08-33192
07/01/2008Administrative CaseFiled letter from Robert M. Larkin, Chair, Washoe County Commission.08-33193
07/01/2008Administrative CasePublic meeting on the administrative docket.
07/08/2008Administrative CaseFiled Order the Rural Issues Subcommittee shall consider the proposed revisions to the performance standards at their next regular meeting and shall provide this Court with written comments on or before August 15, 2008. The temporary stay for the implementation of the performance standards is extended to September 5, 2008.08-33194
08/04/2008Administrative CaseFiled Memorandum from John McCormick enclosing Indigent Defense Commission Majority/Minority Reconciled Report dated July 14, 2008. (Copies were distributed to all Justices per John McCormick.)08-33196
08/26/2008Administrative CaseFiled memo from John McCormick enclosing a memo from Franny Forsman, Federal Public Defender, dated August 26, 2008, re: supplementary mitigation guidelines. Memo referenced two attached documents: Supplementary Mitigation Guidelines and a law review article.08-33202
09/03/2008Administrative CaseFiled Letter dated September 3, 2008, from Jeffrey Fontaine, Executive Director, Nevada Association of Counties.08-33197
09/03/2008Administrative CaseFiled Letter from ACLU, NACDL, NAACP, LDF, and NLADA re: Delegation of Indigent Defense Duties to Counties.08-33198
09/04/2008Administrative CaseFiled Memorandum - Jeffrey M. Wells, Assistant County Manager Re: Clark County's Status Report on the Caseload Study.08-33199
09/04/2008Administrative CaseFiled Amended Letter from ACLU, NACDL, NAACP, LDF, and NLADA.
09/04/2008Administrative CaseFiled letter from Robert M. Larkin, Chairman, Washoe County Commission.08-33201
09/04/2008Administrative CaseFiled Letter dated September 4, 2008, from Jeffrey Fontaine, Executive Director, Nevada Association of Counties.08-33200
09/05/2008Administrative CasePublic Hearing held on the Administrative Docket.
09/08/2008Administrative CaseFiled Order the temporary stay for the implementation of the performance standards is extended to October 15, 2008.08-33204
09/16/2008Administrative CaseFiled letter to Justices from Jeffrey Fontaine, Executive Director, Nevada Association to Counties, with additional comments for the Court's consideration.08-33205
09/30/2008Administrative CaseFiled letter to Justice Hardesty from John Berkich, Assistant Washoe County Manager.08-33206
10/16/2008Administrative CaseFiled Order the performance standards contained in Exhibit A to this order are to be implemented effective April 1, 2009. An extension for Washoe and Clark Counties to complete the weighted caseload studies is granted to May 15, 2009. This court shall hold a public hearing on Tuesday, January 6, 2009, at 2:00 p.m. Representatives from Clark County and Washoe County shall appear at the hearing for a status report on the weighted case load studies. MG/JH/RP/MD. Saitta & Cherry concur in part and dissent in part. Maupin concurs in part and dissents in part.08-33207
12/16/2008Administrative CaseFiled Nevada Supreme Court Indigent Defense Commission Rural Subcommittee Report and Recommendations. (Document has been distributed electronically and in paper form by John McCormick, AOC Rural Courts Coordinator.)08-33209
12/31/2008Administrative CaseFiled Order the starting time for the hearing is rescheduled to 3:00 p.m. on Tuesday, January 6, 2009.08-33208
01/06/2009Administrative CasePublic hearing on the administrative docket.
02/12/2009Administrative CaseFiled Las Vegas Municipal Court plan submitted by Chief Judge Bert Brown on April 24, 2008. (Document was addressed to Chief Justice Gibbons and forwarded to this office today from John McCormick.)09-31703
03/03/2009Administrative CaseFiled Henderson Municipal Court plan submitted to Chief Justice Gibbons on May 22, 2008. (Forwarded to this office for filing today from John McCormick.)09-31704
03/03/2009Administrative CaseFiled North Las Vegas Municipal Court Indigent Defense Plan sent to Chief Justice Gibbons on June 10, 2008.09-31706
03/23/2009Administrative CaseFiled from Washoe County Assistant, County Manager John Berkich and Clark County Assistant, County Mangaer Jeff Wells requesting a delay in the implementation of the standards and the submission of the study.09-31705
03/26/2009Administrative CaseFiled Order the motion for an extension of time to implement the performance standards is denied; the court shall hold a public hearing at 1:30 p.m. on Tuesday, April 7, 2009, at the Supreme Court, Regional Justice Center, Las Vegas.09-31707
04/07/2009Administrative CasePublic hearing on the administrative docket.
04/10/2009Administrative CaseFiled memo re: Performance Standards Questions from Public Defenders submitted by John McCormick.09-31708
04/23/2009Administrative CaseFiled letter from Jon B. Gould, Professor at George Mason University, to Assistant Washoe County Manager John Berkich containing comments re: case weighting study.09-31709
04/23/2009Administrative CaseFiled letter from John Berkich, Assistant Washoe County Manager, dated April 20, 2009, with additional information as requested at April 7, 2009, hearing.09-31710
05/07/2009Administrative CaseFiled Order the motion for an extension of time to complete the weighted caseload study is denied. Washoe County and Clark County shall have until July 1, 2009, to complete the weighted caseload study.09-31711
06/12/2009Administrative CaseFiled Las Vegas Municipal Court Indigent Defense Administrative Plan.09-31723
07/13/2009Administrative CaseFiled Assessment of the Washoe and Clark County, Nevada, Public Defender Offices Final Report dated July 1, 2009.
07/13/2009Administrative CaseFiled Assessment of the Washoe and Clark County, Nevada, Public Defender Offices Final Report dated July 1, 2009.09-31712
08/04/2009Administrative CaseFiled report re: Implementation of Performance Standards from Franny Forsman, Federal Public Defender. (Received via e-mail from John McCormick.)09-31713
08/28/2009Administrative CaseFiled Order. Public hearing scheduled Tuesday, October 6, 2009 in Las Vegas. The hearing will be videoconferenced to Carson. The Washoe County P.D., the Washoe County Alternative P.D., the Clark County P.D., and the Clark County Special P.D. shall appear for the hearing. Further ordered that the State P.D. shall appear for the hearing.09-31714
10/01/2009Administrative CaseFiled Comments and Recommendations from Advisory Council from Prosecuting Attorneys.09-31715
10/01/2009Administrative CaseFiled letter from Nevada Assocation of Counties with comments.09-31716
10/02/2009Administrative CaseFiled letter dated 8/25/09 with comments from American Civil Liberties Union of Nevada (ACLU). (Received via e-mail from John McCormick).09-31717
10/02/2009Administrative CaseFiled Letter from National Legal Aid & Defender Association.09-31724
10/05/2009Administrative CaseFiled letter with comments from Clark County Manager Jeffrey Wells. (Received via e-mail from John McCormick).09-31719
10/05/2009Administrative CaseFiled Memorandum from Franny Forsman, Federal Public Defender with attached American Bar Assocation Eight Guidelines of Public Defense Related to Excessive Workloads. (Received via e-mail from John McCormick).09-31718
10/05/2009Administrative CaseFiled Letter from Assistant Washoe County Manager John Berkich with comments.09-31720
10/06/2009Administrative CasePublic hearing on the administrative docket.
10/22/2009Administrative CaseFiled letter from Nancy Becker, Deputy Clark County District Attorney, regarding statistical information requested by the Court.09-31721
10/27/2009Administrative CaseFiled letter from NACO with comments on hearing held on October 6, 2009.09-31722
11/02/2009Administrative CaseFiled letter dated 10/12/09 from Clark County Manager Jeffrey Wells with comments on the 10/6/09 hearing and enclosure.09-31725
11/02/2009Administrative CaseFiled letter dated 10/12/09 from Washoe County Public Defender Jeremy Bosler with enlcosed statistics.09-31726
11/02/2009Administrative CaseFiled letter from Washoe County Alternate Public Defender Jennifer Lunt with enclosed statistical data.09-31727
11/09/2009Administrative CaseFiled memorandum from Robert Spangenberg and David Newhouse, The Spangenberg Project, with recommended caseload standards.09-31728
12/04/2009Administrative CaseFiled letter from Churchill County Commissioners with comments re: proposed mandatory caseload standards.09-31729
12/17/2009Administrative CaseFiled Order the matter of caseload standards is referred back to the Indigent Defense Commission. The Commission shall provide its evaluation and recommendations to this court within 180 days.09-31730
06/23/2010Administrative CaseFiled Memorandum from John McCormick re: Indigent Defense Commision Data Definitions.10-34215
10/26/2010Administrative CaseFiled Memorandum from John McCormick re: Indigent Defense Data Definitions with Indigent Defense Data Dictionary attached.10-34216
01/19/2011Administrative CaseFiled Order Scheduling Public Hearing. Exhibit A attached. The public hearing will be held on Monday, February 7, 2011, at 3:00 p.m. in the Nevada Supreme Court Courtroom in Carson City. The hearing will be videoconferenced to the Las Vegas Courtroom.11-01838
02/07/2011Administrative CasePublic Hearing held on the Administrative Docket.
02/15/2011Administrative CaseFiled Order referring matter to Indigent Defense Commission to develop a procedure to be used for data collection. Recommendations due: 180 days.11-04868
06/23/2011Administrative CaseFiled Motion for extension of time to submit recommendations.11-18729
02/07/2013Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment. Judge Papez having retired from the bench, the Honorable Todd Russell is appointed to replace him on the Indigent Defense Commission and the Rural Issues Subcommittee.13-03938
03/20/2013Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment. Nancy Becker having retired from the Clark County District Attorney's Office, Christopher Lalli is appointed to replace Nancy Becker on the Indegent Defense Commission.13-08393
03/25/2013Administrative CaseFiled Report "Reclaiming Justice" submitted by the Nevada Supreme Court Indigent Defense Commission.13-08819
07/08/2013Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment. The individuals listed in Exhibit A are appointed to the Rural Issues Subcommittee.13-19885
07/17/2013Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment. The individuals listed in Exhibit A are appointed to the Rural Issues Subcommittee.13-20902
08/20/2014Administrative CaseFiled Order scheduling public hearing for Thursday, December 4, 2014, at 2:00 pm in the Nevada Supreme Court Courtroom, Regional Justice Center(videoconferenced to Courtroom in Carson City). Comment deadline: November 26, 2014 @ 5:00 pm (Exhibit A attached).14-27529
10/24/2014Administrative CaseFiled Rural Subcommittee Report on the Status of Indigent Defense in the 15 Rural Counties and Recommendations to Improve Service to Indigent Defendants.14-35500
11/25/2014Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Churchill County Commissioners Office.14-38862
11/26/2014Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Vanessa Spinazola with ACLU. (via-fax)14-38937
12/01/2014Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Vanessa Spinazola with ACLU. (via-mail)14-39149
12/04/2014Administrative CasePublic Hearing Held. Public Hearing held on the Administrative Docket Before the En banc Court.
07/23/2015Administrative CaseFiled Order. Rural Subcommittee provided a report on the status of indigent defense in the rural counties and made 5 separate recommendations in a document filed in this court on October 24, 2014. The court takes following action as to the recommendations.15-22416
08/26/2016Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment. Nancy M. Saitta is appointed to the Indigent Defense Commission.16-26636
08/31/2016Administrative CaseFiled Rural Subcommittee - Caseload Standards Data.16-27118
09/21/2016Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment. The Honorable Kimberly Wanker is appointed to the Indigent Defense Commission.16-29371
10/25/2016Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment. The Honorable John Schelegelmilch is appointed to the Indigent Defense Commission.16-33393
10/27/2016Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment. Hon. John Schlegelmilch is appointed to the Indigent Defense Commission.16-33657
12/13/2016Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment. Lidia S. Stiglich is appointed to the Indigent Defense Commission.16-38657
12/13/2016Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment. Michael Kagan is appointed to the Indigent Defense Commission.16-38658
02/02/2017Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment. Mason Simons is appointed to the Indigent Defense Commission.17-03843
03/14/2017Administrative CaseFiled Order of Appointment. Rachelle Resnick is appointed to the Indigent Defense Commission.17-08559