Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 57259
Short Caption:IN RE: ESTATE OF NOLAN KLEINCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV101057Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/15/2011How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/02/2010Filing FeeFiling Fee due. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court.
12/02/2010Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. Filed certified copy of proper person notice of appeal. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) (STRICKEN PER ORDER FILED 04/26/2011).10-31287
12/07/2010Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Tonja Brown. Check No. 3809.
12/13/2010Transcript RequestFiled Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form.10-32424
01/10/2011BriefFiled Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement.11-01005
01/10/2011TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 9/30/10. Court Reporter: Stephanie Koetting. (Submitted by Tonja Brown).11-01006
01/14/2011MotionFiled Motion to Strike Notice of Appeal and Objection to Unauthorized Practice of Law.11-01545
01/31/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due in district court case no. CV101057 due: 30 days. Fn1 [We defer ruling respondents' motion to dismiss.]11-03013
02/02/2011Notice/IncomingFiled Affidavit of Service by Mail (Motion to Strike).11-03299
02/04/2011MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Objection to Motion to Strike Notice of Appeal and Objection to Unauthorized Practice of Law.11-03664
02/04/2011MotionFiled Proper Person Motion to Request Respondents to Notify Appellant by Certified Mail of any Filings Filed in the Above Entitled Action.11-03665
02/11/2011MotionFiled Response to Motion. Response to Motion Requesting Notice by Certified Mail.11-04512
02/11/2011MotionFiled Reply to Response to Motion to Strike.11-04517
02/15/2011Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - Vol. 1 - INDEX/DOCKET SHEETS.11-04960
02/15/2011Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal- VOL2.11-04961
02/15/2011Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - VOL3.11-04962
02/15/2011Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal- VOL4.11-04963
02/15/2011Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
02/16/2011MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Sur Reply to Reply to Response to Motion to Strike. (STRICKEN PER ORDER 04/26/2011).11-04988
02/18/2011MotionFiled Motion to Strike Sur-Reply.11-05385
04/26/2011Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. We grant respondents' motion to strike the notice of appeal in this matter. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." fn1[We direct the clerk of this court to strike Brown's sur-reply, which was filed on February 16, 2011. Brown's "motion to request respondents to notify appellant by certified mail of any filings filed in the above entitled action" is denied as moot.]11-12307
05/23/2011RemittiturIssued Remittitur.11-15051
05/23/2011Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed
06/06/2011RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 2, 2011.11-15051