Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Administrative Case: ADKT 0435
Short Caption:IN RE: RULES FOR FORECLOSURE MEDIATIONCourt:Supreme Court
Classification:Administrative - ADKT - ADKTCase Status:ADKT Order Filed
Filed Date:06/05/2009Public Hearing:06/16/2009 at 4:00 PM (Carson City)
06/26/2009 at 12:00 PM (Las Vegas)
09/01/2009 at 4:00 PM (Carson City)
03/16/2010 at 4:00 PM (Carson City)
12/06/2010 at 2:00 PM (Las Vegas)
07/09/2012 at 3:00 PM (Carson City)
12/05/2013 at 1:30 PM (RJC, Las Vegas)
Closed Date:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/05/2009Administrative CaseFiled Petition.09-31773
06/05/2009Administrative CaseFiled Order Scheduling Public Hearing and Requesting Public Comment. First Hearing: Tuesday, June 16, 2009, @ 4:00 p.m. in Carson City. Second Hearing: Friday, June 26, 2009, @ 12:00 p.m. in Las Vegas. Both hearings will be videoconferenced. Written comments due by 5:00 p.m. on June 22, 2009.09-31774
06/16/2009Administrative CaseFiled letter from attorney F. DeArmond Sharp with comments on Foreclosure Mediation Rules.09-31775
06/16/2009Administrative CaseFiled Request for cameras in the courtroom (Las Vegas) on June 16 and 26, 2009, from Las Vegas Business Press reporter Valerie Miller.09-31776
06/16/2009Administrative CaseFiled Order - permission is granted for photographic or electonic media coverage on June 16, 2009, and June 26, 2009. Valerie Miller is designated as pool coordinator.09-31777
06/16/2009Administrative CasePublic meeting on the administrative docket.
06/16/2009Administrative CaseFiled letter from Michael E. Buckley with comments on Foreclosure Mediation Rules.09-31778
06/16/2009Administrative CaseFiled letter from Terry B. Hoffman re: Foreclosure Mediation.09-31779
06/22/2009Administrative CaseFiled letter from Robert W. Lueck re: Foreclosure Mediation.09-31780
06/22/2009Administrative CaseFiled comments from Nancy Cleaves, President, Nevada Dispute Resolution Coalition.09-31781
06/22/2009Administrative CaseFiled comments from Bernard T. Santos re: Adoption of Rules.09-31782
06/23/2009Administrative CaseFiled comments from L. Kirk Williams.09-31783
06/23/2009Administrative CaseFiled comments from Don Blair Ellis and Melba J. Ellis.09-31784
06/23/2009Administrative CaseFiled comments from Benjamin B. Childs.09-31785
06/23/2009Administrative CaseFiled Suggested Rule Changes from Ernie Nielsen, Washoe County Senior Law Project.09-31786
06/24/2009Administrative CaseFiled comments from Larry Lermusiaux.09-31787
06/24/2009Administrative CaseFiled comments to Foreclosure Mediation Rules from David Olshan, Directing Attorney, Nevada Legal Services.09-31788
06/26/2009Administrative CaseFiled e-mail request from Michelle Boland at KVBC Channel 3 requesting cameras in the courtroom.09-31789
06/26/2009Administrative CaseFiled Order - pemission is granted for video media coverage by KVBC.09-31790
06/26/2009Administrative CasePublic Hearing on the administrative docket.
06/26/2009Administrative CaseFiled Report entitled, "Model Standards of Conduct for Mediators" submitted by Nancy Cleaves, Nevada Dispute Resolution Coalition.09-31791
06/26/2009Administrative CaseFiled comments on Foreclosure Mediation Rules submitted by Michael Buckley of Jones Vargas law firm.09-31792
06/30/2009Administrative CaseFiled letter from Michael Brunson of Coalition of Appraisers in Nevada in response to questions raised at public hearing on June 26.09-31793
06/30/2009Administrative CaseFiled Order Adopting Foreclosure Mediation Rules with Exhibit A attached. The rules shall be effective July 31, 2009. The clerk shall cause a notice of entry to be published in the State Bar publication.09-31794
06/30/2009Administrative CaseIssued Notice of Rule Change.09-31795
07/22/2009Administrative CaseFiled Order the Administrative Office of the Courts is hereby designated as the entity to serve as the Mediation Administrator of the foreclosure medation program.09-31796
08/19/2009Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Mediators. The following individuals are hereby appointed as meditors for the Foreclosure Mediation Program and may begin accepting cases immediately. (See order for list of 97 mediators.) (Order was faxed to Kate Ely who distributed it to all appointed mediators.)09-31797
08/19/2009Administrative CaseFiled Order Scheduling Public Hearing. The court will conduct a public hearing on the proposed amendments and forms on Tuesday, September 1, 2009, at 4:00 p.m. in the Supreme Court Courtroom in Carson City. The hearing will be videoconferenced to Las Vegas RJC. Written comments invited. Due by 5:00 p.m., August 28, 2009. Persons interested in participating must notify the clerk no later than August 28, 2009. (Exhibits A and B attached.)09-31798
09/01/2009Administrative CaseFiled comments regarding the adoption of Rules for Foreclosure Mediation submtted by Legal Aid Center of Southern Nevada.09-31799
09/01/2009Administrative CasePublic hearing on the administrative docket.
09/28/2009Administrative CaseFiled Order Amending Foreclosure Mediation Rules and Adopting Forms. (Exhibit A and B attached.) These rules shall be effective immediately.09-31800
11/04/2009Administrative CaseFiled Order Amending Foreclosure Mediation Rules and Adopting Forms. (Exhibit Aand B attached.) This court has determined that further amendment of the rules is warranted. These rules shall be effective immediately.09-31801
12/08/2009Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Mediators. The following individuals are hereby appointed as mediators for the foreclosure mediation program and may begin accepting cases immediately. (See order for list of 74 mediators.)09-31802
12/10/2009Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Mediator. (Kathleen Trimmer).09-31803
12/30/2009Administrative CaseFiled letter from attorney Philip Olsen with comments for improvement of foreclosure mediation program.09-31804
02/26/2010Administrative CaseFiled Order Scheduling Public Hearing. Tuesday, March 16, 2010 at 4 p.m. in the Supreme Court Courtoom in Carson City. Videoconferenced to the Las Vegas RJC. Written comments due by March 12, 2010. (Exhibit A attached.)10-34218
03/11/2010Administrative CaseFiled comments from Geoffrey Giles.10-34219
03/12/2010Administrative CaseFiled comments from David C. Eisenberg.10-34220
03/12/2010Administrative CaseFiled comments from attorney Philip A. Olsen.10-34221
03/15/2010Administrative CaseFiled comments from Wilde & Associates, Kevin S. Soderstrom, Esq.10-34222
03/15/2010Administrative CaseFiled letter with comments from Coalition of Appraisers in Nevada, Michael L. Brunson, President.10-34223
03/15/2010Administrative CaseFiled letter with comments from Appraisal Institute, American Society of Appraisers, American Society of Farm Managers & Rural Appraisers, and National Association of Indepenent Fee Appraisers.10-34224
03/15/2010Administrative CaseFiled Mediator, Susan G. Trautman's Comments.10-34225
03/15/2010Administrative CaseFiled Statement of of Robert Monks Regarding Proposed Changes to the Foreclosure Mediation Rules.10-34226
03/16/2010Administrative CaseFiled letter with enclosed comments from Ian Hirsch, President, fortress Credit Services, LLC.10-34227
03/16/2010Administrative CaseFiled Comments from attorney Patrick James Martin.10-34228
03/16/2010Administrative CaseFiled comments from Damian Falcon, Falcon Credit Management.10-34229
03/16/2010Administrative CaseFiled request from Guy DeMarco, 8 News NOW, to videotape the public hearing.10-34230
03/16/2010Administrative CaseFiled Order - permission is granted for photographic of electronic media coverage. Guy DeMarco of KLAS-TV is designated as pool coordinator.10-34231
03/16/2010Administrative CasePublic hearing on the administrative docket.
03/17/2010Administrative CaseFiled comments on Proposed Rule Changes from Danielle Arlowe, American Financial Services Association (AFSA).10-34232
03/19/2010Administrative CaseFiled comments from attorney William M. O'Mara.10-34233
03/22/2010Administrative CaseFiled comments from Stephanie Cooper Herdman, Esq., of Cooper Castle Law Firm, LLP.10-34234
03/22/2010Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Mediators. (48 mediators appointed). Mediators may begin accepting cases immediately.10-34235
03/22/2010Administrative CaseFiled comments from Kristy Sinsata, Consumer Advocacy Group.10-34236
03/30/2010Administrative CaseFiled comments from Linda Rheinberger, Nevada Association of Realtors.10-34237
03/31/2010Administrative CaseFiled public comment from Brad Spires, Re/Max Realty Affiliates.10-34238
04/02/2010Administrative CaseFiled comments from Forrest L. Barbee, Broker, Prudential Group.10-34239
04/02/2010Administrative CaseFiled comments from William Uffelman, President & CEO, Nevada Bankers Association.10-34240
04/06/2010Administrative CaseFiled comments from Jack Woodcock, Prudential Americana Group.10-34241
04/07/2010Administrative CaseFiled comments from Helge Hukari, General Counsel, Clear Captial.10-34242
04/22/2010Administrative CaseFiled Order Amending Foreclosure Mediation Rules (Exhibit A attached). These rules shall be effective June 1, 2010.10-34243
04/23/2010Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Mediators.10-34244
04/27/2010Administrative CaseFiled letter from Michael Ramer, President, National Associaton of BPO Professionals, with comment on proposed revision to rules.10-34245
07/21/2010Administrative CaseFiled Order Amending Foreclosure Mediation Rule 5(8)(b). (Exhibit A attached.) Effective 30 days from the date of this order.10-34246
08/19/2010Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Mediators. The following are hereby appointed as mediators for the Foreclosure Mediation Program and may begin accepting cases immediately. (See order for list of 72 mediators.)10-34247
10/27/2010Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Mediators. The following are hereby appointed as mediators for the Foreclosure Mediation Program and may begin accepting cases immediately. (See order for list of 48 mediators.)10-28204
11/09/2010Administrative CaseFiled Order Scheduling Public Hearing on Monday, December 6, 2010, at 2:00 p.m. in RJC, Las Vegas. (Exhibit A attached.) Videoconferenced to Carson City. Written comments invited. Due by 5:00 p.m., December 10, 2010. Persons interested in participating must notify the clerk no later that December 2, 2010.10-29325
11/12/2010Administrative CaseFiled Order Reappointing Mediators. The following individuals are hereby reappointed as mediators for the Foreclosure Mediation Program: (69 individuals).10-29630
11/16/2010Administrative CaseFiled Letter from attorney Marvin Longabaugh with comments on proposed changes to Rule 4.2.10-29869
11/18/2010Administrative CaseFiled Letter from attorney Wayne Chimarusti re: draft amendments to Foreclosure Mediation Rules.10-30118
11/18/2010Administrative CaseFiled Letter from attorney Sandra L. Stewart submitting comments for the December 6, 2010, hearing.10-30211
11/22/2010Administrative CaseFiled letter from Stephanie Cooper Herdman, Esq. of The Cooper Castle Law Firm requesting to personally appear at the Public Hearing scheduled for December 6, 2010 at 2:00 p.m.10-30480
11/22/2010Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Dean J. Gould, Esq. of Jacier Gould, P.C. regarding Proposed Rule Changes.10-30481
11/30/2010Administrative CaseFiled Letter from Philip A. Olsen with comments for 12/6/10 hearing and further requesting to participate in the hearing.10-31141
11/30/2010Administrative CaseFiled Letter from attorney David Hamilton with comments regarding proposed forclosure rule amendments.10-31142
11/30/2010Administrative CaseFiled Letter from attorney Bill Curran stating that he wishes to participate in the 12/6/10 public hearing.10-31143
12/01/2010Administrative CaseFiled Letter from attorney Ernest Nielsen of the Washoe County Senior Law Project requesting permission to address the Court at the public hearing.10-31216
12/01/2010Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Helene M. Silvertein, FMP Mediator re: proposed amendments to rules.10-31220
12/02/2010Administrative CaseFiled Comments on the proposed amendments from Robert F. Saint-Aubin.10-31282
12/02/2010Administrative CaseFiled Letter from Alexanra Charbogne of Radio Xan requesting to record and take photographs in the courtroom during the public hearing on December 6, 2010.10-31289
12/03/2010Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Michael F. Parra with Exhibits A through D.10-31503
12/03/2010Letter/IncomingFiled Letter from Barbara Broussard stating that she will attend the public hearing on 12/6/10.10-31524
12/03/2010Administrative CaseFiled Comments from attorney Benjamin Childs and notification that he wishes to speak at the public hearing.10-31532
12/03/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order granting request for media coverage. Alexandra Charbogne of RadioXan is designated as pool coordinator.10-31543
12/06/2010Administrative CaseFiled Motion from KLAS-TV, Nathan Baca requesting cameras in the courtroom Monday, December 6, 2010 at 2:00 p.m.10-31606
12/06/2010Administrative CaseFiled Order granting permission for video media coverage of the aforesaid matter by KLAS, for news purposes and not for commercial exploitation.10-31658
12/06/2010Administrative CasePublic Hearing on the administrative docket.
12/06/2010Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Linda Rheinberger, President, Nevada Association of Realtors10-31724
12/08/2010Administrative CaseFiled Comments from David Campbell, Campbell Mediations, regarding proposed rule changes.10-32017
12/08/2010Administrative CaseFiled Comments from attorney David Rankine re: amendments to rules.10-32019
12/08/2010Administrative CaseFiled Comments from attorney Troy Atkinson re: proposed revisions to rules.10-32020
12/08/2010Administrative CaseFiled additional comments from David Campbell, Campbell Mediations.10-32021
12/10/2010Administrative CaseFiled Comments from attorney Ira David regarding proposed rule changes.10-32226
12/10/2010Administrative CaseFiled Comments from David C. Eisenberg, non-attorney mediator.10-32229
12/10/2010Administrative CaseFiled Comments on Recommended Amendments to Foreclosure Mediation Rules from Aaron M. Waite, esq., Cooper Castle Law Firm.10-32230
12/10/2010Administrative CaseFiled Comment from Mediator Liz Gonzalez.10-32232
12/10/2010Administrative CaseFiled Comments from attorney Jacob Hafter re: proposed rule changes.10-32238
12/10/2010Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Lindsay Statlander, Esq., Nevada Home Relief Center re: proposed rule changes.10-32321
12/10/2010Administrative CaseFiled Comments from attorney Philip A. Olsen.10-32323
12/10/2010Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Cathe Cole-Sherburn, Senior VP, First Americn Trustee Servicing Solutions.10-32324
12/10/2010Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Michael F. Parra.10-32326
12/13/2010Administrative CaseFiled Letter from attorney Philip Olsen letter requesting to review any documents containing the names and qualifications of all foreclosure mediator applicants, as well as any minutes, notes, agendas, notices or other documents pertaining to meetings, discussions, deliberations or decisions of the committee.10-32386
12/13/2010Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Michael Finnucci, ADM Enterprises, LLC.10-32467
12/13/2010Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Leah Ellenhorn Stromberg, LCSW, Supervisor, Clark County Neighborhood Justice Center.10-32468
12/13/2010Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Bill Curran, Ballard Spahr, LLP, regarding proposed amendments.10-32472
12/13/2010Administrative CaseFiled Comments re: proposed rule changes from C. Morgan.10-32476
12/13/2010Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Joseph T. Prete of Smith, Larsen & Wixom.10-32480
12/13/2010Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Damian Falcone, Falcon Credit Management.10-32483
12/14/2010Administrative CaseFiled Order Reappointing Mediators. The following individual is hereby appointed as a meditor for the Foreclosure Mediation Program and may begin accepting cases immediately - Sandra Stewart and Macaire Moran (corrected spelling of name) is reappointed and may continue to accept cases.10-32679
12/17/2010Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter to Phil Olsen regarding his request for copies.10-33188
12/20/2010Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Kimberly McGhee, Bailey Kennedy law firm re: amended foreclosure mediation rules.10-33215
02/16/2011Administrative CaseFiled Order Amending Foreclosure Mediation Rules. Effective March 1, 2011.11-05029
03/09/2011Administrative CaseFiled Order Reappointing Mediators. The following individuals are hereby reappointed as mediators for the Foreclosure Mediation Program: (39 individuals reappointed).11-07311
04/11/2011Administrative CaseFiled Order Reappointing Mediators. The following individuals are hereby reappointed as mediators for the Foreclosure Mediation Program: (40 individuals reappointed).11-10672
06/01/2011Administrative CaseFiled Order Establishing Advisory Committee on the Foreclosure Mediation Program. Individuals listed in Exhibit A are appointed as members.11-15940
08/02/2011Administrative CaseFiled Order Reappointing Mediators. The following individuals are hereby reappointed as mediators for the Foreclosure Mediation Program: (60 individuals reappointed).11-23198
10/05/2011Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Mediators. The following individuals are hereby reappointed as mediators for the Foreclosure Mediation Program: (37 individuals reappointed).11-30336
11/03/2011Administrative CaseFiled Order Reappointing Mediators. The following individuals are hereby reappointed as mediators for the Foreclosure Mediation Program: (59 mediators reappointed).11-33949
02/27/2012Administrative CaseFiled Order Reappointing Mediators. The following individuals are hereby reappointed as mediators for the Foreclosure Mediation Program: (34 mediators reappointed).12-06071
04/04/2012Administrative CaseFiled Order Reappointing Mediators. The following individuals are hereby reappointed as mediators for the Foreclosure Mediation Program: (38 mediators reappointed).12-10681
05/16/2012Administrative CaseFiled Order Scheduling Public Hearing. The court will conduct a public hearing on the proposed amendments on Monday, July 9, 2012, at 3:00 p.m. in the Supreme Court Courtroom in Carson City. The hearing will be videoconferenced to Las Vegas RJC. Written comments invited. Due by 5:00 p.m., July 3, 2012. Persons interested in participating must notify the clerk no later than July 3, 2012. (Exhibits A and B attached.)12-15595
05/22/2012Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Esperanza Tome.12-35741
05/23/2012Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Advisory Committee on the Foreclosure Mediation Program. Individuals listed in Exhibit A are appointed as members.12-16261
06/11/2012Administrative CaseFiled Comments from attorney Geoffrey Giles.12-18273
06/11/2012Administrative CaseFiled Comments from mediator David Campbell--Suggestions for Changes to FMP Rules.12-18279
07/02/2012Administrative CaseFiled comments from United Trustees Association (UTA).12-20985
07/03/2012Administrative CaseFiled comments from Aaron M. Waite of the law firm of The Cooper Castle Law Firm, LLP.12-20986
07/03/2012Administrative CaseFiled comments from Garry R. Seligson of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.12-20987
07/03/2012Administrative CaseFiled comments from Mark Mausert and on behalf of Robert E. Hager, Esq. and Henry Sotelo, Esq.12-20989
07/03/2012Administrative CaseFiled comments from Gary Smith.12-20990
07/03/2012Administrative CaseFiled comments from Mary Law.12-20992
07/03/2012Administrative CaseFiled comments from Philip A. Olsen.12-20995
07/03/2012Administrative CaseFiled comments from Kristin A. Schuler-Hintz of the law firm of McCarthy Holthus.12-20997
07/05/2012Administrative CaseFiled comments from Rande Johnsen, Phillip Silvestri, Joel Sarmeiento, and Marianne Pepe.12-21027
07/05/2012Administrative CaseFiled comments from Carol Ranalli.12-21086
07/05/2012Administrative CaseFiled comments from the Nevada Credit Union League.12-21087
07/05/2012Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Nevada Bankers Association.12-21102
07/05/2012Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Law Office of Patrick James Martin.12-21106
07/09/2012Administrative CaseFiled Comments from attorney Donna Osborn of Wright Finlay & Zak law firm.12-21348
07/09/2012Administrative CasePublic Hearing held on the Administrative Docket.
07/13/2012Administrative CaseFiled Supplemental Response to Proposed Rule Changes from attorney Donna Osborn of Wright Finlay & Zak law firm.12-22096
07/16/2012Administrative CaseFiled Comments re Proposed Rule Changes to the FMRs submitted by attorneys Mark Mausert, Henry Sotelo and Robert Hager.12-22391
07/17/2012Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Gary Smith.12-22573
07/18/2012Administrative CaseFiled supplemental materials from attorney Patrick James Martin.12-22708
07/19/2012Administrative CaseFiled Order Reappointing Mediators. The following individuals are hereby reappointed as mediators for the Foreclosure Mediation Program: (54 mediators reappointed). lcastillo12-22860
07/20/2012Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Helene M. Silverstein, FMP Mediator.12-22942
07/23/2012Administrative CaseFiled Comments from McCarthy & Holthus law firm.12-23085
07/24/2012Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Mary Law.12-23201
07/24/2012Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Aaron Ging.12-23202
07/25/2012Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Carol Ranalli.12-23435
07/25/2012Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Barbara Buckley, Legal Aid Center of Southern Nevada.12-23546
07/30/2012Administrative CaseFiled additional supplemental materials from attorney Patrick James Martin.12-23961
09/19/2012Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Mediators. The following individuals are hereby reappointed as mediators for the Foreclosure Mediation Program. (35 individuals reappointed)12-29580
10/25/2012Administrative CaseFiled Order Reappointing Mediators. The following individuals are hereby reappointed as mediators for the Foreclosure Mediation Program, effective November 3, 2012. (51 individuals reappointed)12-33841
12/06/2012Administrative CaseFiled Order Amending Foreclosure Mediation Rules (Exhibit A attached). These rules shall be effective January 1, 2013.12-38442
02/07/2013Administrative CaseFiled Order Reappointing Mediators. The following individuals are hereby reappointed as mediators for the Foreclosure Mediation Program, effective February 27, 2013. (31 individuals reappointed)13-04074
04/01/2013Administrative CaseFiled Order Reappointing Mediators. The following individuals are hereby reappointed as mediators for the Foreclosure Mediation Program, effective April 10, 2013. (37 individuals reappointed)13-09437
05/09/2013Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Advisory Committee on the Foreclosure Mediation Program. Individuals listed in Exhibit A are appointed as members.13-13723
07/01/2013Administrative CaseFiled Order Reappointing Mediators. The following individuals are hereby reappointed as mediators for the Foreclosure Mediation Program, effective August 2, 2013. (34 individuals reappointed)13-19236
07/09/2013Administrative CaseFiled Order Reappointing Mediators. The following individuals are hereby reappointed as mediators for the Foreclosure Mediation Program, effective August 2, 2013. (10 arbitrators reappointed)13-19965
09/12/2013Administrative CaseFiled Order Reappointing Mediators. The following individuals are hereby reappointed as mediators for the Foreclosure Mediation Program, effective October 5, 2013. (32 arbitrators reappointed)13-26919
10/23/2013Administrative CaseFiled Order Reappointing Mediators. The following individuals are hereby reappointed as mediators for the Foreclosure Mediation Program, effective November 3, 2013. (43 arbitrators reappointed)13-31857
11/14/2013Administrative CaseFiled Order Scheduling Public Hearing and Requesting Public Comment. Hearing to be held Thursday, December 5, 2013, at 1:30 p.m. at RJC in Las Vegas. Videoconferenced to Supreme Court in Carson City. Written comment invited. Original and 8 copies due by November 27, 2013, at 5:00 p.m. Comments must be submitted in hard-copy format. Comments submitted electronically will not be docketed. Persons interested in participating in the hearing must notify the Clerk by November 27, 2013. (Exhibit A attached.)13-34190
12/04/2013Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Philip Olsen.13-36377
12/04/2013Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Kristin Schuler-Hintz.13-36379
12/04/2013Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Michael Joe, Legal Aid Center of Southern Nevada.13-36382
12/04/2013Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Stephen Hicklin, Northwest Trustee Services Inc.13-36384
12/05/2013Administrative CasePublic Hearing held on the Administrative Docket.
12/09/2013Administrative CaseFiled Letter from Keith Tierney regarding time to provide public comments.13-36945
12/12/2013Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Geoffrey Giles.13-37537
12/12/2013Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Jeanette Gross.13-37597
12/27/2013Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Mary Law.13-39478
01/06/2014Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Assemblyman Andy Eisen.14-00344
01/10/2014Administrative CaseFiled Comments. Re: 5th Proposed Mediation Rule changes to ADKT 0435 dated November 14, 2013 from Mary Law.14-00991
02/18/2014Administrative CaseFiled Order Reappointing Mediators. The following individuals are hereby reappointed as mediators for the Foreclosure Mediation Program, effective February 27, 2014. (13 mediators reappointed)14-05086
02/25/2014Administrative CaseFiled Order Amending Foreclosure Mediation Rules and Forms. (Exhibits A, B and C attached.) These rules shall be effective April 1, 2014.14-06147
03/18/2014Administrative CaseFiled Order Reappointing Mediators. The following individuals are hereby reappointed as mediators for the Foreclosure Meidation Program, effective April 10, 2014. (26 mediators reappointed)14-08761
03/26/2014Administrative CaseFiled Order. On March 18, 2014, this court entered an order reappointing various mediators. The order contained a minor clerical error. One of the mediators reappointed was listed as David Marcus Pakele, and should have been listed as Gary Marcus Pakele. The order is hereby corrected and Gary Marcus Pakele is reappointed as a mediator, effective April 10, 2014.14-09524
05/27/2014Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Advisory Committee on the Foreclosure Mediation Program effective May 31, 2014. Individuals listed on Exhibit A.14-17027
07/22/2014Administrative CaseFiled Order Reappointing Mediators. The following individuals are hereby reappointed as mediators for the Foreclosure Meidation Program, effective August 2, 2014. (31 mediators reappointed)14-23809
09/09/2014Administrative CaseFiled Order Reappointing Mediators. The following individuals are hereby reappointed as mediators for the Foreclosure Meidation Program, effective October 5, 2014. (27 mediators reappointed)14-29826
10/16/2014Administrative CaseFiled Order Reappointing Mediators. The following individuals are hereby reappointed as mediators for the Foreclosure Mediation Program, effective November 3, 2014. (33 mediators reappointed)14-34461
01/20/2015Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Advisory Committee on the Foreclosure Mediation Program. Debra Bookout is hereby appointed as member of the Advisory Committee, effective February 1, 2015.15-01984
02/05/2015Administrative CaseFiled Order Reappointing Mediators. The following individuals are hereby reappointed as mediators for the Foreclosure Mediation Program, effective February 27, 2015. (12 mediators reappointed)15-03876
03/20/2015Administrative CaseFiled Order Reappointing Mediators. The following individuals are hereby reappointed as mediators for the Foreclosure Mediation Program, effective April 10, 2015. (15 mediators reappointed)15-08550
05/29/2015Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Advisory Committee on the Foreclosure Mediation Program effective May 31, 2015. Individuals listed on Exhibit A.15-16508
07/02/2015Administrative CaseFiled Order Reappointing Mediators. The following individuals are hereby reappointed as mediators for the Foreclosure Mediation Program, effective August 2, 2015, and may continue to accept cases. (14 mediators reappointed).15-20258
09/04/2015Administrative CaseFiled Order Reappointing Mediators. The following individuals are hereby reappointed as mediators for the Foreclosure Mediation Program, effective October 5, 2015, and may continue to accept cases. (10 mediators reappointed).15-26891
10/09/2015Administrative CaseFiled Order Reappointing Mediators. The following individuals are hereby reappointed as mediators for the Foreclosure Mediation Program, effective November 3, 2015, and may continue to accept cases. (26 mediators reappointed).15-30790
12/14/2015Administrative CaseFiled Order Amending Foreclosure Mediation Rules. Exhibit A attached. Effective 30 days from the date of this order.15-38049
01/27/2016Administrative CaseFiled Order Reappointing Mediators. The following individuals are hereby reappointed as mediators for the Foreclosure Mediation Program, effective February 27, 2016, and may continue to accept cases. (10 mediators reappointed).16-02818
04/08/2016Administrative CaseFiled Order Reappointing Mediators. The following individuals are hereby reappointed as mediators for the Foreclosure Mediation Program, effective April 10, 2016, and may continue to accept cases. (14 mediators reappointed).16-11020
05/19/2016Administrative CaseFiled Order Suspending Foreclosure Mediation Rule 24.16-15848
07/13/2016Administrative CaseFiled Filed Order Reappointing Mediators. The following individuals are hereby reappointed as mediators for the Foreclosure Mediation Program, effective August 2, 2016, and may continue to accept cases. (14 mediators reappointed).16-21769
09/22/2016Administrative CaseFiled Order. The foreclosure mediation program ends effective June 30, 2017. The last day that parties can request a mediation under the program is December 31, 2016 and all mediations must be completed by April 30, 2017. The district courts may not remand any cases for further mediation after March 31, 2017 and all pending mediations must be completed no later than April 30, 2017, or the request for mediation will be declined and the $200 fee paid by both the homeowner and the lender will be refunded.16-29501
10/12/2016Administrative CaseFiled Order. The outside retention period for records associated with the foreclosure mediation program is 5 years unless a shorter period is prescribed by the schedule for the retention of administrative records adopted by this court on April 13, 2010, in ADKT No. 410.16-31862
10/25/2016Administrative CaseFiled Order Extending Term of Mediator. Donald Weiss's term of appointment shall expire on November 30, 2016.16-33404
10/25/2016Administrative CaseFiled Order Extending Term of Mediator. Lori Jensen's term of appointment shall expire on April 30, 2017.16-33405
07/05/2017Administrative CaseFiled Petition to Amend the Foreclosure Mediation Rules.17-22211
07/21/2017Administrative CaseFiled Order Reappointing Mediators. The following individuals are hereby reappointed as mediators for the Foreclosure Mediation Program, effective July 21, 2017, and may continue to accept cases. (46 mediators reappointed).17-24207
08/01/2017Administrative CaseFiled Order Amending Rules of Foreclosure Mediation. Exhibit A & B attached. Effective 30 days from the date of this order.17-25595
09/12/2017Administrative CaseFiled Order Reappointing Mediators. The following individuals are hereby reappointed as mediators for the Foreclosure Mediation Program, effective Septrember 8, 2017, and may continue to accept cases. (24 mediators reappointed).17-30599
10/10/2018Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Mediators. Individuals are hereby appointed as mediators for the Foreclosure Mediation Program and may begin accepting cases October 9, 2018. (See order for list of individuals appointed.)18-39849
05/10/2019Administrative CaseFiled Order Revoking Appointments of Mediators. The following individuals were appointed as mediators. (Barbara Harvey-Dunn and Kathleen Arvold) We revoke their appointments as mediators. Fn1[James W. Hardesty,Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter.]19-20605