Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Administrative Case: ADKT 0424
Short Caption:IN RE: SCR PART IX-A TELEPHONIC AND AUDIOVISUAL PARTICIPATION IN CIVIL, CRIMINAL AND FAMILY LAW CASESCourt:Supreme Court
Classification:Administrative - ADKT - ADKTCase Status:Petition Filed
Filed Date:04/02/2008Public Hearing:07/07/2011 at 3:00 PM (Carson City)
09/08/2011 at 3:30 PM (Carson City)
07/09/2012 at 3:30 PM (Carson City)
Closed Date:07/24/2017

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/02/2008Administrative CaseFiled Petition to Adopt a Uniform Rule to Govern Telephonic and Audiovisual Participation in the Nevada Courts. (Exhibit A Attached.)08-33210
05/16/2008Administrative CaseFiled Order Scheduling Public Hearing. Monday, June 2, 2008, at 4:00 p.m. in Carson City. The bench, bar and public are invited to submit written comments by 5 p.m. on May 28, 2008. Persons interested in participating in the hearing must notify the Clerk no later than May 28, 2008.08-33211
05/27/2008Administrative CaseFiled Letter from attorney Margo Piscevich dated May 21, 2008, stating that she is in favor of a rule governing telephonic and audiovisual participation.08-33212
05/28/2008Administrative CaseFiled Letter from Nancy Allf, President, Board of Governors of State Bar of Nevada, expressing unanimous support of the adoption of a uniform rule.08-33213
05/28/2008Administrative CaseReceived telephone call from attorney Valerie Cooney stating that she will participate in the June 2 hearing.
05/29/2008Administrative CaseFiled Letter from Raymond Rodriquez stating his support of the petition.08-33214
05/30/2008Administrative CaseFiled Letter from Benard Little, Las Vegas Assistant City Attorney, with comments re: proposed petition.08-33215
06/02/2008Administrative CasePublic Hearing held on the Administrative Docket.
09/24/2008Administrative CaseFiled Order Scheduling Public Hearing. This court has drafted a propoed uniform rule, attached as Exhibit A. Public hearing on the proposed rule on Tuesday, December 9, 2008, at 3:00 p.m., RJC in Las Vegas. Videoconferenced to Courtroom in Carson City. Written comments invited by 5 p.m. on December 5, 2008. Persons interested in participating must notify the Clerk no later than December 5, 2008.08-33216
10/06/2008Administrative CaseFiled Comments submitted by Sally Loehrer, District Judge.08-33217
12/02/2008Administrative CaseFiled Letter from District Judge Valorie Vega with comments.08-33218
12/09/2008Administrative CasePublic Hearing held on the Administrative Docket.
12/18/2008Administrative CaseFiled Order Adopting Part IX of the Supreme Court Rules. (Exhibit A attached.) Effective March 1, 2009.08-33219
12/18/2008Administrative CaseIssued Notice of Rule Change.08-33220
04/30/2009Administrative CaseFiled Petition (re: telephonic conferences in criminal cases).09-31731
06/17/2009Administrative CaseFiled Order Scheduling Public Hearing. Tuesday, October 6, 2009 @ 4:00 p.m. in RJC, Las Vegas. Videoconferenced to Courtroom in Carson City. Public comment invited by 5:00 p.m. on October 2, 2009.09-31732
07/27/2009Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Clark County District Attorney David Roger.09-31733
07/30/2009Administrative CaseFiled Order every court in general jurisdiction and limited jurisdiction in the State of Nevada shall have equipment in place to allow for telephonice and/or audiovisual participation by September 30, 2009. Each court shall file a report on or before September 1, 2009, informing this court of compliance.09-31734
08/05/2009Administrative CaseFiled response from Richard A. Wagner, District Judge.09-31735
08/05/2009Administrative CaseFiled response from Annette Daniels, JP, Virginia City Township.09-31736
08/10/2009Administrative CaseFiled response from Susan Fye, JP, Beowawe Township.09-31737
08/10/2009Administrative CaseFiled response from John Schweble, JP, Eureka Township.09-31738
08/11/2009Administrative CaseFiled response from Judges Susan Deriso and Kevin Higgins, Sparks Justice Court.09-31739
08/11/2009Administrative CaseFiled response from Carol Nelsen, JP, Lake Township Justice Court.09-31740
08/14/2009Administrative CaseFiled response from Judge Frances Vidal, Yerington Municipal Court.09-31741
08/24/2009Administrative CaseFiled response from Justice of the Peace, Tonopah Township.09-31742
08/25/2009Administrative CaseFiled response from Reno Justice Court.09-31743
08/26/2009Administrative CaseFiled response from Union Township Justice Court, Humboldt County.09-31744
08/26/2009Administrative CaseFiled response from Argenta Justice Court.09-31745
08/26/2009Administrative CaseFiled response from First Judicial District Court, Carson City Justice and Municipal Court.09-31746
08/26/2009Administrative CaseFiled Report from Canal Township Justice Court, Fernley.09-31747
08/27/2009Administrative CaseFiled Response to Order of July 30, 2009, from Eighth Judicial District Court.09-31748
08/28/2009Administrative CaseFiled response from Fourth Judicial District Court.09-31749
08/28/2009Administrative CaseFiled response from Fifth Judicial District Court-Nye, Mineral and Esmeralda Counties.09-31750
08/31/2009Administrative CaseFiled response from Argenta Justice Court.09-31751
08/31/2009Administrative CaseFiled response from Carlin Municipal Court.09-31752
09/01/2009Administrative CaseFiled response from Second Judicial District Court.09-31753
09/01/2009Administrative CaseFiled report from Eighth Judicial District Court.09-31754
09/02/2009Administrative CaseFiled response memo from Reno Municipal Court.09-31755
09/02/2009Administrative CaseFiled report in response from Las Vegas Township Court.09-31756
09/10/2009Administrative CaseFiled response from Boulder City Municipal Court.09-31757
09/10/2009Administrative CaseFiled report from Ninth Judicial District Court.09-31758
09/11/2009Administrative CaseFiled notice from district judge Linda Marie Bell in compliance with 7/30/09 order.09-31759
09/30/2009Administrative CaseFiled Letter from JP Kevin Higgins re: amendment to rules.09-31760
09/30/2009Administrative CaseFiled Letter from LVMPD re: use of telephonic and audiovisual testimony in Nevada Courts--proposed rules.09-31761
10/02/2009Administrative CaseFiled Letter with comments from Benard Little, Assistant LV City Attorney.09-31762
10/06/2009Administrative CasePublic Hearing held on the Administrative Docket.
10/14/2009Administrative CaseFiled Letter from Las Vegas Municipal Court Administrator re: systems used in their court.09-31763
12/04/2009Administrative CaseFiled Order Amending Part IX of the Supreme Court Rules. (Exhibit A attached.) Effective 60 days from the date of this order.09-31764
06/07/2011Administrative CaseFiled Petition.11-16736
06/16/2011Administrative CaseFiled Order Scheduling Public Hearing on July 7, 2011, at 3:00 pm, in Carson City. The hearing will be videoconferenced to RJC, Las Vegas. Written comments due by 5:00 p.m. on July 1, 2011. Persons interested in participating in the hearing must notify the Clerk no later than July 1, 2011. (Exhibit A attached.)11-17886
07/01/2011Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Chief Deputy Washoe County Public Defender John Reese Petty.11-19662
07/07/2011Administrative CasePublic Hearing held on the Administrative Docket.
07/29/2011Administrative CaseFiled Order Scheduling Public Hearing on September 8, 2011, at 3:30 pm, in Carson City. The hearing will be videoconferenced to RJC, Las Vegas. Written comments due by 5:00 p.m. on September 1, 2011. Persons interested in participating in the hearing must notify the Clerk no later than September 1, 2011. (Exhibits A and B attached.)11-22928
09/01/2011Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Washoe County Public Defender re; proposed amendments.11-26797
09/01/2011Administrative CaseFiled Comments regarding the Proposed Amendments to Part IX of the Supreme Court Rules submitted by Holland & Hart law firm.11-26805
09/01/2011Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Nevada Attorneys for Criminal Justice.11-26810
09/02/2011Administrative CaseFiled Comments from District Court Judge Elizabeth Gonzalez.11-26864
09/07/2011Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Federal Public Defender Rene Vallardes.11-27069
09/08/2011Administrative CasePublic Hearing held on the Administrative Docket.
09/09/2011Administrative CaseFiled Comments from J. K. Wheeler, M.D.11-27482
05/30/2012Administrative CaseFiled Order Scheduling Public Hearing on Monday, July 9, 2012, at 3:30 pm, in Carson City. The hearing will be videoconferenced to RJC, Las Vegas. Written comments due by 5:00 p.m. on July 3, 2012. Persons interested in participating in the hearing must notify the Clerk no later than July 3, 2012. (Exhibits A and B attached.)12-16883
07/05/2012Administrative CaseFiled comments from the law firm Holland & Hart.12-21100
07/09/2012Administrative CasePublic Hearing held on the Administrative Docket.
07/18/2012Administrative CaseFiled letter from Matthew Hippler re: Additional Information Requested by the Nevada Supreme Court. (Five CD's included.)12-22685
10/17/2012Administrative CaseFiled Order Adopting Part IX-A of the Supreme Court Rules. (Exhibits A and B attached.) Effective January 1, 2013.12-32978
05/28/2013Administrative CaseFiled Order Adopting Part IX-B of the Supreme Court Rules. (Exhibits A and B attached.) Effective July 1, 2013.13-15657
06/24/2015Administrative CaseFiled Petition to Amend Section B of part IX-A, rules Governing Appearance by Simultaneous Audiovisual Transmission Equipment for Criminal Proceedings.15-19280
06/24/2015Administrative CaseFiled Order Soliciting Comment. Petition and Exhibit 1 attached. Original and 8 copies of written comments due to Clerk by 5 p.m. on July 10, 2015.15-19356
07/24/2015Administrative CaseFiled Order Amending Supreme Court Rule Part IX-A Section B Rules Governing Appearance by Simultaneous Audiovisual Transmission Equipment for Criminal Proceedings. Exhibit A attached. Effective 30 days from the date of this order.15-22498
11/14/2016Administrative CaseFiled Order Repealing Section 1 of Part IX of the Supreme Court Rules. Exhibit A attached. Effective 30 days from the date of this order.16-35304
07/24/2017Administrative CaseCase Closed.
12/12/2018Administrative CaseCase Reopened.
12/12/2018Administrative CaseFiled Petition to Amend Rule 2 and 4 of Part IX-A.(B) of the Rules Governing Appearance By Communication Equipment.18-908385