The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Administrative Case: ADKT 0447
Short Caption:IN RE: AMENDMENTS TO SHORT TRIAL RULESClassification:Administrative - ADKT - ADKT
Case Status:Case Closed
Filed Date:03/22/2010Public Hearing:06/05/2014 at 3:00 PM (RJC, Las Vegas)
Closed Date:08/07/2014

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/22/2010Administrative CaseFiled Petition.10-34251
03/31/2010Administrative CaseFiled letter from district judge Brent Adams re: proposal to adopt private jury trial rules.10-34252
03/31/2010Administrative CaseFiled Order Scheduling Public Hearing. Monday May 3, 2010, at 3:00 p.m. in the Supreme Court Courtroom, Carson Ctiy. Videoconferenced to the RJC in Las Vegas. Written comments invited. Original and 8 copies due by 5 p.m., April 29, 2010. ( Exhibit A attached.)10-34253
04/27/2010Administrative CaseFiled Comments from attorneys Neil Galatz and Gerald Gillock.10-34254
04/29/2010Administrative CaseFiled letter from Judge Elizabeth Gonzalez with comments re: proposed rules.10-34255
04/30/2010Administrative CaseFiled letter from law firm of Snell & Wilmer with comments re: short trial program.10-34256
05/03/2010OtherPublic hearing on the Administrative Docket.
05/07/2010Administrative CaseFiled Order Scheduling Public Hearing. Monday, June 7, 2010, at 4:00 p.m. Regional Justice Center, Las Vegas. Videoconferenced to the Supreme Court in Carson City. Written comments invited. Original and 8 copies due by 5 p.m. on June 3, 2010. (Exhibit A attached.)10-34257
05/07/2010Administrative CaseFiled letter from Thomas R.C. Wilson, with comments re: proposed rule amendment.10-34258
06/01/2010Administrative CaseFiled letter from Chris Beecroft, ADR Commissioner, 8th Judicial District Court, with comments re: proposed amendment.10-34259
06/02/2010Administrative CaseFiled letter with attached Testimony from Jordan Ross, Ross Legal Search, LLC for June 7th hearing.10-34260
06/07/2010OtherPublic hearing on the administrative docket.
06/21/2010Administrative CaseFiled letter from attorney Thomas R.C. Wilson, with comments re: proposed rules.10-34261
06/23/2010Administrative CaseFiled letter from attorney William C. Turner with comments on proposed amendment to Short Trial Rules.10-34262
06/23/2010Administrative CaseFiled Order the pilot program is established from July 1, 2010 through December 31, 2010, for alternate jury and bench trials pursuant to the provisions of Exhibits A, B and C (attached to order).10-34263
07/23/2010Administrative CaseFiled letter with comments re: rule changes from Lance R. Van Lydegraf, Short Trial Judge Pro Tempore.10-34264
10/20/2010Administrative CaseFiled Order the pilot program is extended from December 31, 2010 to December 31, 2011.10-34265
10/18/2011Administrative CaseFiled Order the pilot program is extended from December 31, 2011 to December 31, 2012.11-32183
10/31/2012Administrative CaseFiled Order the pilot program is extended from December 31, 2012 to December 31, 2013.12-34380
11/12/2013Administrative CaseFiled Letter from retired judges Gene Porter and Jackie Glass concerning renewal of the Alternative Trial Program.13-33795
12/06/2013Administrative CaseFiled Order the pilot program is extended from December 31, 2013 to December 31, 2014.13-36706
03/03/2014Administrative CaseFiled Order Scheduling Public Hearing. Thursday, June 5, 2014, at 3:00 p.m. Regional Justice Center, Las Vegas. Videoconferenced to the Supreme Court in Carson City. Written comments invited. Original and 8 copies due by 5:00 p.m. on May 30, 2014. (Exhibits A-C attached)14-06804
05/21/2014Administrative CaseFiled Comments from James F Holtz with the Law Firm Stutz Artiano Shinoff & Holtz.14-16589
05/30/2014Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Phillip Tiberi with Kramer, Deboer & Keane.14-17460
05/30/2014Administrative CaseFiled Comments from G Dallas Horton with G Dallas Horton & Associates.14-17464
05/30/2014Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Joseph P Garin with Lipson, Neilson, Cole, Seltzer & Garin, P.C.14-17476
05/30/2014Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Nicholas J Santoro with Santoro Whitmore.14-17633
06/02/2014Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Sarah Suter with Las Vegas Defense Lawyers.14-17720
06/02/2014Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Patrick Byrne with Snell & Wilmer. (via-fax 5/28/14)14-17860
06/05/2014Administrative CasePublic Hearing Held. Public Hearing held on the Administrative Docket. Before the En Banc Court.
08/07/2014Administrative CaseFiled Order Adopting Alternate Trial Rules (attached exhibit A). Effective 30 days from the date of this order.14-25936
08/07/2014Administrative CaseCase Closed.